|
|
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Gateshead Works | 15/06/1923 | 15/09/1923 | 93 days | General | Superheated boiler fitted Boiler number D1421 (Diagram 54Sup) |
||
Gateshead Works | 01/02/1927 | 27/04/1927 | 86 days | General | |||
Gateshead Works | 16/01/1929 | 25/01/1929 | 10 days | Light Repair | |||
Gateshead Works | 05/07/1929 | 11/07/1929 | 7 days | Light Repair | |||
Gateshead Works | 10/10/1929 | 15/12/1929 | 67 days | General | Boiler number D730 (Diagram 54Sup) |
||
Darlington Works | 18/11/1931 | 26/01/1932 | 70 days | Heavy | Boiler number D1429 (Diagram 54Sup) |
||
Darlington Works | 05/07/1934 | 06/09/1934 | 64 days | General | Boiler number D1526 (Diagram 54Sup) |
||
Darlington Works | 11/02/1935 | 05/03/1935 | 23 days | Light Repair | |||
Darlington Works | 30/08/1935 | 02/10/1935 | 34 days | Light Repair |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
03/1909 | To Service | To service as North Eastern Railway Number 759 Built at Gateshead Works, Works Number 112 Allocated to Heaton (HTN) Diagram 54Sat boiler fitted |
||
01/1923 | Modification | Modification: Vacuum Ejector fitted | ||
15/06/1923 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gateshead Works (General) - Arr: 15/06/1923. Dep: 15/09/1923. Work undertaken: Superheated boiler fitted Boiler number D1421 (Diagram 54Sup) |
||
07/01/1925 | Allocation | Reallocated to Tweedmouth (TWD) | ||
01/02/1927 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gateshead Works (General) - Arr: 01/02/1927. Dep: 27/04/1927. | ||
16/01/1929 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gateshead Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 16/01/1929. Dep: 25/01/1929. | ||
05/07/1929 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gateshead Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 05/07/1929. Dep: 11/07/1929. | ||
10/10/1929 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gateshead Works (General) - Arr: 10/10/1929. Dep: 15/12/1929. Work undertaken: Boiler number D730 (Diagram 54Sup) |
||
18/11/1931 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Heavy) - Arr: 18/11/1931. Dep: 26/01/1932. Work undertaken: Boiler number D1429 (Diagram 54Sup) |
||
27/03/1933 | Allocation | Reallocated to Neville Hill (NEV) | ||
11/10/1933 | Allocation | Reallocated to Heaton (HTN) | ||
11/05/1934 | Allocation | Reallocated to Neville Hill (NEV) | ||
05/07/1934 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 05/07/1934. Dep: 06/09/1934. Work undertaken: Boiler number D1526 (Diagram 54Sup) |
||
11/02/1935 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 11/02/1935. Dep: 05/03/1935. | ||
30/08/1935 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 30/08/1935. Dep: 02/10/1935. | ||
05/12/1936 | Allocation | Reallocated to York (North) (YK) | ||
06/05/1937 | Allocation | Reallocated to Hull Dairycoates (HLD) | ||
22/10/1938 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 759 from Hull Dairycoates (HLD) |