|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Gorton Works | 08/07/1910 | 29/10/1910 | 114 days | General | Boiler number 1210 (Diagram 16Sat) |
||
Gorton Works | 29/07/1916 | 23/12/1916 | 148 days | General | Boiler number 1214 (Diagram 16Sat) |
||
Gorton Works | 14/01/1922 | 10/06/1922 | 148 days | General | Ross Pop |
||
Gorton Works | 30/08/1924 | 03/01/1925 | 127 days | General | Boiler number 1333 (Diagram 16Sat) Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 6098 |
||
Gorton Works | 11/07/1925 | 05/09/1925 | 57 days | General | |||
Gorton Works | 20/11/1926 | 05/02/1927 | 78 days | General | |||
Gorton Works | 18/08/1928 | 06/10/1928 | 50 days | General | Superheated boiler fitted Boiler number 922 (Diagram 16Sup) |
||
Gorton Works | 11/10/1930 | 15/11/1930 | 36 days | General | |||
Gorton Works | 18/06/1932 | 09/07/1932 | 22 days | General | Boiler number 801 (Diagram 16Sup) |
||
Gorton Works | 07/07/1934 | 18/08/1934 | 43 days | General | Rebuilt to class B4/3 |
||
Gorton Works | 28/11/1936 | 19/12/1936 | 22 days | General | Boiler number 132 (Diagram 16Sup) |
||
Gorton Works | 08/01/1938 | 29/01/1938 | 22 days | General | Boiler number 55 (Diagram 16Sup) |
||
Gorton Works | 21/08/1941 | 20/09/1941 | 31 days | General | Boiler number 922 (Diagram 16Sup) |
||
Gorton Works | 21/09/1943 | 09/10/1943 | 19 days | General | Boiler number 128 (Diagram 16Sup) |
||
Gorton Works | 27/09/1944 | 07/10/1944 | 11 days | Light Repair | |||
Gorton Works | 19/05/1945 | 26/05/1945 | 8 days | Light Repair | |||
Gorton Works | 25/08/1945 | 29/09/1945 | 36 days | General | Boiler number 127 (Diagram 16Sup) |
||
Gorton Works | 22/12/1945 | 19/01/1946 | 29 days | Light Repair | After derailment |
||
Gorton Works | 26/09/1949 | 26/09/1949 | 1 day | No repairs |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
06/1906 | To Service | To service as Great Central Railway Number 1098 Built at Beyer Peacock Ltd., Works Number 4819 Diagram 16Sat boiler fitted |
||
08/07/1910 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 08/07/1910. Dep: 29/10/1910. Work undertaken: Boiler number 1210 (Diagram 16Sat) |
||
29/07/1916 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 29/07/1916. Dep: 23/12/1916. Work undertaken: Boiler number 1214 (Diagram 16Sat) |
||
14/01/1922 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 14/01/1922. Dep: 10/06/1922. Work undertaken: Ross Pop |
||
06/10/1922 | Allocation | Reallocated to Sheffield Neepsend (SHF) | ||
01/1924 | Allocation | Reallocated to Mexborough (MEX) | ||
02/06/1924 | Allocation | Reallocated to Doncaster (DON) | ||
30/08/1924 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 30/08/1924. Dep: 03/01/1925. Work undertaken: Boiler number 1333 (Diagram 16Sat) Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 6098 |
||
10/01/1925 | Allocation | Reallocated to Copley Hill (Leeds) (COP) | ||
11/07/1925 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 11/07/1925. Dep: 05/09/1925. | ||
20/11/1926 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 20/11/1926. Dep: 05/02/1927. | ||
18/08/1928 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 18/08/1928. Dep: 06/10/1928. Work undertaken: Superheated boiler fitted Boiler number 922 (Diagram 16Sup) |
||
11/10/1930 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 11/10/1930. Dep: 15/11/1930. | ||
18/06/1932 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 18/06/1932. Dep: 09/07/1932. Work undertaken: Boiler number 801 (Diagram 16Sup) |
||
07/07/1934 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 07/07/1934. Dep: 18/08/1934. Work undertaken: Rebuilt to class B4/3 |
||
28/11/1936 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 28/11/1936. Dep: 19/12/1936. Work undertaken: Boiler number 132 (Diagram 16Sup) |
||
08/01/1938 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 08/01/1938. Dep: 29/01/1938. Work undertaken: Boiler number 55 (Diagram 16Sup) |
||
25/01/1940 | Allocation | Reallocated to Ardsley (ARD) | ||
21/08/1941 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 21/08/1941. Dep: 20/09/1941. Work undertaken: Boiler number 922 (Diagram 16Sup) |
||
21/09/1943 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 21/09/1943. Dep: 09/10/1943. Work undertaken: Boiler number 128 (Diagram 16Sup) |
||
27/09/1944 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 27/09/1944. Dep: 07/10/1944. | ||
19/05/1945 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 19/05/1945. Dep: 26/05/1945. | ||
25/08/1945 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 25/08/1945. Dep: 29/09/1945. Work undertaken: Boiler number 127 (Diagram 16Sup) |
||
22/12/1945 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 22/12/1945. Dep: 19/01/1946. Work undertaken: After derailment |
||
1946 | Number Allocated | Allocated number 1493 but not taken up | ||
03/11/1946 | Allocation | Reallocated to Copley Hill (Leeds) (COP) | ||
12/01/1947 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 1483 | ||
16/02/1947 | Allocation | Reallocated to Ardsley (ARD) | ||
1948 | Number Allocated | Allocated number 61483 but not taken up | ||
26/09/1949 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 1483 from Ardsley (ARD) | ||
26/09/1949 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (No repairs) - Arr: 26/09/1949. Dep: 26/09/1949. |