|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Darlington Works | 05/07/1950 | 12/08/1950 | 39 days | General | Boiler number 9857 (Diagram 100A) |
||
Darlington Works | 11/06/1952 | 04/07/1952 | 24 days | General | Boiler number 28442 (Diagram 100A) |
||
Darlington Works | 09/07/1952 | 10/07/1952 | 2 days | Unclassified | |||
Darlington Works | 06/12/1953 | 19/12/1953 | 14 days | Light Casual | |||
Darlington Works | 20/05/1954 | 18/06/1954 | 30 days | General | Boiler number 28438 (Diagram 100A) |
||
Darlington Works | 27/09/1954 | 16/10/1954 | 20 days | Light Casual | |||
Darlington Works | 21/04/1955 | 30/04/1955 | 10 days | Light Casual | |||
Darlington Works | 05/03/1956 | 15/03/1956 | 11 days | Light Casual | |||
Darlington Works | 05/07/1956 | 20/08/1956 | 47 days | General | Boiler number 28238 (Diagram 100A) |
||
Darlington Works | 29/12/1958 | 27/01/1959 | 30 days | General | Boiler number 28454 (Diagram 100A) Mechanical elements of ATC fitted |
||
Darlington Works | 05/08/1959 | 19/08/1959 | 15 days | Unclassified | Electrical elements of ATC fitted |
||
Darlington Works | 18/08/1961 | 15/09/1961 | 29 days | General | Boiler number 28206 (Diagram 100A) |
||
Darlington Works | 27/09/1961 | 16/10/1961 | 20 days | Unclassified | |||
Darlington Works | 23/09/1964 | 06/11/1964 | 45 days | General | Boiler number 28449 (Diagram 100A) |
Report Date | Title | Report | Source |
---|---|---|---|
31/08/1948 | Queens Park Works | Further new Class 'B.1' 4-6-0's have appeared ex Q.P. Works as follows:-Nos. 61336 (5/8), 61337 (12/8) and 61338 (20/8), but No. 61339 (the last of the batch) had not appeared on 3/9. Additional Works' Nos. checked are Nos. 61336-38 (26237-39 of 1948) | SLS/194810 |
10/01/1963 | Birmingham | One incident during many which occurred during the bad weather was on 10th January, when the 7-35 a.m. Bristol-Bradford arrived in New Street hauled by B1 61337 piloted by 0-6-0PT 9453! They had replaced a diesel failure and were in turn replaced by 73091; however, this developed vacuum trouble and finally the train was cancelled at 1-10 p.m. (it was then over 3 hours late ) and the stock taken to Saltley. On 15th January, the Fawley tank empties were hauled through New St. by GWR 2-8-0 2841 . | SLS/196302 |
02/07/1967 | Eastern Region (North Eastern Section) steam stock (Low Moor) | Steam stock has been reduced to 124 as from 2nd July. The allocation of following classes is as under:- Q6 Sunderland: 63395. Tyne Dock: 63344/87, 63431. J27 Sunderland: 65795, 65811/55/79/82/92/94. K1 West Hartlepool: 62045. Tyne Dock: 62005/07/11/50/60. B1 Low Moor: 61030 Nyala, 61306/37. Jubilee Holbeck: 45562 Alberta, 45593 Kolhapur, 45697 Achilles. C1.5 Holbeck: 44826/28/52/96, 44912/43/83, 45080, 45219/73, 45428. Normanton: 44824/54/57, 44990, 45075. Low Moor: 44662/94, 45208. Of the 8F remaining on the N.E. Region, 4 are at Holbeck and 24 at Royston. The W.D. 2-8-0 are allocated to West Hartlepool (6), Sunderland (7), Normanton (14) and Low Moor (D; the 2-6-4Ts to Holbeck (4), Normanton (7), and Low Moor (5) and the C1.4 2-6-0s to West Hartlepool (D, North Blyth (4), Holbeck (2) and Normanton (3). There is still one steam locomotive in Departmental Stock J72 0-6-OT Deptl. 58 (ex 69005). | SLS/196708 |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
12/08/1948 | To Service | To service as British Railways Number 61337 Built at North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow, Works Number 26238 Allocated to Neville Hill (NEV) Diagram 100A boiler fitted |
||
29/08/1948 | Allocation | Reallocated to St Margarets (STM) | ||
04/09/1948 | Allocation | Reallocated to St Margarets (STM) | ||
31/10/1948 | Allocation | Reallocated to York (North) (YK) | ||
06/11/1948 | Allocation | Reallocated to York (North) (YK) | ||
05/07/1950 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 05/07/1950. Dep: 12/08/1950. Work undertaken: Boiler number 9857 (Diagram 100A) |
||
11/06/1952 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 11/06/1952. Dep: 04/07/1952. Work undertaken: Boiler number 28442 (Diagram 100A) |
||
09/07/1952 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 09/07/1952. Dep: 10/07/1952. | ||
06/12/1953 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 06/12/1953. Dep: 19/12/1953. | ||
20/05/1954 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 20/05/1954. Dep: 18/06/1954. Work undertaken: Boiler number 28438 (Diagram 100A) |
||
27/09/1954 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 27/09/1954. Dep: 16/10/1954. | ||
21/04/1955 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 21/04/1955. Dep: 30/04/1955. | ||
05/03/1956 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 05/03/1956. Dep: 15/03/1956. | ||
05/07/1956 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 05/07/1956. Dep: 20/08/1956. Work undertaken: Boiler number 28238 (Diagram 100A) |
||
29/12/1958 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 29/12/1958. Dep: 27/01/1959. Work undertaken: Boiler number 28454 (Diagram 100A) Mechanical elements of ATC fitted |
||
05/08/1959 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 05/08/1959. Dep: 19/08/1959. Work undertaken: Electrical elements of ATC fitted |
||
18/08/1961 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 18/08/1961. Dep: 15/09/1961. Work undertaken: Boiler number 28206 (Diagram 100A) |
||
27/09/1961 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 27/09/1961. Dep: 16/10/1961. | ||
23/09/1964 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 23/09/1964. Dep: 06/11/1964. Work undertaken: Boiler number 28449 (Diagram 100A) |
||
25/06/1967 | Allocation | Reallocated to Low Moor (56F) | ||
30/09/1967 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 61337 from Low Moor (55J) | ||
11/1967 | Scrapped | Broken up by T W Ward: Killamarsh |