|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Doncaster Works | 14/01/1954 | 19/02/1954 | 37 days | General | Boiler number 28160 (Diagram 100A) |
||
Doncaster Works | 31/08/1955 | 06/10/1955 | 37 days | General | Boiler number 28540 (Diagram 100A) |
||
Doncaster Works | 28/02/1956 | 03/03/1956 | 5 days | Unclassified | |||
Doncaster Works | 30/04/1957 | 04/05/1957 | 5 days | Unclassified | |||
Doncaster Works | 14/01/1958 | 13/02/1958 | 31 days | General | Boiler number 28195 (Diagram 100A) |
||
Doncaster Works | 24/05/1960 | 01/07/1960 | 39 days | General | Boiler number 28822 (Diagram 100A) |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
11/01/1952 | To Service | To service as British Railways Number 61393 Built at North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow, Works Number 26852 Allocated to Doncaster (36A) Diagram 100A boiler fitted |
||
21/12/1952 | Allocation | Reallocated to Kings Cross (34A) | ||
27/12/1952 | Allocation | Reallocated to Kings Cross (34A) | ||
14/01/1954 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 14/01/1954. Dep: 19/02/1954. Work undertaken: Boiler number 28160 (Diagram 100A) |
||
13/06/1954 | Allocation | Reallocated to Kings Cross (34A) | ||
31/08/1955 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 31/08/1955. Dep: 06/10/1955. Work undertaken: Boiler number 28540 (Diagram 100A) |
||
28/02/1956 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 28/02/1956. Dep: 03/03/1956. | ||
30/04/1957 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 30/04/1957. Dep: 04/05/1957. | ||
14/01/1958 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 14/01/1958. Dep: 13/02/1958. Work undertaken: Boiler number 28195 (Diagram 100A) |
||
08/11/1959 | Allocation | Reallocated to New England (34E) | ||
24/01/1960 | Allocation | Reallocated to Kings Cross (34A) | ||
24/05/1960 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 24/05/1960. Dep: 01/07/1960. Work undertaken: Boiler number 28822 (Diagram 100A) |
||
16/06/1963 | Allocation | Reallocated to Mexborough (41F) | ||
09/1963 | Scrapped | Broken up by Cashmore's: Great Bridge | ||
22/09/1963 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 61393 from Mexborough (41F) |