|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Darlington Works | 31/08/1949 | 05/09/1949 | 6 days | Unclassified | Adjustments |
||
Darlington Works | 14/09/1949 | 14/09/1949 | 1 day | Unclassified | Tender to lower?? |
||
Darlington Works | 07/11/1949 | 12/11/1949 | 6 days | Unclassified | Pistons |
||
Inverurie Works | 15/12/1949 | 16/12/1949 | 2 days | Unclassified | Tablet catcher apparatus fitted |
||
Cowlairs Works | 04/12/1951 | 22/12/1951 | 19 days | Heavy Intermediate | |||
Cowlairs Works | 31/03/1954 | 01/05/1954 | 32 days | General | Boiler number 28624 (Diagram 100A) |
||
Cowlairs Works | 16/11/1955 | 17/12/1955 | 32 days | Light Intermediate | WPU Gear removed |
||
Cowlairs Works | 18/10/1956 | 03/11/1956 | 17 days | Unclassified | |||
Cowlairs Works | 18/05/1957 | 20/06/1957 | 34 days | Heavy Intermediate | |||
Cowlairs Works | 05/05/1958 | 22/05/1958 | 18 days | Light Casual | |||
Cowlairs Works | 09/01/1959 | 31/01/1959 | 23 days | General | Boiler number 28662 (Diagram 100A) |
||
Cowlairs Works | 22/09/1959 | 07/10/1959 | 16 days | Unclassified | |||
Cowlairs Works | 09/04/1960 | 28/05/1960 | 50 days | Light Intermediate | BR Automatic Warning System (AWS) fitted |
||
Cowlairs Works | 27/06/1962 | 05/07/1962 | 9 days | Light Casual |
Report Date | Title | Report | Source |
---|---|---|---|
31/07/1951 | G.N.O.S. Section - Keith | In an afternoon's observation at the Junction B1's 61343/8/52, D41's 62231/56, D40's 62262, 62264/9, and B12/1 61508 were seen. The B1's were in excellent condition. The others were just clean. 62269 has a crest and also a tender cab. 62231 in plain black appeared hauling a director's special, since involved in a crash at Dalguise on 1st August. 61508 was still in green as was 61528 seen at Craigellachie Junction: The Aberdeen-Inverness and a goods were both worked from Keith by Cal. 4-4-0's of 60A. The station was in the process of being repainted. | SLS/195109 |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
25/08/1949 | To Service | To service as British Railways Number 61352 Built at Darlington Works, Works Number 2074 Allocated to Kittybrewster (61A) Diagram 100A boiler fitted |
||
31/08/1949 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 31/08/1949. Dep: 05/09/1949. Work undertaken: Adjustments |
||
14/09/1949 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 14/09/1949. Dep: 14/09/1949. Work undertaken: Tender to lower?? |
||
07/11/1949 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 07/11/1949. Dep: 12/11/1949. Work undertaken: Pistons |
||
15/12/1949 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Inverurie Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 15/12/1949. Dep: 16/12/1949. Work undertaken: Tablet catcher apparatus fitted |
||
04/12/1951 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Heavy Intermediate) - Arr: 04/12/1951. Dep: 22/12/1951. | ||
31/03/1954 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (General) - Arr: 31/03/1954. Dep: 01/05/1954. Work undertaken: Boiler number 28624 (Diagram 100A) |
||
16/11/1955 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Light Intermediate) - Arr: 16/11/1955. Dep: 17/12/1955. Work undertaken: WPU Gear removed |
||
18/10/1956 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 18/10/1956. Dep: 03/11/1956. | ||
18/05/1957 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Heavy Intermediate) - Arr: 18/05/1957. Dep: 20/06/1957. | ||
05/05/1958 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 05/05/1958. Dep: 22/05/1958. | ||
09/01/1959 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (General) - Arr: 09/01/1959. Dep: 31/01/1959. Work undertaken: Boiler number 28662 (Diagram 100A) |
||
22/09/1959 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 22/09/1959. Dep: 07/10/1959. | ||
09/04/1960 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Light Intermediate) - Arr: 09/04/1960. Dep: 28/05/1960. Work undertaken: BR Automatic Warning System (AWS) fitted |
||
19/06/1961 | Allocation | Reallocated to Mallaig (63b) | ||
27/06/1962 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 27/06/1962. Dep: 05/07/1962. | ||
12/08/1962 | Allocation | Reallocated to Gorton (9G) | ||
22/10/1962 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 61352 from Gorton (9G) | ||
01/1963 | Scrapped | Broken up by Locomotive Works: Cowlairs |