|
|
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Unknown Works | 1905 | 06/1905 | General | Boiler number G940 (Diagram 54Sat) |
|||
Unknown Works | 1907 | 04/1907 | General | Boiler number G915 (Diagram 54Sat) |
|||
Unknown Works | 1908 | 05/1908 | General | Boiler number G940 (Diagram 54Sat) |
|||
Unknown Works | 1911 | 05/1911 | General | Boiler number G830 (Diagram 54Sat) |
|||
Unknown Works | 1921 | 04/1921 | General | Superheated boiler fitted |
|||
Darlington Works | 28/10/1922 | 29/01/1923 | 94 days | General | |||
Darlington Works | 27/10/1925 | 05/02/1926 | 102 days | General |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
12/1899 | To Service | To service as North Eastern Railway Number 2004 Built at Gateshead Works, Works Number 22.99 Allocated to Hull Dairycoates (HLD) Diagram 54Sat boiler fitted |
||
1905 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Unknown Works (General) - Arr: ?/1905. Dep: ?/06/1905. Work undertaken: Boiler number G940 (Diagram 54Sat) |
||
1907 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Unknown Works (General) - Arr: ?/1907. Dep: ?/04/1907. Work undertaken: Boiler number G915 (Diagram 54Sat) |
||
1908 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Unknown Works (General) - Arr: ?/1908. Dep: ?/05/1908. Work undertaken: Boiler number G940 (Diagram 54Sat) |
||
1911 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Unknown Works (General) - Arr: ?/1911. Dep: ?/05/1911. Work undertaken: Boiler number G830 (Diagram 54Sat) |
||
1921 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Unknown Works (General) - Arr: ?/1921. Dep: ?/04/1921. Work undertaken: Superheated boiler fitted |
||
28/10/1922 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 28/10/1922. Dep: 29/01/1923. | ||
27/10/1925 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 27/10/1925. Dep: 05/02/1926. | ||
29/08/1928 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 2004 from Hull Dairycoates (HLD) |