|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Darlington Works | 06/01/1950 | 02/02/1950 | 28 days | General | Boiler number 28224 (Diagram 100A) |
||
Darlington Works | 09/02/1950 | 15/02/1950 | 7 days | Unclassified | |||
Darlington Works | 27/06/1951 | 20/07/1951 | 24 days | General | |||
Darlington Works | 23/02/1953 | 21/03/1953 | 27 days | General | Boiler number 28458 (Diagram 100A) |
||
Darlington Works | 25/03/1953 | 28/03/1953 | 4 days | Unclassified | |||
Darlington Works | 11/03/1954 | 24/03/1954 | 14 days | Unclassified | |||
Darlington Works | 18/10/1954 | 13/11/1954 | 27 days | General | Boiler number 28224 (Diagram 100A) |
||
Darlington Works | 05/09/1956 | 03/10/1956 | 29 days | General | Boiler number 28209 (Diagram 100A) |
||
Darlington Works | 14/03/1957 | 19/03/1957 | 6 days | Light Casual | |||
Darlington Works | 09/09/1958 | 24/09/1958 | 16 days | Unclassified | |||
Darlington Works | 16/02/1959 | 13/03/1959 | 26 days | General | Boiler number 28547 (Diagram 100A) Mechanical elements of ATC fitted |
||
Darlington Works | 28/07/1959 | 29/07/1959 | 2 days | Unclassified | Electrical elements of ATC fitted |
||
Darlington Works | 14/08/1961 | 08/09/1961 | 26 days | General | Boiler number 28318 (Diagram 100A) |
||
Darlington Works | 14/10/1962 | 21/12/1962 | 69 days | Light Casual |
Report Date | Title | Report | Source |
---|---|---|---|
31/08/1948 | Queens Park Works | Further new Class 'B.1' 4-6-0's have appeared ex Q.P. Works as follows:-Nos. 61336 (5/8), 61337 (12/8) and 61338 (20/8), but No. 61339 (the last of the batch) had not appeared on 3/9. Additional Works' Nos. checked are Nos. 61336-38 (26237-39 of 1948) | SLS/194810 |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
20/08/1948 | To Service | To service as British Railways Number 61338 Built at North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow, Works Number 26239 Allocated to Neville Hill (NEV) Diagram 100A boiler fitted |
||
06/01/1950 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 06/01/1950. Dep: 02/02/1950. Work undertaken: Boiler number 28224 (Diagram 100A) |
||
09/02/1950 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 09/02/1950. Dep: 15/02/1950. | ||
19/11/1950 | Allocation | Reallocated to Heaton (52B) | ||
30/11/1950 | Allocation | Reallocated to Heaton (52B) | ||
01/01/1951 | Allocation | Reallocated to Neville Hill (50B) | ||
31/01/1951 | Allocation | Reallocated to Neville Hill (50B) | ||
27/06/1951 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 27/06/1951. Dep: 20/07/1951. | ||
02/09/1951 | Allocation | Reallocated to York (North) (50A) | ||
08/09/1951 | Allocation | Reallocated to York (North) (50A) | ||
23/02/1953 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 23/02/1953. Dep: 21/03/1953. Work undertaken: Boiler number 28458 (Diagram 100A) |
||
25/03/1953 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 25/03/1953. Dep: 28/03/1953. | ||
19/05/1953 | Allocation | Reallocated to To Southern Region (SR) | ||
21/06/1953 | Allocation | Reallocated to York (North) (50A) | ||
11/03/1954 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 11/03/1954. Dep: 24/03/1954. | ||
18/10/1954 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 18/10/1954. Dep: 13/11/1954. Work undertaken: Boiler number 28224 (Diagram 100A) |
||
25/09/1955 | Allocation | Reallocated to Darlington (51A) | ||
05/09/1956 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 05/09/1956. Dep: 03/10/1956. Work undertaken: Boiler number 28209 (Diagram 100A) |
||
14/03/1957 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 14/03/1957. Dep: 19/03/1957. | ||
09/09/1958 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 09/09/1958. Dep: 24/09/1958. | ||
16/02/1959 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 16/02/1959. Dep: 13/03/1959. Work undertaken: Boiler number 28547 (Diagram 100A) Mechanical elements of ATC fitted |
||
28/07/1959 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 28/07/1959. Dep: 29/07/1959. Work undertaken: Electrical elements of ATC fitted |
||
14/08/1961 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 14/08/1961. Dep: 08/09/1961. Work undertaken: Boiler number 28318 (Diagram 100A) |
||
14/10/1962 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 14/10/1962. Dep: 21/12/1962. | ||
16/06/1963 | Allocation | Reallocated to Neville Hill (55H) | ||
07/06/1964 | Allocation | Reallocated to Wakefield (56A) | ||
11/01/1965 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 61338 from Wakefield (56A) | ||
03/1965 | Scrapped | Broken up by Drapers: Hull |