|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Gorton Works | 25/03/1950 | 06/05/1950 | 43 days | General | Boiler number 9964 (Diagram 100A) |
||
Gorton Works | 22/05/1950 | 25/05/1950 | 4 days | Unclassified | |||
Darlington Works | 16/04/1952 | 09/05/1952 | 24 days | General | Boiler number 28425 (Diagram 100A) |
||
Gorton Works | 09/01/1954 | 13/02/1954 | 36 days | General | Boiler number 28398 (Diagram 100A) |
||
Darlington Works | 06/10/1955 | 05/11/1955 | 31 days | General | Boiler number 28217 (Diagram 100A) |
||
Darlington Works | 30/08/1957 | 21/09/1957 | 23 days | General | Boiler number 28242 (Diagram 100A) |
||
Darlington Works | 29/09/1959 | 06/11/1959 | 39 days | General | Boiler number 28186 (Diagram 100A) |
||
Doncaster Works | 31/01/1961 | 17/02/1961 | 18 days | Unclassified | |||
Doncaster Works | 22/01/1962 | 03/03/1962 | 41 days | General |
Report Date | Title | Report | Source |
---|---|---|---|
30/04/1948 | Queens Park Works | Further new Class 'B.1' 4-6-0's have appeared ex Q.P. Works as follows:-Nos. 61304 (31/3), 61305 (1/4), 61306 (5/4), 61307 (7/4), 61308 (9/4), 61309 (15/4), 61310 (19/4), 61311 (21/4), 61312 (23/4), 61313 (27/4), 61314 (28/4) and 61315 (W/E 1/5) leaving only twenty-four to come. Additional Works' Nos. checked are Nos. 61305-09 (26206-10/48) and 61311-15 (26212-16/48). The 35 new 'L.1's' to be built at the Q.P. Works have been allotted Nos. 67731-65, while the 70 'K.1's ' which are also to be built there have been allotted Nos. 62001-70. | SLS/194806 |
30/06/1948 | Queens Park Works | Further new Class 'B.1' 4-6-0's have appeared ex Q.P. Works as follows:-Nos. 61324 (1/6), 61325 (3/6), 61326 (8/6), 61327 (11/6), 61328 (16/6), 61329 (18/6), 61330 (23/6), 61331 (25/6), 61332 (30/6). No. 61315 was ex Works on 30/4. Further Works' Nos. checked are Nos. 61324-25 (26225-26/48), 61327-33 (26228-34/48). | SLS/194808 |
28/01/1962 | Doncaster Works (Stripping Road) | New Erecting Shop: D5643, D8213, E3072-6. Stripping Road: D4055/63, 60129, 60853, 61285, 61315, 63630, 73036. Crimpsall: 60119, 63962. Outside Crimpsall: 60870, 60938, 61168, 62021/34. Scrap Road: 68900 intact, 61862, 61908 being cut up. Erecting Shop: D3482, D5525/95, D5642/57, 12126/33, 13288, 60043/61/78/83/97, 60107, 60817, 61252, 61374/5, 61899, 63571, 70003/7, 76021. Erecting Shop Yard: 60062, 60112. Boiler Park: 60014/47. Weigh House: D5547. Outside Weigh House: D3289, 61223, 63924, 68928, 70006. Paint Shop: D3336, D3487, D5371/2, D5822, E3070/1, 60087, 76046. Paint Shop Yard: Nil. Works Shunters: DEPT. 10/1. | SLS/196203 |
26/02/1962 | Doncaster Works (Paint Shop) | Works Yard: 43158, 60039/67, 60153, 60517, 60905/28, 61000/58, 61234, 62014, 63942. Stripping Shop: 60108, 60500, 63932. Outside Stripping Shop: 60040, 60162, 60850/75, 62034, 63652, 70036, 73016. Erecting Shop: D3129, D3440/80/2, D5655/63, D6707/9/15, D8210, 43080, 60030/2/51, 60129/39, 60871, 61281, 63630, 63872, 63945/84, 70038, 73036. Outside Erecting Shop: D5525, D5605/43/70, 60028. Weigh House: 60026, 60119. Scrap Road: 61818, 61945/66, 64177/91, 64245. Paint Shop: D380, D2408, D5376, E3071/2, 12126, 60078, 60870, 61315, 63571. New Erecting Shop: D6700, D8027, E3073-8. Boiler Shop: E3079/80. Works Shunters: DEPT.10/1, 63858, 68928. Ex-Works: 61285. | SLS/196204 |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
30/04/1948 | To Service | To service as British Railways Number 61315 Built at North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow, Works Number 26216 Allocated to Gorton (GOR) Diagram 100A boiler fitted |
||
03/10/1948 | Allocation | Reallocated to Sheffield Darnall (SHF) | ||
09/10/1948 | Allocation | Reallocated to Sheffield Darnall (SHF) | ||
25/03/1950 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 25/03/1950. Dep: 06/05/1950. Work undertaken: Boiler number 9964 (Diagram 100A) |
||
22/05/1950 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 22/05/1950. Dep: 25/05/1950. | ||
16/04/1952 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 16/04/1952. Dep: 09/05/1952. Work undertaken: Boiler number 28425 (Diagram 100A) |
||
09/01/1954 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 09/01/1954. Dep: 13/02/1954. Work undertaken: Boiler number 28398 (Diagram 100A) |
||
06/10/1955 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 06/10/1955. Dep: 05/11/1955. Work undertaken: Boiler number 28217 (Diagram 100A) |
||
30/08/1957 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 30/08/1957. Dep: 21/09/1957. Work undertaken: Boiler number 28242 (Diagram 100A) |
||
29/09/1959 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 29/09/1959. Dep: 06/11/1959. Work undertaken: Boiler number 28186 (Diagram 100A) |
||
31/01/1961 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 31/01/1961. Dep: 17/02/1961. | ||
22/01/1962 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 22/01/1962. Dep: 03/03/1962. | ||
16/06/1963 | Allocation | Reallocated to Canklow (41D) | ||
13/06/1965 | Allocation | Reallocated to Langwith Junction (41J) | ||
02/1966 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 32 | ||
10/02/1966 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 32 from Shirebrook (41J) | ||
02/10/1968 | Scrapped | Broken up by Hesslewoods: Attercliffe |