|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Darlington Works | 14/11/1949 | 19/11/1949 | 6 days | Unclassified | |||
Cowlairs Works | 01/10/1951 | 23/10/1951 | 23 days | Heavy Intermediate | |||
Cowlairs Works | 30/10/1953 | 05/12/1953 | 37 days | General | Boiler number 28636 (Diagram 100A) |
||
Cowlairs Works | 31/10/1955 | 26/11/1955 | 27 days | Heavy Intermediate | |||
Cowlairs Works | 07/12/1955 | 17/12/1955 | 11 days | Unclassified | |||
Cowlairs Works | 07/03/1957 | 13/04/1957 | 38 days | General | Boiler number 28654 (Diagram 100A) |
||
Cowlairs Works | 19/07/1957 | 03/08/1957 | 16 days | Unclassified | |||
Cowlairs Works | 22/05/1958 | 21/06/1958 | 31 days | Light Intermediate | |||
Cowlairs Works | 07/04/1959 | 21/04/1959 | 15 days | Unclassified | BR Automatic Warning System (AWS) fitted |
||
Cowlairs Works | 12/10/1959 | 03/11/1959 | 23 days | Unclassified | |||
Cowlairs Works | 09/09/1960 | 15/10/1960 | 37 days | Light Intermediate | |||
Cowlairs Works | 25/10/1960 | 27/10/1960 | 3 days | Unclassified | |||
Cowlairs Works | 02/03/1962 | 07/04/1962 | 37 days | General | Boiler number 10847 (Diagram 100A) |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
28/09/1949 | To Service | To service as British Railways Number 61356 Built at Darlington Works, Works Number 2078 Allocated to St Margarets (64A) Diagram 100A boiler fitted |
||
14/11/1949 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 14/11/1949. Dep: 19/11/1949. | ||
15/04/1951 | Allocation | Reallocated to Dalry Road (64C) | ||
21/04/1951 | Allocation | Reallocated to Dalry Road (64C) | ||
29/09/1951 | Allocation | Reallocated to St Margarets (64A) | ||
01/10/1951 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Heavy Intermediate) - Arr: 01/10/1951. Dep: 23/10/1951. | ||
06/10/1951 | Allocation | Reallocated to St Margarets (64A) | ||
30/10/1953 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (General) - Arr: 30/10/1953. Dep: 05/12/1953. Work undertaken: Boiler number 28636 (Diagram 100A) |
||
31/10/1955 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Heavy Intermediate) - Arr: 31/10/1955. Dep: 26/11/1955. | ||
07/12/1955 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 07/12/1955. Dep: 17/12/1955. | ||
07/03/1957 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (General) - Arr: 07/03/1957. Dep: 13/04/1957. Work undertaken: Boiler number 28654 (Diagram 100A) |
||
19/07/1957 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 19/07/1957. Dep: 03/08/1957. | ||
22/05/1958 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Light Intermediate) - Arr: 22/05/1958. Dep: 21/06/1958. | ||
07/04/1959 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 07/04/1959. Dep: 21/04/1959. Work undertaken: BR Automatic Warning System (AWS) fitted |
||
12/10/1959 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 12/10/1959. Dep: 03/11/1959. | ||
09/09/1960 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Light Intermediate) - Arr: 09/09/1960. Dep: 15/10/1960. | ||
25/10/1960 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 25/10/1960. Dep: 27/10/1960. | ||
02/03/1962 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (General) - Arr: 02/03/1962. Dep: 07/04/1962. Work undertaken: Boiler number 10847 (Diagram 100A) |
||
23/07/1964 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 61356 from St Margarets (64A) | ||
10/1964 | Scrapped | Broken up by Locomotive Works: Darlington |