|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Stratford Works | 10/09/1951 | 20/10/1951 | 41 days | General | |||
Stratford Works | 31/08/1953 | 26/09/1953 | 27 days | General | Boiler number 28564 (Diagram 100A) |
||
Stratford Works | 29/12/1954 | 21/05/1955 | 144 days | Light Casual | |||
Stratford Works | 26/09/1955 | 13/01/1956 | 110 days | General | Boiler number 28577 (Diagram 100A) |
||
Stratford Works | 27/01/1958 | 22/03/1958 | 55 days | General | Boiler number 28503 (Diagram 100A) Modified bogie springs fitted |
||
Doncaster Works | 20/07/1960 | 25/08/1960 | 37 days | General | Boiler number 28147 (Diagram 100A) |
Report Date | Title | Report | Source |
---|---|---|---|
31/03/1950 | Queens Park Works | Further new Class 'K.1' 2-6-0's have appeared ex-Q.P. Works as follows: Nos. 62068 (14/2), 62069 (20/2) and 62070 (29/3) -the last of the batch. Further Works' Nos. checked are Nos. 62068 (26672/49) and 62070 (26674/49). No. 62070 carries a brass (B.R.) plate which reads '62070 1948.' New Class 'B.1' 4-6-0's were ex Q.P. Works as follows: Nos, 61360 (22/3), 61361 (24/3), 61362 (31/3) and 61363 (5/4). Works' Nos. checked are Nos. 61360-63 (26819-23/50), while Nos. 61360-62 all carry brass numberplates which read '1948.' These locomotives are being built under N.B.L. Order No. L.997. | SLS/195005 |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
31/03/1950 | To Service | To service as British Railways Number 61362 Built at North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow, Works Number 26821 Allocated to Stratford (30A) Diagram 100A boiler fitted |
||
10/09/1951 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Stratford Works (General) - Arr: 10/09/1951. Dep: 20/10/1951. | ||
31/08/1953 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Stratford Works (General) - Arr: 31/08/1953. Dep: 26/09/1953. Work undertaken: Boiler number 28564 (Diagram 100A) |
||
29/12/1954 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Stratford Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 29/12/1954. Dep: 21/05/1955. | ||
26/09/1955 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Stratford Works (General) - Arr: 26/09/1955. Dep: 13/01/1956. Work undertaken: Boiler number 28577 (Diagram 100A) |
||
27/01/1958 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Stratford Works (General) - Arr: 27/01/1958. Dep: 22/03/1958. Work undertaken: Boiler number 28503 (Diagram 100A) Modified bogie springs fitted |
||
08/02/1959 | Allocation | Reallocated to Parkeston Quay (30F) | ||
20/07/1960 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 20/07/1960. Dep: 25/08/1960. Work undertaken: Boiler number 28147 (Diagram 100A) |
||
01/01/1961 | Allocation | Reallocated to Stratford (30A) | ||
16/09/1962 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 61362 from Stratford (30A) | ||
12/1962 | Scrapped | Broken up by Locomotive Works: Doncaster |