|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Gorton Works | 02/11/1949 | 03/11/1949 | 2 days | Unclassified | |||
Gorton Works | 06/06/1950 | 27/07/1950 | 52 days | General | Boiler number 9963 (Diagram 100A) |
||
Gorton Works | 29/07/1950 | 02/08/1950 | 5 days | Unclassified | |||
Darlington Works | 17/03/1952 | 15/04/1952 | 30 days | General | Boiler number 28565 (Diagram 100A) |
||
Gorton Works | 06/03/1954 | 10/04/1954 | 36 days | General | Boiler number 28138 (Diagram 100A) |
||
Gorton Works | 13/04/1954 | 23/04/1954 | 11 days | Unclassified | |||
Stratford Works | 06/04/1955 | 15/04/1955 | 10 days | Unclassified | |||
Stratford Works | 21/01/1956 | 25/02/1956 | 36 days | General | Boiler number 28374 (Diagram 100A) |
||
Stratford Works | 29/10/1957 | 07/12/1957 | 40 days | General | Boiler number 28836 (Diagram 100A) Modified bogie springs fitted |
||
Stratford Works | 19/08/1959 | 02/10/1959 | 45 days | General | Boiler number 28262 (Diagram 100A) BR Automatic Warning System (AWS) fitted |
||
Doncaster Works | 18/07/1960 | 12/08/1960 | 26 days | Light Casual | |||
Doncaster Works | 10/11/1961 | 08/12/1961 | 29 days | Light Casual |
Report Date | Title | Report | Source |
---|---|---|---|
31/05/1948 | Queens Park Works | Further new Class 'B.1' 4-6-0's have appeared ex Q.P. Works as follows:-Nos. 61316 (4/5), 61317 (6/5), 61318 (11/5), 61319 (14/5), 61320 (18/5), 61321 (20/5), 61322 (25/5) and 61323 (27/5). Further Works' Nos. checked are Nos. 61316-19 (26217-20/48), 61321-23 (26222-24/48). | SLS/194807 |
18/03/1959 | FA Cup excursions | The Norwich-Luton cup replay of 18th March brought the following to Birmingham New Street-Bls 61046/8 of 32A, 61204 of 31F and 61270/317 of 32A; Class 5s 44810/6 an 45238, all 14A. | SLS/195904 |
12/11/1961 | Doncaster Works (Outside New Erecting Shop) | New Erecting Shop: 13166, D8239, E3069-75; Outside New Erecting Shop: D5583, 61042, 61317, 73000/165. Stripping Road: 60015, 63973/87, 70041. Crimpsal: D3646. 43151, 60108; Outside Crimpsall: 60003/29/149, 73024 (89A). Erecting Shop: D3153, D3447/8, D3476-8, D5520, D5609/37/66, D5802, 43160, 60023/65/127/525, 70000/8, 73054; Outside Erecting Shop: 60154, 76045. Weigh House: D366; Outside Weigh House: 61389. Paint Shop: E3068, D3254, D5050, D5360, D5606, D5822 (Brush 323/61), D9017 (EE2922, V574 of 1961), 60021/162, 62037, 63980, 70013. Works Shunters: Dpt10/1. | SLS/196112 |
03/12/1961 | Doncaster Works (Crimpsal) | New Erecting Shop: D3474/7, E3070-6. Stripping Road: 60027, 60138, 63938, 73003. Scrap Road: Nil. Crimpsal: 60157, 61317, 70049, 73035. Outside Crimpsal: 60007, 60103. Boiler Park: 60048, 60109/51. Erecting Shop: D2026, D3153, D3325, D3451/74, D3646 D5520/68/9, D5612/3, D8215, 60029/71, 60149/60, 60523, 61286, 62048,, 63931/56/73, 70008/36/44, 73000/24. Outside Erecting Shop: 60148, 62034. Weigh House: D3478, D5050. Outside Weigh House: 60023, 61042. Paint Shop: D369, D5363, D5825, D9001/18, E3069, 60046, 61107, 63960/81/7, 73054. Paint Shop Yard: Nil. Works Shunters: DEPT. 10/1. | SLS/196201 |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
06/05/1948 | To Service | To service as British Railways Number 61317 Built at North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow, Works Number 26218 Allocated to Gorton (GOR) Diagram 100A boiler fitted |
||
19/06/1949 | Allocation | Reallocated to Sheffield Darnall (SHF) | ||
25/06/1949 | Allocation | Reallocated to Sheffield Darnall (SHF) | ||
02/11/1949 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 02/11/1949. Dep: 03/11/1949. | ||
06/06/1950 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 06/06/1950. Dep: 27/07/1950. Work undertaken: Boiler number 9963 (Diagram 100A) |
||
29/07/1950 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 29/07/1950. Dep: 02/08/1950. | ||
17/03/1952 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 17/03/1952. Dep: 15/04/1952. Work undertaken: Boiler number 28565 (Diagram 100A) |
||
06/03/1954 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 06/03/1954. Dep: 10/04/1954. Work undertaken: Boiler number 28138 (Diagram 100A) |
||
13/04/1954 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 13/04/1954. Dep: 23/04/1954. | ||
12/09/1954 | Allocation | Reallocated to Norwich Thorpe (32A) | ||
06/04/1955 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Stratford Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 06/04/1955. Dep: 15/04/1955. | ||
21/01/1956 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Stratford Works (General) - Arr: 21/01/1956. Dep: 25/02/1956. Work undertaken: Boiler number 28374 (Diagram 100A) |
||
29/10/1957 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Stratford Works (General) - Arr: 29/10/1957. Dep: 07/12/1957. Work undertaken: Boiler number 28836 (Diagram 100A) Modified bogie springs fitted |
||
19/08/1959 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Stratford Works (General) - Arr: 19/08/1959. Dep: 02/10/1959. Work undertaken: Boiler number 28262 (Diagram 100A) BR Automatic Warning System (AWS) fitted |
||
14/02/1960 | Allocation | Reallocated to Lincoln (40A) | ||
20/03/1960 | Allocation | Reallocated to Immingham (40B) | ||
18/07/1960 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 18/07/1960. Dep: 12/08/1960. | ||
10/11/1961 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 10/11/1961. Dep: 08/12/1961. | ||
16/09/1962 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 61317 from Immingham (40B) | ||
01/1963 | Scrapped | Broken up by Cohens: Ickles |