|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Stratford Works | 17/12/1951 | 19/01/1952 | 34 days | General | Boiler number 28573 (Diagram 100A) |
||
Stratford Works | 05/08/1952 | 29/08/1952 | 25 days | Heavy Casual | |||
Stratford Works | 23/02/1954 | 02/04/1954 | 39 days | General | Boiler number 28201 (Diagram 100A) |
||
Stratford Works | 30/04/1956 | 16/06/1956 | 48 days | General | Boiler number 28857 (Diagram 100A) |
||
Stratford Works | 26/08/1958 | 03/10/1958 | 39 days | General | Boiler number 28421 (Diagram 100A) Modified bogie springs fitted |
||
Stratford Works | 06/04/1959 | 17/04/1959 | 12 days | Unclassified | BR Automatic Warning System (AWS) fitted |
||
Doncaster Works | 28/03/1961 | 06/05/1961 | 40 days | General | Boiler number 28755 (Diagram 100A) |
Report Date | Title | Report | Source |
---|---|---|---|
31/03/1950 | Queens Park Works | Further new Class 'K.1' 2-6-0's have appeared ex-Q.P. Works as follows: Nos. 62068 (14/2), 62069 (20/2) and 62070 (29/3) -the last of the batch. Further Works' Nos. checked are Nos. 62068 (26672/49) and 62070 (26674/49). No. 62070 carries a brass (B.R.) plate which reads '62070 1948.' New Class 'B.1' 4-6-0's were ex Q.P. Works as follows: Nos, 61360 (22/3), 61361 (24/3), 61362 (31/3) and 61363 (5/4). Works' Nos. checked are Nos. 61360-63 (26819-23/50), while Nos. 61360-62 all carry brass numberplates which read '1948.' These locomotives are being built under N.B.L. Order No. L.997. | SLS/195005 |
30/06/1950 | Special Trains | Two private specials from King's Cross to Clacton last spring went by way of the connecting link between the Enfield-Hertford line at Bounds Green Box and the Palace Gates branch, reaching the main line at Stratford. The first train consisted of eleven Pullmans hauled by.'N.2' Nos. 69576 an 69589 through Wood Green and over the flying junction to Bounds Green, near Bowes Park station: 'B.1' Nos. 61361 an 61363 then took over at the other end for the main journey. The second special was formed of eight coaches including two dining-cars: it was brought out from King's Cross by 'N.2' No. 9495, and taken forward similarly over the unusual route by 'B.17' No. 61606 Audley End. | SLS/195008 |
23/04/1961 | Doncaster Works (Erecting Shop) | New Erecting Shop: D2390/1, D3452, E3056/61-5. Stripping Road: D2402, D3152, D3487, 60033/8/9/64/83/8/95/8, 61814/49, 62049, 68945/90, 70010/35. Scrap Road: 64208/23/36, 64804/74/82, 68903/16/27/70/81, Crimpsall: 43149, 61384, 70001. Outside Crimpsall: DEPT7, 60143, 70053, 73012. Erecting Shop: D3445/89, D5573, D8217, 13252, 13326, 43126/44, 60020/40/63/8/75/90, 60126, 60520/8, 61162, 61205/11, 61363, 61897, 62025/42/60, 63985. Outside Erecting Shop: 60015, 61927, 62011. Paint Shop: D341, D2389, D5695, E3059/60, 60047/67, 60141, 60536, 61094, 73065. Works Shunters: DEPT10, DEPT11. | SLS/196106 |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
05/04/1950 | To Service | To service as British Railways Number 61363 Built at North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow, Works Number 26822 Allocated to Stratford (30A) Diagram 100A boiler fitted |
||
17/12/1951 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Stratford Works (General) - Arr: 17/12/1951. Dep: 19/01/1952. Work undertaken: Boiler number 28573 (Diagram 100A) |
||
05/08/1952 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Stratford Works (Heavy Casual) - Arr: 05/08/1952. Dep: 29/08/1952. | ||
23/02/1954 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Stratford Works (General) - Arr: 23/02/1954. Dep: 02/04/1954. Work undertaken: Boiler number 28201 (Diagram 100A) |
||
30/04/1956 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Stratford Works (General) - Arr: 30/04/1956. Dep: 16/06/1956. Work undertaken: Boiler number 28857 (Diagram 100A) |
||
06/01/1957 | Allocation | Reallocated to Colchester (30E) | ||
26/08/1958 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Stratford Works (General) - Arr: 26/08/1958. Dep: 03/10/1958. Work undertaken: Boiler number 28421 (Diagram 100A) Modified bogie springs fitted |
||
06/04/1959 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Stratford Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 06/04/1959. Dep: 17/04/1959. Work undertaken: BR Automatic Warning System (AWS) fitted |
||
06/12/1959 | Allocation | Reallocated to Stratford (30A) | ||
13/12/1959 | Allocation | Reallocated to March (31B) | ||
10/01/1960 | Allocation | Reallocated to Cambridge (31A) | ||
28/03/1961 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 28/03/1961. Dep: 06/05/1961. Work undertaken: Boiler number 28755 (Diagram 100A) |
||
17/06/1962 | Allocation | Reallocated to Stratford (30A) | ||
16/09/1962 | Allocation | Reallocated to March (31B) | ||
23/09/1962 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 61363 from March (31B) | ||
01/1964 | Scrapped | Broken up by Central Wagon Co.: Wigan |