|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Darlington Works | 07/02/1950 | 11/02/1950 | 5 days | Unclassified | Special exam of copper firebox liner |
||
Cowlairs Works | 09/04/1951 | 28/04/1951 | 20 days | Light Intermediate | |||
Cowlairs Works | 20/08/1952 | 19/09/1952 | 31 days | General | Boiler number 28645 (Diagram 100A) |
||
Inverurie Works | 04/02/1954 | 04/02/1954 | 1 day | Unclassified | |||
Inverurie Works | 02/06/1954 | 02/06/1954 | 1 day | Unclassified | |||
Cowlairs Works | 14/04/1955 | 14/05/1955 | 31 days | Heavy Intermediate | WPU Gear removed |
||
Cowlairs Works | 02/04/1957 | 11/05/1957 | 40 days | General | Boiler number 28823 (Diagram 100A) |
||
Cowlairs Works | 17/09/1958 | 18/09/1958 | 2 days | Unclassified | |||
Cowlairs Works | 23/01/1959 | 20/02/1959 | 29 days | Light Intermediate | BR Automatic Warning System (AWS) fitted |
||
Cowlairs Works | 24/11/1960 | 20/12/1960 | 27 days | Unclassified | |||
Cowlairs Works | 23/08/1961 | 14/10/1961 | 53 days | General | Boiler number 28632 (Diagram 100A) |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
16/08/1949 | To Service | To service as British Railways Number 61351 Built at Darlington Works, Works Number 2073 Allocated to Kittybrewster (61A) Diagram 100A boiler fitted |
||
07/02/1950 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 07/02/1950. Dep: 11/02/1950. Work undertaken: Special exam of copper firebox liner |
||
09/04/1951 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Light Intermediate) - Arr: 09/04/1951. Dep: 28/04/1951. | ||
20/08/1952 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (General) - Arr: 20/08/1952. Dep: 19/09/1952. Work undertaken: Boiler number 28645 (Diagram 100A) |
||
04/02/1954 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Inverurie Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 04/02/1954. Dep: 04/02/1954. | ||
02/06/1954 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Inverurie Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 02/06/1954. Dep: 02/06/1954. | ||
14/04/1955 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Heavy Intermediate) - Arr: 14/04/1955. Dep: 14/05/1955. Work undertaken: WPU Gear removed |
||
02/04/1957 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (General) - Arr: 02/04/1957. Dep: 11/05/1957. Work undertaken: Boiler number 28823 (Diagram 100A) |
||
19/08/1957 | Allocation | Reallocated to St Margarets (64A) | ||
17/09/1958 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 17/09/1958. Dep: 18/09/1958. | ||
23/01/1959 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Light Intermediate) - Arr: 23/01/1959. Dep: 20/02/1959. Work undertaken: BR Automatic Warning System (AWS) fitted |
||
24/11/1960 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 24/11/1960. Dep: 20/12/1960. | ||
23/08/1961 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (General) - Arr: 23/08/1961. Dep: 14/10/1961. Work undertaken: Boiler number 28632 (Diagram 100A) |
||
14/06/1964 | Allocation | Reallocated to Dalry Road (64C) | ||
13/07/1964 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 61351 from Dalry Road (64C) | ||
09/1964 | Scrapped | Broken up by Locomotive Works: Darlington |