27/11/1948 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways Number 61340 Built at Gorton Works, Works Number 998 Allocated to Eastfield (EFD) Diagram 100A boiler fitted |
|
|
15/08/1950 |
Works Visit |
Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Light Intermediate) - Arr: 15/08/1950. Dep: 01/09/1950. |
|
|
06/06/1952 |
Works Visit |
Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (General) - Arr: 06/06/1952. Dep: 07/07/1952. Work undertaken: Boiler number 28623 (Diagram 100A)
|
|
|
13/04/1954 |
Works Visit |
Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Light Intermediate) - Arr: 13/04/1954. Dep: 15/05/1954. |
|
|
11/02/1955 |
Works Visit |
Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 11/02/1955. Dep: 11/02/1955. |
|
|
27/01/1956 |
Works Visit |
Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Heavy Intermediate) - Arr: 27/01/1956. Dep: 10/03/1956. |
|
|
24/05/1957 |
Works Visit |
Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (General) - Arr: 24/05/1957. Dep: 29/06/1957. Work undertaken: Boiler number 28462 (Diagram 100A)
|
|
|
25/03/1959 |
Works Visit |
Works Visit - St. Rollox Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 25/03/1959. Dep: 11/04/1959. |
|
|
20/05/1959 |
Works Visit |
Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Heavy Intermediate) - Arr: 20/05/1959. Dep: 06/06/1959. |
|
|
30/01/1961 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Grangemouth (65F) |
|
|
06/03/1961 |
Works Visit |
Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 06/03/1961. Dep: 18/03/1961. |
|
|
17/05/1961 |
Works Visit |
Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (General) - Arr: 17/05/1961. Dep: 24/06/1961. Work undertaken: Boiler number 28637 (Diagram 100A)
|
|
|
16/10/1961 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Thornton Junction (62A) |
|
|
12/11/1961 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Dundee Tay Bridge (62B) |
|
|
27/03/1962 |
Works Visit |
Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 27/03/1962. Dep: 12/04/1962. |
|
|
28/03/1964 |
Works Visit |
Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Light Intermediate) - Arr: 28/03/1964. Dep: 16/05/1964. |
|
|
29/10/1964 |
Works Visit |
Works Visit - Inverurie Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 29/10/1964. Dep: 30/10/1964. |
|
|
13/11/1966 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Dundee Tay Bridge (62B) |
|
|
22/04/1967 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 61340 from Dundee West (62B) |
|
|
07/07/1967 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by P.W. McLellan: Langloan |
|
|