|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Gorton Works | 02/11/1912 | 18/01/1913 | 78 days | General | Boiler number 1217 (Diagram GC9) |
||
Gorton Works | 03/09/1921 | 26/11/1921 | 85 days | General | |||
Gorton Works | 09/02/1924 | 26/04/1924 | 78 days | General | Boiler number 42 (Diagram GC9) Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 6108 |
||
Gorton Works | 04/12/1926 | 05/02/1927 | 64 days | General | |||
Gorton Works | 28/04/1928 | 30/06/1928 | 64 days | General | Superheated boiler fitted Boiler number 852 (Diagram 17Sup) |
||
Gorton Works | 17/05/1930 | 28/06/1930 | 43 days | General | |||
Gorton Works | 23/07/1932 | 13/08/1932 | 22 days | General | Boiler number 601 (Diagram 17Sup) |
||
Gorton Works | 16/02/1935 | 23/02/1935 | 8 days | General | Boiler number 841 (Diagram 17Sup) |
||
Gorton Works | 28/11/1936 | 12/12/1936 | 15 days | General | Boiler number 912 (Diagram 17Sup) |
||
Gorton Works | 06/02/1937 | 27/02/1937 | 22 days | Light Repair | Left hand cylinder broken |
||
Gorton Works | 13/05/1939 | 10/06/1939 | 29 days | General | Boiler number 642 (Diagram 17Sup) |
||
Gorton Works | 22/04/1942 | 09/05/1942 | 18 days | General | Boiler number 1903 (Diagram 17Sup) |
||
Gorton Works | 08/02/1944 | 11/03/1944 | 33 days | General | |||
Gorton Works | 16/06/1945 | 16/06/1945 | 1 day | Light Repair | Tender repair only |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
09/1906 | To Service | To service as Great Central Railway Number 1108 Built at Beyer Peacock Ltd., Works Number 4809 Diagram GC9 boiler fitted |
||
02/11/1912 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 02/11/1912. Dep: 18/01/1913. Work undertaken: Boiler number 1217 (Diagram GC9) |
||
03/09/1921 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 03/09/1921. Dep: 26/11/1921. | ||
19/05/1922 | Allocation | Reallocated to Lincoln (LIN) | ||
09/02/1924 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 09/02/1924. Dep: 26/04/1924. Work undertaken: Boiler number 42 (Diagram GC9) Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 6108 |
||
04/12/1926 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 04/12/1926. Dep: 05/02/1927. | ||
10/02/1927 | Allocation | Reallocated to Gorton (GOR) | ||
28/04/1928 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 28/04/1928. Dep: 30/06/1928. Work undertaken: Superheated boiler fitted Boiler number 852 (Diagram 17Sup) |
||
08/08/1928 | Allocation | Reallocated to Trafford Park (LNER) (TFD) | ||
24/08/1928 | Allocation | Reallocated to Gorton (GOR) | ||
17/05/1930 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 17/05/1930. Dep: 28/06/1930. | ||
24/11/1930 | Allocation | Reallocated to Trafford Park (LNER) (TFD) | ||
11/07/1932 | Allocation | Reallocated to Gorton (GOR) | ||
23/07/1932 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 23/07/1932. Dep: 13/08/1932. Work undertaken: Boiler number 601 (Diagram 17Sup) |
||
29/08/1932 | Allocation | Reallocated to Trafford Park (LNER) (TFD) | ||
27/10/1932 | Allocation | Reallocated to Gorton (GOR) | ||
03/11/1932 | Allocation | Reallocated to Trafford Park (LNER) (TFD) | ||
02/02/1935 | Allocation | Reallocated to Gorton (GOR) | ||
16/02/1935 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 16/02/1935. Dep: 23/02/1935. Work undertaken: Boiler number 841 (Diagram 17Sup) |
||
19/07/1935 | Allocation | Reallocated to Trafford Park (LNER) (TFD) | ||
01/09/1936 | Allocation | Reallocated to Gorton (GOR) | ||
28/11/1936 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 28/11/1936. Dep: 12/12/1936. Work undertaken: Boiler number 912 (Diagram 17Sup) |
||
06/02/1937 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 06/02/1937. Dep: 27/02/1937. Work undertaken: Left hand cylinder broken |
||
04/03/1937 | Allocation | Reallocated to Trafford Park (LNER) (TFD) | ||
13/05/1939 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 13/05/1939. Dep: 10/06/1939. Work undertaken: Boiler number 642 (Diagram 17Sup) |
||
22/04/1942 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 22/04/1942. Dep: 09/05/1942. Work undertaken: Boiler number 1903 (Diagram 17Sup) |
||
08/02/1944 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 08/02/1944. Dep: 11/03/1944. | ||
16/06/1945 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 16/06/1945. Dep: 16/06/1945. Work undertaken: Tender repair only |
||
1946 | Number Allocated | Allocated number 1345 but not taken up | ||
09/11/1946 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 1472 | ||
02/06/1947 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 1472 from Trafford Park (LNER) (TFD) |