|
|
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Unknown Works | 1911 | 08/1911 | General | Boiler number G478 (Diagram 54Sat) |
|||
Unknown Works | 1915 | 11/1915 | General | Boiler number G479 (Diagram 54Sat) |
|||
Unknown Works | 1918 | 08/1918 | General | Superheated boiler fitted |
|||
Darlington Works | 18/04/1923 | 18/07/1923 | 92 days | General | Boiler number D1517 (Diagram 54Sup) |
||
Darlington Works | 21/03/1927 | 10/06/1927 | 82 days | General |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
06/1906 | To Service | To service as North Eastern Railway Number 768 Built at Gateshead Works, Works Number 50 Allocated to Hull Dairycoates (HLD) Diagram 54Sat boiler fitted |
||
1911 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Unknown Works (General) - Arr: ?/1911. Dep: ?/08/1911. Work undertaken: Boiler number G478 (Diagram 54Sat) |
||
1915 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Unknown Works (General) - Arr: ?/1915. Dep: ?/11/1915. Work undertaken: Boiler number G479 (Diagram 54Sat) |
||
1918 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Unknown Works (General) - Arr: ?/1918. Dep: ?/08/1918. Work undertaken: Superheated boiler fitted |
||
07/08/1918 | Modification | Diagram 54Sup number G840 boiler fitted | ||
18/04/1923 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 18/04/1923. Dep: 18/07/1923. Work undertaken: Boiler number D1517 (Diagram 54Sup) |
||
21/03/1927 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 21/03/1927. Dep: 10/06/1927. | ||
25/05/1929 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 768 from Hull Dairycoates (HLD) |