|
|
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Unknown Works | 1911 | 06/1911 | General | Boiler number G714 (Diagram 54Sat) |
|||
Unknown Works | 1913 | 11/1913 | General | Superheated boiler fitted Boiler number G703 (Diagram 54Sup) |
|||
Darlington Works | 13/02/1925 | 19/05/1925 | 96 days | General | Boiler number D1725 (Diagram 54Sup) |
||
Darlington Works | 09/02/1928 | 26/04/1928 | 78 days | General | |||
Darlington Works | 03/02/1931 | 25/03/1931 | 51 days | General | Not repaired Boiler number D1534 (Diagram 54Sup) |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
11/1908 | To Service | To service as North Eastern Railway Number 751 Built at Gateshead Works, Works Number 105 Allocated to Hull Dairycoates (HLD) Diagram 54Sat boiler fitted |
||
1911 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Unknown Works (General) - Arr: ?/1911. Dep: ?/06/1911. Work undertaken: Boiler number G714 (Diagram 54Sat) |
||
1913 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Unknown Works (General) - Arr: ?/1913. Dep: ?/11/1913. Work undertaken: Superheated boiler fitted Boiler number G703 (Diagram 54Sup) |
||
01/1923 | Modification | Modification: Vacuum Ejector fitted | ||
13/02/1925 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 13/02/1925. Dep: 19/05/1925. Work undertaken: Boiler number D1725 (Diagram 54Sup) |
||
09/02/1928 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 09/02/1928. Dep: 26/04/1928. | ||
03/02/1931 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 03/02/1931. Dep: 25/03/1931. Work undertaken: Not repaired Boiler number D1534 (Diagram 54Sup) |
||
07/05/1936 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 751 from Hull Dairycoates (HLD) |