|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Doncaster Works | 27/09/1953 | 30/10/1953 | 34 days | General | Boiler number 28158 (Diagram 100A) |
||
Doncaster Works | 25/04/1955 | 18/05/1955 | 24 days | Light Casual | |||
Doncaster Works | 25/07/1955 | 29/08/1955 | 36 days | General | Boiler number 28845 (Diagram 100A) |
||
Doncaster Works | 30/04/1957 | 07/06/1957 | 39 days | General | Boiler number 28180 (Diagram 100A) |
||
Doncaster Works | 11/06/1957 | 17/06/1957 | 7 days | Unclassified | |||
Stratford Works | 20/07/1959 | 28/08/1959 | 40 days | General | Boiler number 28236 (Diagram 100A) BR Automatic Warning System (AWS) fitted |
||
Doncaster Works | 05/09/1962 | 05/09/1962 | 1 day | No repairs |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
18/12/1951 | To Service | To service as British Railways Number 61391 Built at North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow, Works Number 26850 Allocated to New England (35A) Diagram 100A boiler fitted |
||
27/09/1953 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 27/09/1953. Dep: 30/10/1953. Work undertaken: Boiler number 28158 (Diagram 100A) |
||
25/04/1955 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 25/04/1955. Dep: 18/05/1955. | ||
25/07/1955 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 25/07/1955. Dep: 29/08/1955. Work undertaken: Boiler number 28845 (Diagram 100A) |
||
30/04/1957 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 30/04/1957. Dep: 07/06/1957. Work undertaken: Boiler number 28180 (Diagram 100A) |
||
11/06/1957 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 11/06/1957. Dep: 17/06/1957. | ||
20/07/1959 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Stratford Works (General) - Arr: 20/07/1959. Dep: 28/08/1959. Work undertaken: Boiler number 28236 (Diagram 100A) BR Automatic Warning System (AWS) fitted |
||
09/1962 | Scrapped | Broken up by Locomotive Works: Doncaster | ||
05/09/1962 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (No repairs) - Arr: 05/09/1962. Dep: 05/09/1962. | ||
10/09/1962 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 61391 from New England (34E) |