Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 6 Online
» 83 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 17886 Week
» 70902 Month
» 190429 Year
» 3217282 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
Great Eastern Railway |
1524 |
m/e |
05/1914 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1924) |
8524 |
m/e |
01/1924 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1942) |
7438 |
m/e |
Not applied |
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) |
1524 |
m/e |
09/1946 |
British Railways |
61524 |
m/e |
07/1948 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
S. Holden |
Class |
B12 |
Company History |
GER/LNER |
Wheels |
4-6-0 |
Builder |
Stratford Works |
Order Number |
R75 |
To Service |
During 05/1914 |
Withdrawal |
Thu 05/11/1953 |
Service Life |
39 yrs, 6 mths , 6 dys |
|
Allocations
Code |
Subsequent Codes |
Name |
|
From Date |
|
|
(New) |
m/e |
05/1914 |
KIT |
|
Kittybrewster |
on |
01/01/1948 (Snapshot) |
61C |
|
Keith |
4w/e |
11/07/1953 |
|
|
Withdrawn |
on |
05/11/1953 |
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
ALLOC |
61C |
Keith |
4w/e |
11/07/1953 |
WDN |
|
|
on |
05/11/1953 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified |
Modification |
07/1924 |
Vacuum Ejector fitted |
06/1931 |
ACFI feed water heating apparatus fitted |
06/1941 |
ACFI feed water heating apparatus removed |
|
Mentions ...
Report Date |
Title |
Report |
Source |
31/10/1949 |
Inverurie Works |
Locomotives entering Works during October: These included Nos. 61508/24, 62240/60/65, 64466/71, 64500, 4531, 5229, 65279, 68192, ex-L.M.S. 44254, 4324, 15136, 17251, 17359, 17450/51. |
SLS/194912 |
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
05/1914 |
To Service |
To service as Great Eastern Railway Number 1524 Built at Stratford Works |
|
|
01/1924 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 8524 |
|
|
07/1924 |
Modification |
Modification: Vacuum Ejector fitted |
|
|
06/1931 |
Modification |
Modification: ACFI feed water heating apparatus fitted |
|
|
06/1941 |
Modification |
Modification: ACFI feed water heating apparatus removed |
|
|
1942 |
Number Allocated |
Allocated number 7438 but not taken up |
|
|
09/1946 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 1524 |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Kittybrewster (KIT) |
|
|
07/1948 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 61524 |
|
|
11/07/1953 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Keith (61C) |
|
|
05/11/1953 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 61524 |
|
|