Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 17 Online
» 3112 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 16518 Week
» 69534 Month
» 189061 Year
» 3215914 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
Great Eastern Railway |
1557 |
m/e |
02/1921 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1924) |
8557 |
m/e |
01/1924 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1942) |
7471 |
m/e |
Not applied |
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) |
1557 |
m/e |
10/1946 |
British Railways |
61557 |
m/e |
01/1950 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
S. Holden |
Class |
B12 |
Company History |
GER/LNER |
Wheels |
4-6-0 |
Builder |
Beardmore, Dalmuir, Glasgow |
Order Number |
W82 |
Works Number |
151 |
To Service |
During 02/1921 |
Withdrawal |
Tue 01/01/1957 |
Service Life |
35 yrs, 11 mths , 1 dy |
Disposal
Scrapping |
During 02/1957 |
|
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
ALLOC |
STR |
Stratford |
on |
25/01/1947 |
ALLOC |
COL |
Colchester |
w/e |
07/02/1948 |
ALLOC |
30A |
Stratford |
4w/e |
26/12/1953 |
ALLOC |
30E |
Colchester |
4w/e |
10/11/1956 |
WDN |
|
|
on |
01/01/1957 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified |
Modification |
04/1927 |
Vacuum Ejector fitted |
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
02/1921 |
To Service |
To service as Great Eastern Railway Number 1557 Built at Beardmore, Dalmuir, Glasgow, Works Number 151 |
|
|
01/1924 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 8557 |
|
|
04/1927 |
Modification |
Modification: Vacuum Ejector fitted |
|
|
1942 |
Number Allocated |
Allocated number 7471 but not taken up |
|
|
10/1946 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 1557 |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Stratford (STR) |
|
|
07/02/1948 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Colchester (COL) |
|
|
01/1950 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 61557 |
|
|
19/12/1953 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Stratford (30A) |
|
|
17/11/1956 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Colchester (30E) |
|
|
01/01/1957 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 61557 |
|
|
02/1957 |
Scrapped |
Scrapped |
|
|