|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Stratford Works | 06/03/1949 | 19/03/1949 | 14 days | Light Casual | Renumbered to BR 61272 |
||
Stratford Works | 27/05/1949 | 28/07/1949 | 63 days | General | Boiler number 9924 (Diagram 100A) |
||
Stratford Works | 31/08/1949 | 02/09/1949 | 3 days | Unclassified | |||
Stratford Works | 26/02/1950 | 17/03/1950 | 20 days | Light Casual | |||
Stratford Works | 05/11/1950 | 16/12/1950 | 42 days | General | Boiler number 28518 (Diagram 100A) |
||
Stratford Works | 19/05/1952 | 04/07/1952 | 47 days | General | |||
Darlington Works | 14/07/1954 | 11/08/1954 | 29 days | General | Boiler number 28189 (Diagram 100A) |
||
Darlington Works | 09/07/1956 | 21/08/1956 | 44 days | General | Boiler number 28415 (Diagram 100A) |
||
Doncaster Works | 31/01/1959 | 07/03/1959 | 36 days | General | Boiler number 28450 (Diagram 100A) |
||
Doncaster Works | 09/08/1961 | 16/09/1961 | 39 days | General | Boiler number 28854 (Diagram 100A) |
Report Date | Title | Report | Source |
---|---|---|---|
31/12/1947 | Queens Park Works | Further new Class 'B.1' 4-6-0's have appeared ex Q.P. Works as follows: Nos. 1253 (10/11), 1254 (12/11), 1255 (14/11), 1256 (17/11), 1257 (19/11), 1258 (21/11), 1259 (24/11), 1260 (26/11), 1261 (28/11), 1262 (1/12), 1263 (3/12), 1264 (5/12), 1265 (9/12), 1266 (10/12), 1267 (12/12), 1268 (16/12), 1269 (24/12), 1270 (25/12), 1271 (26/12), 1272 (29/12) and 1273 (30/12). Additional Works' Nos. checked are: Nos. 1251 (26152/47), 1252 (26153/47), 1253 (26154/47), 1254 (26155/47), 1256 (26157/47), 1257 (26158/47), 1259 (26160/47), 1260 (26161/47), 1261 (26162/47), 1263 (26164/47), 1264 (26165/47), 1266 (26167/47), 1267 (26168/47), 1270 (26171/47), 1271 (26172/47) and 1272 (26173/47). | SLS/194802 |
31/08/1949 | M. & G.N. R. Line | On the Melton Constable-Cromer route the majority of trains are hauled by 'D.16' 4-4-0's, of which class eight examples were noted, apparently working out their time on far from onerous duties; while the heavier holiday trains at week-ends brought 'B.12' and 'B.17' 4-6-0's and 'K.2' and 'K.3' 2-6--0's. The ubiquitous 'B.1' class was in evidence, though usually on goods workings, and the same applies to the 'J.39' 0-6-0's. Ex-G.N, 0-6-0 No, 64249 ('J.6') and ex-G.E. 0-6-0's Nos. 5567 ('J.17') and 64653 ('J.19') were seen on passenger trains. Tank engines noted were Nos. 7664, 67677 an 67679 ('V.1') and No. 69679 ('N.7'), which were by no means hard pressed in handling two, three and four coach trains on this route, while occasionally an ex-G.E. 2-4-2T put in an appearance. Except for No. 61272 ('B.1') and No. 64249 ('J.6'), which were freshly painted in standard British Railways livery, the engines noted compared very unfavourably with those of earlier days in the matter of cleanliness. Most of the passenger trains were made up of corridor stock ranging from modern L.N.E. and L.M.S. vehicles to ex-E.C.J.S., G.E.. N.E. and N.B. coaches, with a considerable proportion of ex-L.N.W 'flat' roofed stock transferred to the M. & G.N. and now in former L.N.E. varnished teak livery. The average train set would get high marks for interest but little for uniformity. | SLS/194910 |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
29/12/1947 | To Service | To service as London and North Eastern Railway Number 1272 Built at North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow, Works Number 26173 Allocated to Norwich Thorpe (NOR) Diagram 100A boiler fitted |
||
06/03/1949 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Stratford Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 06/03/1949. Dep: 19/03/1949. Work undertaken: Renumbered to BR 61272 |
||
27/05/1949 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Stratford Works (General) - Arr: 27/05/1949. Dep: 28/07/1949. Work undertaken: Boiler number 9924 (Diagram 100A) |
||
31/08/1949 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Stratford Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 31/08/1949. Dep: 02/09/1949. | ||
26/02/1950 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Stratford Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 26/02/1950. Dep: 17/03/1950. | ||
05/11/1950 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Stratford Works (General) - Arr: 05/11/1950. Dep: 16/12/1950. Work undertaken: Boiler number 28518 (Diagram 100A) |
||
19/05/1952 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Stratford Works (General) - Arr: 19/05/1952. Dep: 04/07/1952. | ||
20/09/1953 | Allocation | Reallocated to Colwick (38A) | ||
14/07/1954 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 14/07/1954. Dep: 11/08/1954. Work undertaken: Boiler number 28189 (Diagram 100A) |
||
19/12/1954 | Allocation | Reallocated to Leicester (G.C.) (38C) | ||
20/02/1955 | Allocation | Reallocated to Colwick (38A) | ||
09/07/1956 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 09/07/1956. Dep: 21/08/1956. Work undertaken: Boiler number 28415 (Diagram 100A) |
||
17/02/1957 | Allocation | Reallocated to Annesley (38B) | ||
26/01/1958 | Allocation | Reallocated to Sheffield Darnall (41A) | ||
19/10/1958 | Allocation | Reallocated to Kings Cross (34A) | ||
31/01/1959 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 31/01/1959. Dep: 07/03/1959. Work undertaken: Boiler number 28450 (Diagram 100A) |
||
19/04/1959 | Allocation | Reallocated to New England (34E) | ||
09/08/1961 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 09/08/1961. Dep: 16/09/1961. Work undertaken: Boiler number 28854 (Diagram 100A) |
||
01/1965 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 25 | ||
03/01/1965 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 25 from New England (34E) | ||
01/1966 | Scrapped | Broken up by Garnham, Harris and Elton: Chesterfield |