|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Darlington Works | 17/01/1950 | 02/03/1950 | 45 days | General | Boiler number 28203 (Diagram 100A) Renumbered to BR 61274 |
||
Gateshead Works | 06/03/1950 | 10/03/1950 | 5 days | Unclassified | |||
Darlington Works | 22/03/1950 | 23/03/1950 | 2 days | Weighing | |||
Darlington Works | 19/02/1951 | 14/03/1951 | 24 days | Light Casual | |||
Darlington Works | 23/02/1952 | 21/03/1952 | 28 days | General | Boiler number 28417 (Diagram 100A) |
||
Darlington Works | 15/03/1954 | 10/04/1954 | 27 days | General | Boiler number 28415 (Diagram 100A) |
||
Darlington Works | 26/05/1954 | 24/06/1954 | 30 days | Light Casual | |||
Darlington Works | 15/03/1956 | 27/03/1956 | 13 days | Light Casual | |||
Darlington Works | 05/06/1956 | 02/07/1956 | 28 days | General | Boiler number 28196 (Diagram 100A) |
||
Darlington Works | 09/07/1956 | 11/07/1956 | 3 days | Unclassified | |||
Darlington Works | 19/09/1958 | 21/10/1958 | 33 days | General | Boiler number 28417 (Diagram 100A) Mechanical elements of ATC fitted |
||
Darlington Works | 07/10/1959 | 15/10/1959 | 9 days | Unclassified | Electrical elements of ATC fitted |
||
Darlington Works | 04/01/1962 | 17/02/1962 | 45 days | Heavy Intermediate |
Report Date | Title | Report | Source |
---|---|---|---|
29/02/1948 | Queens Park Works | Further new Class 'B.1' 4-6-0's have appeared ex Q.P. Works as follows: Nos. 1274 (9/1), 1275 (12/1), 1276 (14/1), 1277 (16/1), 1278 (19/1), 1279 (21/1), 1280 (23/1), 1281 (27/1), 1282 (28/1), 1283 (2/2), and 1284 (6/2). Additional Works' Nos. checked are: Nos. 1262 (26163 of 1947), 1274/5 (26175/6 of 1947), 1277/8 (26178/9 of 1947), 1280-4 (26181-5 of 1947). No. 1221 was observed at Cowlairs West Junction, bearing the name Sir Alexander Erskine Hill and still painted green and lettered L.N.E.R. This engine is now fitted with electric lighting | SLS/194803 |
07/02/1948 | Darlington Works | On 7/2 new 'L.1's' up to No. 9006 were complete and painted in North Road yard, Nos. 9001/2 are Darlington 2020/1 of 1948. Nos. 9001-3 are painted green and lettered L.N.E.R., while 9004 and upwards have 'BRITISH RAILWAYS' on the tank sides and the numbers on the bunkers; it is understood that they will be fitted with electric light and Westinghouse brakes. Nos. 9001/2 are at present working from Darlington on Saltburn turns. 'B.1' No. 1062 has been painted green and it is understood that 'B.1's' as they come in for shops will be dealt with in a similar manner. Locomotives awaiting Shops or scrapping during January included: 819, 958, 1881, 2111/2, 2361, 2713/8, 2939/41, 3124, 3252, 3339, 3404, 4756, 4860, 5030/44/98, 5639/45/46, 5769, 5804/31/49/78, 7266/74, 7608/43, 8308, 8402, 8725/27, 9379/86, 9422, 9775 an 9835, and Rail Cars Recovery and Hope. Locomotives ex Shops included: Nos. 1068, 1466, 2354/60/74/95, 3408/39/60, 5037, 5705/13/36/73, 7309/21, 7625/57, 8230/98, 8304, 8702/48, 9117, 9431, 9778/95/99, 9835/39/41/79/86/90. It is believed that the first two locomotives to be painted here with the words 'BRITISH RAILWAYS' and to have the number prefixed with an 'E' were Nos. E5696 and E5663, during W/E 31/1; all locomotives off North Road are now appearing in a similar manner. 'B.1's' Nos. 1273-6 have arrived at Bank Top shed, the first lot of a further ten to be allocated here; these will replace 'J.39's' which are going elsewhere | SLS/194803 |
28/02/1949 | Darlington Works | Locomotives awaiting Works during February included:-Nos. 1274, 1605/11/18/31/45, 2745/67, 3199, 3411, 5096, 5606/28, 5800, 7262, 8708, 9105, 60816, 60133, (adjustment), 61015 (damaged), 63140, 65057 (damaged in the Crook derailment), 65712, 67705/54, 69827 (NEA), Class '8' W.D. 77320 an 79239.To scrap yard: Nos. 3291/97/99, 3301/08/17/32, 63322 (badly damaged at Old Town Jct., Middlesboro').Locomotives ex Works during February included:-Nos. 60141, 60142 (Darlington 2061/1949-the first 1949 locomotive), 60143, 60509 (light repair), 60923, 60931 (light repair), 61022 (unlined black), 61161 (lined out), 61162 (unlined black), 61181/86, 61237/58, 61400, 61635/41, 61659 (light repair), 61660, 62353/59/78, 62718/32/64, 63341/49, 65098, 65601, 65633 (repaired at Gateshead-buffer beam snow plough fitted), 65712/49, 65827/60, 67255, 67386, 67623, 67714 (light repair), 68010/39, 68160, 68260, 69933, Class '8' W.D. 90252 (ex 77352), 90344 (ex 70877), 90613 (ex 77469). | SLS/194904 |
11/02/1962 | Darlington Works (Erecting Shop) | Erecting Shop: D14/7/8/24/6, D3071/4, D4087-92, D5108/48/73-5, 12120, 60807/35/7, 60931, 61035, 61274, 63438/64/70/2, 65892, 67742, 80117, 90310, 90677/95, 92202, Weigh House: Nil. Outside Weigh House: 82027, Stripping Shop: 46407, 65751, 80116. Outside Stripping Shop: 46460, 61039, 61383, 67753, 68064, 68672. Works Yard: D281, D2173, D2589, 43016/53/5/71, 60954/9/77/81, 63412, 65099, 65794, 65889, 67609, 68010/43, 80119. 90603. Crossing: D257/78/80, D2247, D4086, D5107/49. Scrap Road: 61201, 61368, 61411-3/5/9/36/43/50/1/60, 64979, 65741/69, 65839, 67707/22/7/39/50/75, 68063, 68674/80/88/9/98, 68703/29/34. | SLS/196204 |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
02/01/1948 | To Service | To service as London and North Eastern Railway Number 1274 Built at North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow, Works Number 26175 Allocated to Darlington (DAR) Diagram 100A boiler fitted |
||
17/01/1950 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 17/01/1950. Dep: 02/03/1950. Work undertaken: Boiler number 28203 (Diagram 100A) Renumbered to BR 61274 |
||
06/03/1950 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gateshead Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 06/03/1950. Dep: 10/03/1950. | ||
22/03/1950 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Weighing) - Arr: 22/03/1950. Dep: 23/03/1950. | ||
19/02/1951 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 19/02/1951. Dep: 14/03/1951. | ||
23/02/1952 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 23/02/1952. Dep: 21/03/1952. Work undertaken: Boiler number 28417 (Diagram 100A) |
||
17/05/1953 | Allocation | Reallocated to To Southern Region (SR) | ||
21/06/1953 | Allocation | Reallocated to Darlington (51A) | ||
15/03/1954 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 15/03/1954. Dep: 10/04/1954. Work undertaken: Boiler number 28415 (Diagram 100A) |
||
26/05/1954 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 26/05/1954. Dep: 24/06/1954. | ||
26/06/1955 | Allocation | Reallocated to York (North) (50A) | ||
25/09/1955 | Allocation | Reallocated to Darlington (51A) | ||
15/03/1956 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 15/03/1956. Dep: 27/03/1956. | ||
05/06/1956 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 05/06/1956. Dep: 02/07/1956. Work undertaken: Boiler number 28196 (Diagram 100A) |
||
09/07/1956 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 09/07/1956. Dep: 11/07/1956. | ||
19/09/1958 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 19/09/1958. Dep: 21/10/1958. Work undertaken: Boiler number 28417 (Diagram 100A) Mechanical elements of ATC fitted |
||
14/06/1959 | Allocation | Reallocated to Low Moor (56F) | ||
07/10/1959 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 07/10/1959. Dep: 15/10/1959. Work undertaken: Electrical elements of ATC fitted |
||
04/01/1962 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Heavy Intermediate) - Arr: 04/01/1962. Dep: 17/02/1962. | ||
23/12/1962 | Allocation | Reallocated to Wakefield (56A) | ||
23/11/1964 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 61274 from Wakefield (56A) | ||
01/1965 | Scrapped | Broken up by Cox and Danks: Wadsley Bridge |