|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Gorton Works | 01/05/1954 | 05/06/1954 | 36 days | General | Boiler number 28399 (Diagram 100A) |
||
Darlington Works | 19/12/1955 | 16/01/1956 | 29 days | General | Boiler number 28346 (Diagram 100A) |
||
Darlington Works | 17/10/1957 | 25/10/1957 | 9 days | Unclassified | |||
Darlington Works | 13/08/1958 | 11/09/1958 | 30 days | General | Boiler number 28801 (Diagram 100A) Mechanical elements of ATC fitted |
||
Darlington Works | 03/10/1958 | 14/10/1958 | 12 days | Unclassified | |||
Darlington Works | 02/02/1959 | 16/02/1959 | 15 days | Unclassified | Electrical elements of ATC fitted |
||
Darlington Works | 18/12/1961 | 18/01/1962 | 32 days | General | Boiler number 28454 (Diagram 100A) |
||
Darlington Works | 06/03/1962 | 22/03/1962 | 17 days | Unclassified | |||
Darlington Works | 07/04/1964 | 25/05/1964 | 49 days | Heavy Casual | Boiler number 28142 (Diagram 100A) |
Report Date | Title | Report | Source |
---|---|---|---|
31/08/1952 | Selby-York | During the last three Sundays of August the East Coast main line was closed between Selby and York, owing to re-laying work at Escrick, main line trains being diverted via Shaftholm Junction, Askern and Church Fenton. An interesting working on Sunday, 24th August, was the 4.5 p.m. train from Wakefield to York; this arrived at Selby behind 61388 (37A) and left five minutes later for York, via Church Fenton (i.e., in the opposite direction) behind Class 4 2-6-0 43123 (50C). The train was retimed to arrive at York at 5.32 p.m. instead of 5.20 p.m., but due to smart running by 43123 actually arrived at 5.28 p.m. The 8.40 a.m. train from Glasgow to King's Cross on Sundays calls at Selby at 4.30 p.m.; on 24th August, connection from Selby with this train was being maintained by a special shuttle service operated by motor-fitted 'G.5' Class 0-4-4T 67250 (50C) with one of the push-and-pull sets normally used on the Selby-Goole service. It was amusing to watch the incredulous faces of passengers who on asking for 'the London train' were politely directed to 67250's two-coach train in the up bay platform. On the same date (24/8/52) six 'D20' Class 4-4-0s were at Selby shed, i.e., 2395, 62374/81/84/86/92; these D20s at Selby have recently been doing much useful work, mainly between Leeds-Selby-Hull, Selby-York, etc. although the writer of these notes regrets to record a recent Selby-Hull run when 62378 (also of Selby) had difficulty in starting away from Selby and also lost time in running. Although some of the Selby 'D20s' are in good condition (notably 62384/92), D.20/2 No. 62360 (52D) was brought down specially from Alnmouth Junction to work the SLS/MLS special between Cudworth and Hull via the Hull and Barnsley main line on 24th August. D.20s 62343/45 at York are working on Harrogate trains and also on the 5.55 p.m. train from York to Pickering via Gilling and Helmsley. The 6.30 p.m. from York to Harrogate is a Selby duty and Selby D.20s are used on occasions although more often this train is worked by one of the Selby Class 4 L.M.R. pattern 2-6-0s. An unusual visitor to York, on 21st August, was Class 4 2-6-0 43139 (68E) en route to Doncaster Works; in an adjacent shed road at the same time was A3 Class Pacific 60068 Sir Visto (also 68E) returning from Doncaster Works to Carlisle. | SLS/195211 |
14/01/1962 | Darlington Works (Erecting Shop) | Erecting Shop: D11, D256/71, D3316, D4083-8, D5107/8/49/72-5, 12119/20, 43053/7, 60812/98, 61275, 61388, 61454, 63381, 63467, 65768/72, 67638, 69005, 78026, 80118, 90397, 90620. Stripping Shop: 43071, 65892, 80117. Outside Stripping Shop: 60835, 61161, 92202. Works Yard: D18, D5096, 43055, 46450, 60809/22, 60963, 64897, 65099, 65862/9, 67681, 67718, 68017/43, 92064, 92199. Crossing: D17, D270/3, D2173, D2247/65, D3140, D4082, D5113. Scrap Road: 61411-3/5/9/36/43/50-2/9/60, 64979, 65741/69, 67707/13/22/39/50/72/5, 68688/9, 68729 all intact. | SLS/196203 |
25/04/1964 | Darlington Works (Erecting Shop) | Erecting Shop: D12, D25, D28, D181, D186, Dep. 84, D2078, D2605, D3140, D3455, D3656, D5106, D5155, D7591 painted, D7593 motors mounted, D7594, D7595 equipment fitted, D7596 body, 60124, 60133, 61016, 61256, 61289, 61388, 62065, 62067, 65882, 73004, 73071, 75056, 90047. Stripping Shop (Inside): 61306, 43033; Stripping Shop (Outside): 60011, 60864. Paint Shop (Inside): D182; Paint Shop (Outside): 75006 painted green. Level Crossing: D30, D3378 ex works, D3675, D7592 painted. Works Yard: D2700, D5166, D7597 body, 60973, 63399, 62057 frame, 65033, 65099, 73142 ex works, 90370 ex works. Works Shunter: 68037. Test House: Empty. North Road Scrap Yard: 63388, 65876. Shed (Waiting Works): 60020, 65880, 69020 Stored, 61304, 61321, 68046, 68051, 68054. | SLS/196406 |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
09/11/1951 | To Service | To service as British Railways Number 61388 Built at North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow, Works Number 26847 Allocated to Ardsley (37A) Diagram 100A boiler fitted |
||
02/11/1952 | Allocation | Reallocated to Copley Hill (Leeds) (37B) | ||
29/11/1952 | Allocation | Reallocated to Copley Hill (Leeds) (37B) | ||
01/05/1954 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 01/05/1954. Dep: 05/06/1954. Work undertaken: Boiler number 28399 (Diagram 100A) |
||
19/12/1955 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 19/12/1955. Dep: 16/01/1956. Work undertaken: Boiler number 28346 (Diagram 100A) |
||
17/10/1957 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 17/10/1957. Dep: 25/10/1957. | ||
13/08/1958 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 13/08/1958. Dep: 11/09/1958. Work undertaken: Boiler number 28801 (Diagram 100A) Mechanical elements of ATC fitted |
||
03/10/1958 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 03/10/1958. Dep: 14/10/1958. | ||
02/02/1959 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 02/02/1959. Dep: 16/02/1959. Work undertaken: Electrical elements of ATC fitted |
||
30/08/1959 | Allocation | Reallocated to York (North) (50A) | ||
18/12/1961 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 18/12/1961. Dep: 18/01/1962. Work undertaken: Boiler number 28454 (Diagram 100A) |
||
06/03/1962 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 06/03/1962. Dep: 22/03/1962. | ||
25/11/1962 | Allocation | Reallocated to Ardsley (56B) | ||
07/04/1964 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Heavy Casual) - Arr: 07/04/1964. Dep: 25/05/1964. Work undertaken: Boiler number 28142 (Diagram 100A) |
||
31/10/1965 | Allocation | Reallocated to Low Moor (56F) | ||
13/11/1966 | Allocation | Reallocated to Wakefield (56A) | ||
24/06/1967 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 61388 from Wakefield (56A) | ||
10/1967 | Scrapped | Broken up by Hughes Bolckows: North Blyth |