|
|
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Unknown Works | 1919 | 02/1919 | General | Superheated boiler fitted |
|||
Gateshead Works | 25/04/1923 | 09/08/1923 | 107 days | General | |||
Darlington Works | 23/10/1925 | 25/01/1926 | 95 days | General | |||
Darlington Works | 24/08/1926 | 22/09/1926 | 30 days | Light Repair | |||
Darlington Works | 18/11/1927 | 30/01/1928 | 74 days | General | Boiler number D946 (Diagram 50) |
||
Darlington Works | 12/06/1930 | 05/09/1930 | 86 days | General | Boiler number D806 (Diagram 50) |
||
Darlington Works | 21/04/1931 | 28/05/1931 | 38 days | Light Repair | |||
Darlington Works | 27/11/1931 | 31/12/1931 | 35 days | Heavy | |||
Darlington Works | 14/06/1933 | 24/07/1933 | 41 days | General | Boiler number E4/AW24 (Diagram 50) |
||
Darlington Works | 17/12/1935 | 17/02/1936 | 63 days | General | Boiler number HL112 (Diagram 50) |
||
Darlington Works | 22/02/1937 | 31/03/1937 | 38 days | Heavy | |||
Darlington Works | 09/08/1937 | 09/08/1937 | 1 day | No repairs |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
02/1912 | To Service | To service as North Eastern Railway Number 788 Built at Darlington Works, Works Number Allocated to Heaton (HTN) Diagram 50Sat boiler fitted |
||
1919 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Unknown Works (General) - Arr: ?/1919. Dep: ?/02/1919. Work undertaken: Superheated boiler fitted |
||
07/02/1919 | Modification | Diagram 50 number D132 boiler fitted | ||
25/04/1923 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gateshead Works (General) - Arr: 25/04/1923. Dep: 09/08/1923. | ||
09/03/1924 | Allocation | Reallocated to York (North) (YK) | ||
23/10/1925 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 23/10/1925. Dep: 25/01/1926. | ||
24/08/1926 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 24/08/1926. Dep: 22/09/1926. | ||
18/11/1927 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 18/11/1927. Dep: 30/01/1928. Work undertaken: Boiler number D946 (Diagram 50) |
||
22/07/1929 | Allocation | Reallocated to Hull Dairycoates (HLD) | ||
12/06/1930 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 12/06/1930. Dep: 05/09/1930. Work undertaken: Boiler number D806 (Diagram 50) |
||
21/04/1931 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 21/04/1931. Dep: 28/05/1931. | ||
27/11/1931 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Heavy) - Arr: 27/11/1931. Dep: 31/12/1931. | ||
14/06/1933 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 14/06/1933. Dep: 24/07/1933. Work undertaken: Boiler number E4/AW24 (Diagram 50) |
||
17/12/1935 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 17/12/1935. Dep: 17/02/1936. Work undertaken: Boiler number HL112 (Diagram 50) |
||
22/02/1937 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Heavy) - Arr: 22/02/1937. Dep: 31/03/1937. | ||
09/08/1937 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (No repairs) - Arr: 09/08/1937. Dep: 09/08/1937. | ||
02/09/1937 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 788 from Hull Dairycoates (HLD) |