|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Gorton Works | 13/08/1950 | 07/10/1950 | 56 days | General | Boiler number 28264 (Diagram 100A) |
||
Gorton Works | 14/10/1950 | 25/10/1950 | 12 days | Unclassified | |||
Stratford Works | 22/12/1952 | 21/02/1953 | 62 days | General | Boiler number 28539 (Diagram 100A) |
||
Stratford Works | 18/01/1955 | 12/03/1955 | 54 days | General | Boiler number 28841 (Diagram 100A) |
||
Stratford Works | 11/02/1957 | 28/03/1957 | 46 days | General | Boiler number 28152 (Diagram 100A) |
||
Stratford Works | 21/02/1958 | 09/05/1958 | 78 days | Light Casual | |||
Stratford Works | 17/03/1959 | 07/05/1959 | 52 days | General | Boiler number 28527 (Diagram 100A) BR Automatic Warning System (AWS) fitted |
||
Stratford Works | 12/05/1959 | 21/05/1959 | 10 days | Unclassified | |||
Stratford Works | 21/12/1959 | 08/01/1960 | 19 days | Unclassified | |||
Doncaster Works | 06/09/1962 | 26/10/1962 | 51 days | General | Boiler number 28304 (Diagram 100A) |
Report Date | Title | Report | Source |
---|---|---|---|
30/06/1948 | Queens Park Works | Further new Class 'B.1' 4-6-0's have appeared ex Q.P. Works as follows:-Nos. 61324 (1/6), 61325 (3/6), 61326 (8/6), 61327 (11/6), 61328 (16/6), 61329 (18/6), 61330 (23/6), 61331 (25/6), 61332 (30/6). No. 61315 was ex Works on 30/4. Further Works' Nos. checked are Nos. 61324-25 (26225-26/48), 61327-33 (26228-34/48). | SLS/194808 |
02/04/1959 | Stratford Works (Old Works) | Old Works, 43143 (40F), 61009 (40A), 61116 (14D), 61202 (40A), 61232 (30F), 61329 (30A), 61348 (31F), 61371 (31A), 61405 (40A), 64823 (40F), 69696 (30A). Diesel Sp., D206 (34B), 11138 (30F), 12078 (1A), 15203 (75C), D2550 (32B), D3094 (75A), D3301 (30A), D5304 (34B), D8404 (30A). Waiting Wks., 61575 (31A), 64650 (30E), 64677 (30A), 64715 (40E), 65556 (31A), 69637 (34C), 69669 (30A). Paint shop, 15215 (75C), 61375 (30A), Stripping Sp., 43105 (30A), 61573 Wdn, 69728 (30A). Foundry, 68541. Waiting cut up, 61566/76/80, 62536/82/8, 64651, 65467, 65574, 68574/638, 69600/10/6/9/23/7/34/5/59/66/76/716/31. | SLS/195905 |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
18/06/1948 | To Service | To service as British Railways Number 61329 Built at North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow, Works Number 26230 Allocated to New England (NWE) Diagram 100A boiler fitted |
||
12/06/1949 | Allocation | Reallocated to March (MAR) | ||
18/06/1949 | Allocation | Reallocated to March (MAR) | ||
20/10/1949 | Allocation | Reallocated to Lincoln (LIN) | ||
22/10/1949 | Allocation | Reallocated to Lincoln (LIN) | ||
13/08/1950 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 13/08/1950. Dep: 07/10/1950. Work undertaken: Boiler number 28264 (Diagram 100A) |
||
14/10/1950 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 14/10/1950. Dep: 25/10/1950. | ||
21/10/1951 | Allocation | Reallocated to Stratford (30A) | ||
27/10/1951 | Allocation | Reallocated to Stratford (30A) | ||
22/12/1952 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Stratford Works (General) - Arr: 22/12/1952. Dep: 21/02/1953. Work undertaken: Boiler number 28539 (Diagram 100A) |
||
19/05/1953 | Allocation | Reallocated to To Southern Region (SR) | ||
23/05/1953 | Allocation | Reallocated to Stratford (30A) | ||
18/01/1955 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Stratford Works (General) - Arr: 18/01/1955. Dep: 12/03/1955. Work undertaken: Boiler number 28841 (Diagram 100A) |
||
11/02/1957 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Stratford Works (General) - Arr: 11/02/1957. Dep: 28/03/1957. Work undertaken: Boiler number 28152 (Diagram 100A) |
||
21/02/1958 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Stratford Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 21/02/1958. Dep: 09/05/1958. | ||
17/03/1959 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Stratford Works (General) - Arr: 17/03/1959. Dep: 07/05/1959. Work undertaken: Boiler number 28527 (Diagram 100A) BR Automatic Warning System (AWS) fitted |
||
12/05/1959 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Stratford Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 12/05/1959. Dep: 21/05/1959. | ||
21/12/1959 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Stratford Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 21/12/1959. Dep: 08/01/1960. | ||
06/09/1962 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 06/09/1962. Dep: 26/10/1962. Work undertaken: Boiler number 28304 (Diagram 100A) |
||
16/09/1962 | Allocation | Reallocated to March (31B) | ||
28/10/1962 | Allocation | Reallocated to Doncaster (36A) | ||
17/04/1966 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 61329 from Doncaster (36A) | ||
05/1966 | Scrapped | Broken up by Cohens: Kettering |