|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Gorton Works | 21/02/1950 | 25/03/1950 | 33 days | General | Boiler number 9921 (Diagram 100A) |
||
Gorton Works | 28/03/1950 | 29/03/1950 | 2 days | Unclassified | |||
Darlington Works | 18/02/1952 | 22/03/1952 | 34 days | General | Boiler number 28411 (Diagram 100A) |
||
Gorton Works | 19/12/1953 | 23/01/1954 | 36 days | General | Boiler number 28397 (Diagram 100A) |
||
Darlington Works | 05/09/1955 | 30/09/1955 | 26 days | General | Boiler number 28242 (Diagram 100A) |
||
Darlington Works | 17/05/1957 | 13/06/1957 | 28 days | General | Boiler number 28251 (Diagram 100A) |
||
Darlington Works | 18/06/1957 | 24/06/1957 | 7 days | Unclassified | |||
Darlington Works | 25/06/1958 | 11/07/1958 | 17 days | Light Casual | |||
Darlington Works | 29/09/1958 | 07/10/1958 | 9 days | Light Casual | |||
Doncaster Works | 21/08/1959 | 01/10/1959 | 42 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 14/02/1961 | 01/03/1961 | 16 days | Light Casual | |||
Doncaster Works | 12/07/1962 | 07/09/1962 | 58 days | General | Boiler number 28851 (Diagram 100A) |
Report Date | Title | Report | Source |
---|---|---|---|
30/04/1948 | Queens Park Works | Further new Class 'B.1' 4-6-0's have appeared ex Q.P. Works as follows:-Nos. 61304 (31/3), 61305 (1/4), 61306 (5/4), 61307 (7/4), 61308 (9/4), 61309 (15/4), 61310 (19/4), 61311 (21/4), 61312 (23/4), 61313 (27/4), 61314 (28/4) and 61315 (W/E 1/5) leaving only twenty-four to come. Additional Works' Nos. checked are Nos. 61305-09 (26206-10/48) and 61311-15 (26212-16/48). The 35 new 'L.1's' to be built at the Q.P. Works have been allotted Nos. 67731-65, while the 70 'K.1's ' which are also to be built there have been allotted Nos. 62001-70. | SLS/194806 |
19/02/1961 | Doncaster Works (Erecting Shop) | New Erecting Shop: D3063, D2385-9, E3056-61. New Erecting Shop Yard: E3062. Scrap Road: DEPT2, DEPT9, 61766, 64231, 68623, 68875, 68930/47/79, 69574. Stripping Road: D3452/85, 60010/23/92, 60118/36/40, 60529, 61950, 63943, 64878/85, 68943, 76032. Erecting Shop: D2233, D2402, D3165, D3575, D3630, D8210, 43081, 60030/1/68, 60103/10/29/39, 60521, 61138, 61254, 61313/8, 61807, 61901/13/61, 62032/50, 63926/86, 73001. Outside Erecting Shop: 60021/41, 61150, 61234, 61926, 63964, 73096. Crimpsall: 60133, 62039. Paint Shop: D318/33, D5686/7, D6708/9, D8046, 43152, 60514/34, 61096, 70054. Outside Paint Shop: 60124, 60522, 61165, 61954. Works Shunters: DEPT10 (ex-68911), DEPT11 (ex-68914), 68977. | SLS/196104 |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
27/04/1948 | To Service | To service as British Railways Number 61313 Built at North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow, Works Number 26214 Allocated to Gorton (GOR) |
||
03/10/1948 | Allocation | Reallocated to Sheffield Darnall (SHF) | ||
09/10/1948 | Allocation | Reallocated to Sheffield Darnall (SHF) | ||
21/02/1950 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 21/02/1950. Dep: 25/03/1950. Work undertaken: Boiler number 9921 (Diagram 100A) |
||
28/03/1950 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 28/03/1950. Dep: 29/03/1950. | ||
18/02/1952 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 18/02/1952. Dep: 22/03/1952. Work undertaken: Boiler number 28411 (Diagram 100A) |
||
19/12/1953 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 19/12/1953. Dep: 23/01/1954. Work undertaken: Boiler number 28397 (Diagram 100A) |
||
05/09/1955 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 05/09/1955. Dep: 30/09/1955. Work undertaken: Boiler number 28242 (Diagram 100A) |
||
17/05/1957 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 17/05/1957. Dep: 13/06/1957. Work undertaken: Boiler number 28251 (Diagram 100A) |
||
18/06/1957 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 18/06/1957. Dep: 24/06/1957. | ||
25/06/1958 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 25/06/1958. Dep: 11/07/1958. | ||
29/09/1958 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 29/09/1958. Dep: 07/10/1958. | ||
21/08/1959 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 21/08/1959. Dep: 01/10/1959. | ||
14/02/1961 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 14/02/1961. Dep: 01/03/1961. | ||
12/07/1962 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 12/07/1962. Dep: 07/09/1962. Work undertaken: Boiler number 28851 (Diagram 100A) |
||
16/06/1963 | Allocation | Reallocated to Canklow (41D) | ||
13/06/1965 | Allocation | Reallocated to Langwith Junction (41J) | ||
14/11/1965 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 61313 from Langwith Junction (41J) | ||
12/1965 | Scrapped | Broken up by Hughes Bolckows: North Blyth |