|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Darlington Works | 09/12/1951 | 24/01/1952 | 47 days | General | Boiler number 28246 (Diagram 100A) |
||
Doncaster Works | 01/06/1953 | 06/07/1953 | 36 days | General | Boiler number 28866 (Diagram 100A) |
||
Doncaster Works | 15/09/1953 | 15/09/1953 | 1 day | Weighing | |||
Doncaster Works | 15/03/1955 | 07/04/1955 | 24 days | General | Boiler number 28532 (Diagram 100A) |
||
Doncaster Works | 14/02/1957 | 05/03/1957 | 20 days | Light Casual | |||
Doncaster Works | 03/09/1957 | 09/10/1957 | 37 days | General | Boiler number 28521 (Diagram 100A) |
||
Doncaster Works | 30/09/1959 | 24/10/1959 | 25 days | General | Boiler number 28251 (Diagram 100A) |
||
Doncaster Works | 19/03/1962 | 19/04/1962 | 32 days | General | Boiler number 28958 (Diagram 100A) |
||
Doncaster Works | 03/01/1963 | 15/01/1963 | 13 days | Unclassified |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
21/04/1950 | To Service | To service as British Railways Number 61365 Built at North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow, Works Number 26824 Allocated to Immingham (40B) Diagram 100A boiler fitted |
||
09/12/1951 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 09/12/1951. Dep: 24/01/1952. Work undertaken: Boiler number 28246 (Diagram 100A) |
||
01/06/1953 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 01/06/1953. Dep: 06/07/1953. Work undertaken: Boiler number 28866 (Diagram 100A) |
||
15/09/1953 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Weighing) - Arr: 15/09/1953. Dep: 15/09/1953. | ||
01/11/1953 | Allocation | Reallocated to Doncaster (36A) | ||
15/03/1955 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 15/03/1955. Dep: 07/04/1955. Work undertaken: Boiler number 28532 (Diagram 100A) |
||
14/02/1957 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 14/02/1957. Dep: 05/03/1957. | ||
03/09/1957 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 03/09/1957. Dep: 09/10/1957. Work undertaken: Boiler number 28521 (Diagram 100A) |
||
30/09/1959 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 30/09/1959. Dep: 24/10/1959. Work undertaken: Boiler number 28251 (Diagram 100A) |
||
19/03/1962 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 19/03/1962. Dep: 19/04/1962. Work undertaken: Boiler number 28958 (Diagram 100A) |
||
30/12/1962 | Allocation | Reallocated to Immingham (40B) | ||
03/01/1963 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 03/01/1963. Dep: 15/01/1963. | ||
11/07/1965 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 61365 from Immingham (40B) | ||
10/1965 | Scrapped | Broken up by Drapers: Hull |