Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 22 Online
» 3274 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 16680 Week
» 69696 Month
» 189223 Year
» 3216076 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
Great Eastern Railway |
1569 |
m/e |
06/1920 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1924) |
8569 |
m/e |
01/1924 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1942) |
7483 |
m/e |
Not applied |
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) |
1569 |
m/e |
11/1946 |
British Railways |
61569 |
m/e |
05/1949 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
S. Holden |
Class |
B12 |
Company History |
GER/LNER |
Wheels |
4-6-0 |
Builder |
Stratford Works |
Order Number |
H82 |
To Service |
During 06/1920 |
Withdrawal |
Tue 01/01/1957 |
Service Life |
36 yrs, 7 mths , 1 dy |
Disposal
Scrapping |
During 01/1957 |
|
Allocations
Code |
Subsequent Codes |
Name |
|
From Date |
|
|
(New) |
m/e |
06/1920 |
IPS |
|
Ipswich |
on |
01/01/1948 (Snapshot) |
|
|
Withdrawn |
on |
01/01/1957 |
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
ALLOC |
YAR |
Yarmouth South Town |
m/e |
03/12/1945 |
ALLOC |
IPS |
Ipswich |
on |
24/08/1947 |
WDN |
|
|
on |
01/01/1957 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified |
Modification |
12/1928 |
Vacuum Ejector fitted |
05/1932 |
ACFI feed water heating apparatus fitted |
12/1933 |
ACFI feed water heating apparatus removed |
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
06/1920 |
To Service |
To service as Great Eastern Railway Number 1569 Built at Stratford Works |
|
|
01/1924 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 8569 |
|
|
12/1928 |
Modification |
Modification: Vacuum Ejector fitted |
|
|
05/1932 |
Modification |
Modification: ACFI feed water heating apparatus fitted |
|
|
12/1933 |
Modification |
Modification: ACFI feed water heating apparatus removed |
|
|
1942 |
Number Allocated |
Allocated number 7483 but not taken up |
|
|
11/1946 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 1569 |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Ipswich (IPS) |
|
|
05/1949 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 61569 |
|
|
01/1957 |
Scrapped |
Scrapped |
|
|
01/01/1957 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 61569 |
|
|