|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Doncaster Works | 01/07/1951 | 05/07/1951 | 5 days | Unclassified | |||
Doncaster Works | 09/06/1952 | 15/07/1952 | 37 days | General | Boiler number 28111 (Diagram 100A) |
||
Doncaster Works | 14/11/1952 | 03/12/1952 | 20 days | Unclassified | |||
Doncaster Works | 21/12/1952 | 23/12/1952 | 3 days | Special | Exam |
||
Doncaster Works | 30/03/1953 | 16/04/1953 | 18 days | Light Casual | |||
Doncaster Works | 08/10/1953 | 06/11/1953 | 30 days | Heavy Casual | Boiler number 28181 (Diagram 100A) |
||
Darlington Works | 08/07/1954 | 07/08/1954 | 31 days | General | Boiler number 28442 (Diagram 100A) |
||
Darlington Works | 30/08/1954 | 11/09/1954 | 13 days | Unclassified | |||
Doncaster Works | 25/02/1956 | 05/04/1956 | 41 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 27/10/1957 | 23/11/1957 | 28 days | General | Boiler number 28217 (Diagram 100A) |
||
Doncaster Works | 05/03/1959 | 18/03/1959 | 14 days | Unclassified | |||
Doncaster Works | 10/09/1959 | 01/10/1959 | 22 days | Light Casual | |||
Doncaster Works | 10/05/1960 | 10/06/1960 | 32 days | General | Boiler number 28202 (Diagram 100A) |
||
Doncaster Works | 06/03/1961 | 17/03/1961 | 12 days | Light Casual | |||
Doncaster Works | 31/07/1962 | 31/07/1962 | 1 day | No repairs |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
14/06/1951 | To Service | To service as British Railways Number 61379 Built at North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow, Works Number 26838 Allocated to Colwick (38A) Diagram 100A boiler fitted |
||
01/07/1951 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 01/07/1951. Dep: 05/07/1951. | ||
08/07/1951 | Allocation | Reallocated to Immingham (40B) | ||
13/07/1951 | Naming | Named 'MAYFLOWER' | ||
28/07/1951 | Allocation | Reallocated to Immingham (40B) | ||
09/06/1952 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 09/06/1952. Dep: 15/07/1952. Work undertaken: Boiler number 28111 (Diagram 100A) |
||
14/11/1952 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 14/11/1952. Dep: 03/12/1952. | ||
21/12/1952 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Special) - Arr: 21/12/1952. Dep: 23/12/1952. Work undertaken: Exam |
||
30/03/1953 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 30/03/1953. Dep: 16/04/1953. | ||
08/10/1953 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Heavy Casual) - Arr: 08/10/1953. Dep: 06/11/1953. Work undertaken: Boiler number 28181 (Diagram 100A) |
||
08/07/1954 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 08/07/1954. Dep: 07/08/1954. Work undertaken: Boiler number 28442 (Diagram 100A) |
||
30/08/1954 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 30/08/1954. Dep: 11/09/1954. | ||
25/02/1956 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 25/02/1956. Dep: 05/04/1956. | ||
27/10/1957 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 27/10/1957. Dep: 23/11/1957. Work undertaken: Boiler number 28217 (Diagram 100A) |
||
05/03/1959 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 05/03/1959. Dep: 18/03/1959. | ||
10/09/1959 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 10/09/1959. Dep: 01/10/1959. | ||
10/05/1960 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 10/05/1960. Dep: 10/06/1960. Work undertaken: Boiler number 28202 (Diagram 100A) |
||
06/03/1961 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 06/03/1961. Dep: 17/03/1961. | ||
31/07/1962 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (No repairs) - Arr: 31/07/1962. Dep: 31/07/1962. | ||
08/1962 | Scrapped | Broken up by Locomotive Works: Doncaster | ||
06/08/1962 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 61379 from Immingham (40B) |