|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Gorton Works | 12/02/1950 | 11/03/1950 | 28 days | General | Boiler number 5140 (Diagram 100A) |
||
Gorton Works | 15/03/1950 | 23/03/1950 | 9 days | Unclassified | |||
Darlington Works | 30/10/1951 | 05/12/1951 | 37 days | General | Boiler number 28241 (Diagram 100A) |
||
Doncaster Works | 09/02/1953 | 06/03/1953 | 26 days | General | Boiler number 28858 (Diagram 100A) |
||
Doncaster Works | 26/01/1954 | 19/02/1954 | 25 days | Heavy Casual | |||
Darlington Works | 05/12/1954 | 08/01/1955 | 35 days | General | Boiler number 28583 (Diagram 100A) |
||
Darlington Works | 11/01/1955 | 17/01/1955 | 7 days | Unclassified | |||
Doncaster Works | 29/03/1955 | 29/03/1955 | 1 day | Weighing | |||
Doncaster Works | 11/10/1956 | 15/01/1957 | 97 days | General | Boiler number 28423 (Diagram 100A) |
||
Doncaster Works | 11/08/1958 | 20/09/1958 | 41 days | General | Boiler number 28136 (Diagram 100A) |
||
Doncaster Works | 01/11/1958 | 10/11/1958 | 10 days | Light Casual | |||
Doncaster Works | 11/12/1958 | 30/12/1958 | 20 days | Light Casual | |||
Doncaster Works | 16/07/1959 | 21/07/1959 | 6 days | Unclassified | |||
Doncaster Works | 26/10/1960 | 24/11/1960 | 30 days | Heavy Intermediate |
Report Date | Title | Report | Source |
---|---|---|---|
30/06/1948 | Queens Park Works | Further new Class 'B.1' 4-6-0's have appeared ex Q.P. Works as follows:-Nos. 61324 (1/6), 61325 (3/6), 61326 (8/6), 61327 (11/6), 61328 (16/6), 61329 (18/6), 61330 (23/6), 61331 (25/6), 61332 (30/6). No. 61315 was ex Works on 30/4. Further Works' Nos. checked are Nos. 61324-25 (26225-26/48), 61327-33 (26228-34/48). | SLS/194808 |
29/01/1955 | York MPD | 69369 (34E) mentioned in last month's notes, duly proceeded to Darlington (Bank Top), but was not accepted into North Road works. After returning to York, it spent a considerable time under repair in York shed before proceeding to Darnall (39B) on transfer. 'J25' 65650 an 65654 are now in store at York together with 62345. On 15th January, a Sheffield to Middlesbrough football excursion (M886) was worked throughout by 44855 (19A), which took water in York station platforms. On the same date 61028 (38C) was at York en route for Darlington works for repair. Other GC Section 'Bls' for Darlington works recently have included 61141 (38C), 61152 (39B) and 61328 (40B). 'Patriot' 45510 (5A) was an unusual visitor at York on 17th January. On 21st January, the 9.22 a.m. Leeds (City) to Scarborough was worked by 'B16/1' 61445 (50B) instead of the usual Holbeck Class 5, but 44853 (20A) worked the 3.10 p.m. York to Leeds (City). | SLS/195503 |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
16/06/1948 | To Service | To service as British Railways Number 61328 Built at North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow, Works Number 26229 Allocated to Immingham (IMM) Diagram 100A boiler fitted |
||
12/02/1950 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 12/02/1950. Dep: 11/03/1950. Work undertaken: Boiler number 5140 (Diagram 100A) |
||
15/03/1950 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 15/03/1950. Dep: 23/03/1950. | ||
30/10/1951 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 30/10/1951. Dep: 05/12/1951. Work undertaken: Boiler number 28241 (Diagram 100A) |
||
09/02/1953 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 09/02/1953. Dep: 06/03/1953. Work undertaken: Boiler number 28858 (Diagram 100A) |
||
26/01/1954 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Heavy Casual) - Arr: 26/01/1954. Dep: 19/02/1954. | ||
05/12/1954 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 05/12/1954. Dep: 08/01/1955. Work undertaken: Boiler number 28583 (Diagram 100A) |
||
11/01/1955 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 11/01/1955. Dep: 17/01/1955. | ||
29/03/1955 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Weighing) - Arr: 29/03/1955. Dep: 29/03/1955. | ||
11/10/1956 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 11/10/1956. Dep: 15/01/1957. Work undertaken: Boiler number 28423 (Diagram 100A) |
||
11/08/1958 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 11/08/1958. Dep: 20/09/1958. Work undertaken: Boiler number 28136 (Diagram 100A) |
||
01/11/1958 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 01/11/1958. Dep: 10/11/1958. | ||
11/12/1958 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 11/12/1958. Dep: 30/12/1958. | ||
16/07/1959 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 16/07/1959. Dep: 21/07/1959. | ||
26/10/1960 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Heavy Intermediate) - Arr: 26/10/1960. Dep: 24/11/1960. | ||
22/09/1963 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 61328 from Immingham (40B) | ||
01/1964 | Scrapped | Broken up by Cashmore's: Great Bridge |