|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Gorton Works | 08/03/1949 | 23/04/1949 | 47 days | General | Boiler number 9773 (Diagram 100A) Renumbered to BR 61282 |
||
Stratford Works | 23/01/1950 | 30/01/1950 | 8 days | Unclassified | |||
Stratford Works | 30/03/1951 | 05/05/1951 | 37 days | General | Boiler number 28549 (Diagram 100A) |
||
Stratford Works | 09/02/1953 | 10/04/1953 | 61 days | General | Boiler number 28508 (Diagram 100A) Modified bogie springs fitted |
||
Doncaster Works | 11/01/1955 | 10/02/1955 | 31 days | General | Boiler number 28124 (Diagram 100A) |
||
Doncaster Works | 15/04/1955 | 04/05/1955 | 20 days | Light Casual | |||
Darlington Works | 19/10/1957 | 13/11/1957 | 26 days | General | Boiler number 28418 (Diagram 100A) |
||
Darlington Works | 17/11/1957 | 20/11/1957 | 4 days | Unclassified | |||
Doncaster Works | 23/09/1959 | 23/10/1959 | 31 days | General | Boiler number 28443 (Diagram 100A) |
Report Date | Title | Report | Source |
---|---|---|---|
29/02/1948 | Queens Park Works | Further new Class 'B.1' 4-6-0's have appeared ex Q.P. Works as follows: Nos. 1274 (9/1), 1275 (12/1), 1276 (14/1), 1277 (16/1), 1278 (19/1), 1279 (21/1), 1280 (23/1), 1281 (27/1), 1282 (28/1), 1283 (2/2), and 1284 (6/2). Additional Works' Nos. checked are: Nos. 1262 (26163 of 1947), 1274/5 (26175/6 of 1947), 1277/8 (26178/9 of 1947), 1280-4 (26181-5 of 1947). No. 1221 was observed at Cowlairs West Junction, bearing the name Sir Alexander Erskine Hill and still painted green and lettered L.N.E.R. This engine is now fitted with electric lighting | SLS/194803 |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
28/01/1948 | To Service | To service as London and North Eastern Railway Number 1282 Built at North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow, Works Number 26183 Allocated to Colwick (CLK) Diagram 100A boiler fitted |
||
21/11/1948 | Allocation | Reallocated to Leicester (G.C.) (LEI) | ||
27/11/1948 | Allocation | Reallocated to Leicester (G.C.) (LEI) | ||
08/03/1949 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 08/03/1949. Dep: 23/04/1949. Work undertaken: Boiler number 9773 (Diagram 100A) Renumbered to BR 61282 |
||
15/05/1949 | Allocation | Reallocated to Gorton (GOR) | ||
21/05/1949 | Allocation | Reallocated to Gorton (GOR) | ||
21/08/1949 | Allocation | Reallocated to Stratford (STR) | ||
27/08/1949 | Allocation | Reallocated to Stratford (STR) | ||
23/01/1950 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Stratford Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 23/01/1950. Dep: 30/01/1950. | ||
30/03/1951 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Stratford Works (General) - Arr: 30/03/1951. Dep: 05/05/1951. Work undertaken: Boiler number 28549 (Diagram 100A) |
||
09/02/1953 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Stratford Works (General) - Arr: 09/02/1953. Dep: 10/04/1953. Work undertaken: Boiler number 28508 (Diagram 100A) Modified bogie springs fitted |
||
27/09/1953 | Allocation | Reallocated to New England (35A) | ||
11/01/1955 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 11/01/1955. Dep: 10/02/1955. Work undertaken: Boiler number 28124 (Diagram 100A) |
||
15/04/1955 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 15/04/1955. Dep: 04/05/1955. | ||
19/10/1957 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 19/10/1957. Dep: 13/11/1957. Work undertaken: Boiler number 28418 (Diagram 100A) |
||
17/11/1957 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 17/11/1957. Dep: 20/11/1957. | ||
23/09/1959 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 23/09/1959. Dep: 23/10/1959. Work undertaken: Boiler number 28443 (Diagram 100A) |
||
16/09/1962 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 61282 from New England (34E) | ||
01/1963 | Scrapped | Broken up by R A Kings: Norwich |