|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Gorton Works | 11/08/1923 | 03/11/1923 | 85 days | General | Renumbered to LNER (1923 Int) number 72C |
||
Gorton Works | 01/08/1925 | 07/11/1925 | 99 days | General | Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 5072 |
||
Gorton Works | 09/04/1927 | 18/06/1927 | 71 days | General | Boiler number 1921 (Diagram 13) |
||
Gorton Works | 16/03/1929 | 11/05/1929 | 57 days | General | |||
Gorton Works | 07/03/1931 | 11/04/1931 | 36 days | General | Boiler number 80 (Diagram 13) |
||
Gorton Works | 11/03/1933 | 01/04/1933 | 22 days | General | Boiler number 1931 (Diagram 13) |
||
Gorton Works | 29/09/1934 | 13/10/1934 | 15 days | General | Boiler number 1932 (Diagram 13) |
||
Gorton Works | 25/04/1936 | 16/05/1936 | 22 days | General | Boiler number 267 (Diagram 13) |
||
Gorton Works | 19/06/1937 | 17/07/1937 | 29 days | General | Boiler number 791 (Diagram 13) |
||
Gorton Works | 26/11/1938 | 17/12/1938 | 22 days | General | Boiler number 3002 (Diagram 13) |
||
Gorton Works | 24/08/1940 | 28/09/1940 | 36 days | General | Boiler number 784 (Diagram 13) |
||
Gorton Works | 27/02/1943 | 20/03/1943 | 22 days | General | Boiler number 86 (Diagram 13) |
||
Gorton Works | 16/06/1945 | 04/08/1945 | 50 days | General | |||
Gorton Works | 28/09/1946 | 05/10/1946 | 8 days | Light Repair | |||
Gorton Works | 18/01/1947 | 25/01/1947 | 8 days | Light Repair | After collision |
Report Date | Title | Report | Source |
---|---|---|---|
01/11/1948 | Darlington Works | The new Class 'A.1' locomotives, Nos. 60130-33, ex North Road bear Works Nos. 2049-52, in order. A minor change will be noticed in the new Darlington and Doncaster Works plates on the new 'A.1's,' they give the date, Works No. and origin, but no area is given. No. 68051 has been fitted with a modified bunker (and new cab windows), for increased coal capacity. Locomotives awaiting Works:-Nos. 827, 1601/29/30/42/51/55/72, 2992 (to scrap yard), 3007, 3344, 4916, 5710, 7307, 8089, 8400, 8686, 9099, 9392, 69841, 'Austerity' 77329 and Electric 26500. Locomotives ex Works:-Nos. 60507, 60980. 62366, 62711/23/75, 63398, 65028, 65118, 65752/85, 65803/83, 67256/65, 68051, 68395, 68437, 68533, 68675, 69372/92, 69787, 69882/91/93 and- 'Austerity' 77215. Locomotives broken up:-Nos. 1360/78, 5641, 8285, 8400 an 9399. It will be noticed that two of these were ex G.C.R. 'B.7' 4-6-0's. It is pleasing to note that the N.E. Area locomotives. especially Gateshead stock, are approaching their pre-grouping splendour for cleanliness. Some of the 'A.4's' are spotless, while the rest are creditable. |
SLS/194812 |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
05/1921 | To Service | To service as Great Central Railway Number 72 Built at Gorton Works, Works Number Diagram 13 boiler fitted |
||
25/05/1921 | Allocation | Reallocated to Gorton (GOR) | ||
11/08/1923 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 11/08/1923. Dep: 03/11/1923. Work undertaken: Renumbered to LNER (1923 Int) number 72C |
||
01/08/1925 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 01/08/1925. Dep: 07/11/1925. Work undertaken: Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 5072 |
||
09/04/1927 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 09/04/1927. Dep: 18/06/1927. Work undertaken: Boiler number 1921 (Diagram 13) |
||
26/06/1927 | Allocation | Reallocated to Immingham (IMM) | ||
16/03/1929 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 16/03/1929. Dep: 11/05/1929. | ||
09/05/1929 | Allocation | Reallocated to Gorton (GOR) | ||
07/03/1931 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 07/03/1931. Dep: 11/04/1931. Work undertaken: Boiler number 80 (Diagram 13) |
||
11/03/1933 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 11/03/1933. Dep: 01/04/1933. Work undertaken: Boiler number 1931 (Diagram 13) |
||
29/09/1934 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 29/09/1934. Dep: 13/10/1934. Work undertaken: Boiler number 1932 (Diagram 13) |
||
25/04/1936 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 25/04/1936. Dep: 16/05/1936. Work undertaken: Boiler number 267 (Diagram 13) |
||
05/03/1937 | Allocation | Reallocated to Woodford Halse (WFD) | ||
19/06/1937 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 19/06/1937. Dep: 17/07/1937. Work undertaken: Boiler number 791 (Diagram 13) |
||
26/11/1938 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 26/11/1938. Dep: 17/12/1938. Work undertaken: Boiler number 3002 (Diagram 13) |
||
24/08/1940 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 24/08/1940. Dep: 28/09/1940. Work undertaken: Boiler number 784 (Diagram 13) |
||
27/02/1943 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 27/02/1943. Dep: 20/03/1943. Work undertaken: Boiler number 86 (Diagram 13) |
||
30/10/1943 | Allocation | Reallocated to Gorton (GOR) | ||
16/06/1945 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 16/06/1945. Dep: 04/08/1945. | ||
28/09/1946 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 28/09/1946. Dep: 05/10/1946. | ||
20/10/1946 | Allocation | Reallocated to Sheffield Darnall (SHF) | ||
03/11/1946 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 1360 | ||
18/01/1947 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 18/01/1947. Dep: 25/01/1947. Work undertaken: After collision |
||
1948 | Number Allocated | Allocated number 61360 but not taken up | ||
10/09/1948 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 1360 from Sheffield Darnall (SHF) | ||
11/1948 | Scrapped | Broken up by Locomotive Works: Darlington |