Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 23 Online
» 1400 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 14806 Week
» 67822 Month
» 187349 Year
» 3214202 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
Great Eastern Railway |
1515 |
m/e |
11/1913 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1924) |
8515 |
m/e |
01/1924 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1942) |
7429 |
m/e |
Not applied |
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) |
1515 |
m/e |
10/1946 |
British Railways |
61515 |
m/e |
03/1949 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
S. Holden |
Class |
B12 |
Company History |
GER/LNER |
Wheels |
4-6-0 |
Builder |
Stratford Works |
Order Number |
E75 |
To Service |
During 11/1913 |
Withdrawal |
Mon 12/11/1951 |
Service Life |
38 yrs , 12 dys |
Disposal
Scrapping |
During 04/1952 |
|
Allocations
Code |
Subsequent Codes |
Name |
|
From Date |
|
|
(New) |
m/e |
11/1913 |
STR |
|
Stratford |
on |
01/01/1948 (Snapshot) |
30E |
|
Colchester |
w/e |
07/07/1951 |
30E |
|
Colchester |
4w/e |
21/07/1951 |
|
|
Withdrawn |
on |
12/11/1951 |
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
ALLOC |
30E |
Colchester |
w/e |
07/07/1951 |
WDN |
|
|
on |
12/11/1951 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified |
Modification |
11/1928 |
Vacuum Ejector fitted |
05/1932 |
ACFI feed water heating apparatus fitted |
07/1938 |
ACFI feed water heating apparatus removed |
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
11/1913 |
To Service |
To service as Great Eastern Railway Number 1515 Built at Stratford Works |
|
|
01/1924 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 8515 |
|
|
11/1928 |
Modification |
Modification: Vacuum Ejector fitted |
|
|
05/1932 |
Modification |
Modification: ACFI feed water heating apparatus fitted |
|
|
07/1938 |
Modification |
Modification: ACFI feed water heating apparatus removed |
|
|
1942 |
Number Allocated |
Allocated number 7429 but not taken up |
|
|
10/1946 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 1515 |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Stratford (STR) |
|
|
03/1949 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 61515 |
|
|
07/07/1951 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Colchester (30E) |
|
|
21/07/1951 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Colchester (30E) |
|
|
12/11/1951 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 61515 |
|
|
04/1952 |
Scrapped |
Scrapped |
|
|