|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Stratford Works | 16/06/1949 | 20/08/1949 | 66 days | General | Boiler number 9909 (Diagram 100A) Renumbered to BR 61302 |
||
Stratford Works | 12/02/1951 | 31/03/1951 | 48 days | General | Boiler number 28541 (Diagram 100A) |
||
Stratford Works | 16/09/1952 | 01/11/1952 | 47 days | General | Boiler number 28521 (Diagram 100A) |
||
Stratford Works | 08/02/1954 | 10/02/1954 | 3 days | Unclassified | |||
Stratford Works | 02/03/1954 | 23/04/1954 | 53 days | General | Boiler number 28573 (Diagram 100A) Modified bogie springs fitted |
||
Stratford Works | 24/10/1955 | 28/01/1956 | 97 days | General | Boiler number 28504 (Diagram 100A) |
||
Doncaster Works | 07/11/1957 | 30/11/1957 | 24 days | General | Boiler number 28120 (Diagram 100A) |
||
Doncaster Works | 06/07/1960 | 04/08/1960 | 30 days | General | Boiler number 28195 (Diagram 100A) |
||
Doncaster Works | 19/11/1962 | 01/01/1963 | 44 days | General | Boiler number 28963 (Diagram 100A) |
Report Date | Title | Report | Source |
---|---|---|---|
31/03/1948 | Queens Park Works | Further new Class 'B1' 4-6-0's have appeared ex Q.P. Works as follows.-Nos.1285 9/2. 1286 (11/2), 1287 (13/2), 1288 (16/2), 1289 (18/2), 1290 (20/2), 1291 (24/2), 1292 (25/2), 1293 (27/2), 1294 (1/3), 1295 (3/3), 1296 (5/3), 1297 (10/3), 1298 (11/3), 1299 (12/3), 1300 (15/3), 1301 (17/3), 1302 (23/3) and 1303 (26/3). No. 1287 was the last to appear lettered L.N.E.R. No. 1288 and onwards have appeared with 'British Railways' on the tender in 9' high letters and the prefix letter 'E' in front of the number both on the cab side and the buffer beam; all lettering and numbering being in plain yellow Gill Sans style. This week's (3/4) deliveries are expected to appear as 61304 onwards. Further Works Nos. checked are: Nos. 1285-93 (26186-94/47) and 1294- 1303 (26195-204/48), and up to No. 1303 all have appeared with the small cast L.N.E.R. number plates on the cab sides, dated 1947 and not pre fixed 'E.' | SLS/194805 |
03/01/1966 | Colwick MPD | Consequent upon the transfer of Colwick depot to the London Midland Region on 3rd January, 1966, the following locomotives allocated to that depot have been transferred to L.M. Region Book Stock with effect from 2nd January: D2300/1/2, D3442/89/90, D3625/6/7/8, D4064/86, 61089/92/232/81/302/90, 63644/74/5/816/73, 90104/413/533/606/69/89/706. In addition, the L.M.R. locos. transferred to Colwick, on loan, have now been returned to L.M. Reg. stock, following the transfer of the depot to that Region, together with D3152/3/64/6 and D5195 which were also on loan. | SLS/196603 |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
22/03/1948 | To Service | To service as British Railways Number 1302 Built at North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow, Works Number 26203 Allocated to Cambridge (CAM) Diagram 100A boiler fitted |
||
16/06/1949 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Stratford Works (General) - Arr: 16/06/1949. Dep: 20/08/1949. Work undertaken: Boiler number 9909 (Diagram 100A) Renumbered to BR 61302 |
||
12/02/1951 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Stratford Works (General) - Arr: 12/02/1951. Dep: 31/03/1951. Work undertaken: Boiler number 28541 (Diagram 100A) |
||
16/09/1952 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Stratford Works (General) - Arr: 16/09/1952. Dep: 01/11/1952. Work undertaken: Boiler number 28521 (Diagram 100A) |
||
08/02/1954 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Stratford Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 08/02/1954. Dep: 10/02/1954. | ||
02/03/1954 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Stratford Works (General) - Arr: 02/03/1954. Dep: 23/04/1954. Work undertaken: Boiler number 28573 (Diagram 100A) Modified bogie springs fitted |
||
24/10/1955 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Stratford Works (General) - Arr: 24/10/1955. Dep: 28/01/1956. Work undertaken: Boiler number 28504 (Diagram 100A) |
||
07/10/1956 | Allocation | Reallocated to New England (35A) | ||
07/11/1957 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 07/11/1957. Dep: 30/11/1957. Work undertaken: Boiler number 28120 (Diagram 100A) |
||
06/07/1960 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 06/07/1960. Dep: 04/08/1960. Work undertaken: Boiler number 28195 (Diagram 100A) |
||
19/11/1962 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 19/11/1962. Dep: 01/01/1963. Work undertaken: Boiler number 28963 (Diagram 100A) |
||
03/01/1965 | Allocation | Reallocated to Colwick (40E) | ||
02/04/1966 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 61302 from Colwick (16B) | ||
05/1966 | Scrapped | Broken up by Cashmore's: Great Bridge |