|
|
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Unknown Works | 1920 | 03/1920 | General | Superheated boiler fitted |
|||
Gateshead Works | 08/09/1924 | 08/10/1924 | 31 days | Light Repair | |||
Gateshead Works | 18/06/1925 | 11/09/1925 | 86 days | General | |||
Gateshead Works | 18/10/1927 | 22/12/1927 | 66 days | General | Boiler number D1975 (Diagram 54Sup) |
||
Gateshead Works | 13/04/1928 | 23/04/1928 | 11 days | Unclassified | |||
Gateshead Works | 14/04/1930 | 27/05/1930 | 44 days | General | |||
Darlington Works | 30/01/1933 | 02/03/1933 | 32 days | Heavy | Not repaired Boiler number D1721 (Diagram 54Sup) |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
11/1908 | To Service | To service as North Eastern Railway Number 752 Built at Gateshead Works, Works Number 106 Allocated to Heaton (HTN) Diagram 54Sat boiler fitted |
||
1920 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Unknown Works (General) - Arr: ?/1920. Dep: ?/03/1920. Work undertaken: Superheated boiler fitted |
||
07/03/1920 | Modification | Diagram 54Sup number G701 boiler fitted | ||
01/1923 | Modification | Modification: Vacuum Ejector fitted | ||
08/09/1924 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gateshead Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 08/09/1924. Dep: 08/10/1924. | ||
07/01/1925 | Allocation | Reallocated to Tweedmouth (TWD) | ||
18/06/1925 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gateshead Works (General) - Arr: 18/06/1925. Dep: 11/09/1925. | ||
07/02/1926 | Allocation | Reallocated to Annesley (ANN) | ||
20/09/1926 | Allocation | Reallocated to Tweedmouth (TWD) | ||
18/02/1927 | Allocation | Reallocated to Hull Dairycoates (HLD) | ||
07/04/1927 | Allocation | Reallocated to Tweedmouth (TWD) | ||
18/10/1927 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gateshead Works (General) - Arr: 18/10/1927. Dep: 22/12/1927. Work undertaken: Boiler number D1975 (Diagram 54Sup) |
||
13/04/1928 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gateshead Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 13/04/1928. Dep: 23/04/1928. | ||
14/04/1930 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gateshead Works (General) - Arr: 14/04/1930. Dep: 27/05/1930. | ||
30/01/1933 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Heavy) - Arr: 30/01/1933. Dep: 02/03/1933. Work undertaken: Not repaired Boiler number D1721 (Diagram 54Sup) |
||
23/06/1934 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 752 from Tweedmouth (TWD) |