|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Stratford Works | 03/12/1948 | 23/12/1948 | 21 days | Light Repair | |||
Stratford Works | 16/05/1949 | 25/06/1949 | 41 days | General | Boiler number 9889 (Diagram 100A) Renumbered to BR 61300 |
||
Stratford Works | 04/02/1951 | 22/03/1951 | 47 days | General | Boiler number 28539 (Diagram 100A) |
||
Stratford Works | 17/06/1952 | 21/06/1952 | 5 days | Unclassified | |||
Stratford Works | 17/11/1952 | 10/01/1953 | 55 days | General | Boiler number 28504 (Diagram 100A) Modified bogie springs fitted |
||
Stratford Works | 09/11/1953 | 02/12/1953 | 24 days | Unclassified | |||
Stratford Works | 13/09/1954 | 16/10/1954 | 34 days | General | Boiler number 28557 (Diagram 100A) |
||
Stratford Works | 19/03/1956 | 23/03/1956 | 5 days | Unclassified | |||
Stratford Works | 10/09/1956 | 19/10/1956 | 40 days | General | Boiler number 28452 (Diagram 100A) |
||
Stratford Works | 03/10/1958 | 28/11/1958 | 57 days | General | Boiler number 28349 (Diagram 100A) |
||
Stratford Works | 10/06/1959 | 26/06/1959 | 17 days | Unclassified | BR Automatic Warning System (AWS) fitted |
||
Stratford Works | 19/06/1960 | 22/06/1960 | 4 days | Light Casual | |||
Doncaster Works | 04/05/1961 | 03/06/1961 | 31 days | General | Boiler number 28542 (Diagram 100A) |
||
Doncaster Works | 13/08/1962 | 01/09/1962 | 20 days | Light Casual |
Report Date | Title | Report | Source |
---|---|---|---|
31/03/1948 | Queens Park Works | Further new Class 'B1' 4-6-0's have appeared ex Q.P. Works as follows.-Nos.1285 9/2. 1286 (11/2), 1287 (13/2), 1288 (16/2), 1289 (18/2), 1290 (20/2), 1291 (24/2), 1292 (25/2), 1293 (27/2), 1294 (1/3), 1295 (3/3), 1296 (5/3), 1297 (10/3), 1298 (11/3), 1299 (12/3), 1300 (15/3), 1301 (17/3), 1302 (23/3) and 1303 (26/3). No. 1287 was the last to appear lettered L.N.E.R. No. 1288 and onwards have appeared with 'British Railways' on the tender in 9' high letters and the prefix letter 'E' in front of the number both on the cab side and the buffer beam; all lettering and numbering being in plain yellow Gill Sans style. This week's (3/4) deliveries are expected to appear as 61304 onwards. Further Works Nos. checked are: Nos. 1285-93 (26186-94/47) and 1294- 1303 (26195-204/48), and up to No. 1303 all have appeared with the small cast L.N.E.R. number plates on the cab sides, dated 1947 and not pre fixed 'E.' | SLS/194805 |
28/05/1961 | Doncaster Works (Erecting Shops) | New Erecting Shop: D2392-4, D3489, E3062-7. Boiler Shop: E3068-70. Stripping Road: D2402, 60007/73, 60119/61, 61327, 61844/93, 61904/85/97, 62059, 63967, 70023. Scrap Road: 63947/58, 64970, 68916/29, 69561 all intact, with 63952 just cut up. Crimpsall: 70027, 73016. Outside Crimpsall: DEPT7, 60065. Erecting Shops: D2026, D2234, D3129/52, D3445, D5534/71, 12124, 13252, 13325, 43088, 43152/5, 60013/24/33/88/99, 60525, 61095, 61190, 61249, 61300/70, 61832, 62051, 63963, 70001/5/35. Outside Erecting Shops: 60017, 61845. Outside Weigh House: 43091, 60137, 62047. Paint Shop: D2390/1, D5698, D6715, D8215, D9004/5, E3056/61, 60038/9, 61122/88, 63938, 76031. Outside Paint Shop: D345/6. Works Shunters: DEPT10/1. | SLS/196107 |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
15/03/1948 | To Service | To service as British Railways Number 1300 Built at North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow, Works Number 26201 Allocated to March (MAR) Diagram 100A boiler fitted |
||
03/12/1948 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Stratford Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 03/12/1948. Dep: 23/12/1948. | ||
21/03/1949 | Allocation | Reallocated to Cambridge (CAM) | ||
26/03/1949 | Allocation | Reallocated to Cambridge (CAM) | ||
16/05/1949 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Stratford Works (General) - Arr: 16/05/1949. Dep: 25/06/1949. Work undertaken: Boiler number 9889 (Diagram 100A) Renumbered to BR 61300 |
||
04/02/1951 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Stratford Works (General) - Arr: 04/02/1951. Dep: 22/03/1951. Work undertaken: Boiler number 28539 (Diagram 100A) |
||
17/06/1952 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Stratford Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 17/06/1952. Dep: 21/06/1952. | ||
17/11/1952 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Stratford Works (General) - Arr: 17/11/1952. Dep: 10/01/1953. Work undertaken: Boiler number 28504 (Diagram 100A) Modified bogie springs fitted |
||
09/11/1953 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Stratford Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 09/11/1953. Dep: 02/12/1953. | ||
13/09/1954 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Stratford Works (General) - Arr: 13/09/1954. Dep: 16/10/1954. Work undertaken: Boiler number 28557 (Diagram 100A) |
||
19/03/1956 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Stratford Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 19/03/1956. Dep: 23/03/1956. | ||
10/09/1956 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Stratford Works (General) - Arr: 10/09/1956. Dep: 19/10/1956. Work undertaken: Boiler number 28452 (Diagram 100A) |
||
03/10/1958 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Stratford Works (General) - Arr: 03/10/1958. Dep: 28/11/1958. Work undertaken: Boiler number 28349 (Diagram 100A) |
||
14/12/1958 | Allocation | Reallocated to Colchester (30E) | ||
10/06/1959 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Stratford Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 10/06/1959. Dep: 26/06/1959. Work undertaken: BR Automatic Warning System (AWS) fitted |
||
06/12/1959 | Allocation | Reallocated to Stratford (30A) | ||
13/12/1959 | Allocation | Reallocated to March (31B) | ||
10/01/1960 | Allocation | Reallocated to Cambridge (31A) | ||
19/06/1960 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Stratford Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 19/06/1960. Dep: 22/06/1960. | ||
04/05/1961 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 04/05/1961. Dep: 03/06/1961. Work undertaken: Boiler number 28542 (Diagram 100A) |
||
17/06/1962 | Allocation | Reallocated to March (31B) | ||
13/08/1962 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 13/08/1962. Dep: 01/09/1962. | ||
25/11/1963 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 61300 from March (31B) | ||
12/1963 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 23 | ||
01/1966 | Scrapped | Broken up by Garnham, Harris and Elton: Chesterfield |