|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Gateshead Works | 27/11/1948 | 27/11/1948 | 1 day | Light Repair | Renumbered to BR 61255 |
||
Darlington Works | 28/09/1949 | 22/10/1949 | 25 days | General | Boiler number 9878 (Diagram 100A) |
||
Darlington Works | 25/10/1949 | 27/10/1949 | 3 days | Unclassified | |||
Darlington Works | 15/10/1951 | 09/11/1951 | 26 days | General | Boiler number 28233 (Diagram 100A) |
||
Darlington Works | 08/01/1954 | 30/01/1954 | 23 days | General | Boiler number 28403 (Diagram 100A) |
||
Darlington Works | 01/02/1954 | 02/02/1954 | 2 days | Unclassified | |||
Darlington Works | 07/09/1955 | 13/09/1955 | 7 days | Unclassified | |||
Darlington Works | 06/03/1956 | 04/04/1956 | 30 days | General | Boiler number 28440 (Diagram 100A) |
||
Darlington Works | 02/05/1958 | 05/06/1958 | 35 days | General | Boiler number 28513 (Diagram 100A) |
||
Darlington Works | 10/06/1958 | 18/06/1958 | 9 days | Unclassified | |||
Darlington Works | 24/06/1958 | 27/06/1958 | 4 days | Unclassified | |||
Darlington Works | 23/12/1958 | 23/12/1958 | 1 day | Weighing | |||
Darlington Works | 13/04/1959 | 22/04/1959 | 10 days | Unclassified | Mechanical elements of ATC fitted |
||
Darlington Works | 20/12/1960 | 23/12/1960 | 4 days | Unclassified | Electrical elements of ATC fitted |
||
Darlington Works | 14/04/1961 | 10/05/1961 | 27 days | General | Boiler number 28142 (Diagram 100A) |
||
Darlington Works | 20/01/1964 | 06/03/1964 | 47 days | General | Boiler number 28576 (Diagram 100A) |
Report Date | Title | Report | Source |
---|---|---|---|
31/12/1947 | Queens Park Works | Further new Class 'B.1' 4-6-0's have appeared ex Q.P. Works as follows: Nos. 1253 (10/11), 1254 (12/11), 1255 (14/11), 1256 (17/11), 1257 (19/11), 1258 (21/11), 1259 (24/11), 1260 (26/11), 1261 (28/11), 1262 (1/12), 1263 (3/12), 1264 (5/12), 1265 (9/12), 1266 (10/12), 1267 (12/12), 1268 (16/12), 1269 (24/12), 1270 (25/12), 1271 (26/12), 1272 (29/12) and 1273 (30/12). Additional Works' Nos. checked are: Nos. 1251 (26152/47), 1252 (26153/47), 1253 (26154/47), 1254 (26155/47), 1256 (26157/47), 1257 (26158/47), 1259 (26160/47), 1260 (26161/47), 1261 (26162/47), 1263 (26164/47), 1264 (26165/47), 1266 (26167/47), 1267 (26168/47), 1270 (26171/47), 1271 (26172/47) and 1272 (26173/47). | SLS/194802 |
15/11/1947 | Eastfield MPD | On 15/11 No. 1255 was observed here with the wrong Maker's Plate (26157/47), while on 23/11 No. 1256 was seen with the same plates: Nos. 1255 and 1258 were both without plates on 23/11. On 7/12 No. 1067 KIT, which had been repainted green, was seen at Cowlairs West Junction being hauled from Cowlairs Works to Eastfield by 'J.83' No. 8475. On 17/12 No. 1244 Strang Steel HAY was here, being ex Cowlairs Works that day, after having had the nameplates fitted. This is believed to be the first Scottish Area 'B.1' to receive nameplates. On 1/1 No. 1243 EFD was noted here fitted with nameplates-Sir Harold Mitchell. The size of the letters appears to be smaller than that previously used, being between 21' and 3' high. Perhaps the most interesting 'foreigners' on the shed here on the same day were: Nos. 3041 ABD, 3137 HTN and 3190 TWD, the latter carrying both TWD and HTN on the buffer-beam. Nos. 77312 STM and 77313 THJ have been noted here recently, both carrying L.M.S. 15A shed plates, as well as their L.N.E. sheds stencilled or painted on the buffer-beam. Both these engines were regular visitors to Glasgow during the war-but on the L.M.S.-when working from 12A. It is very rare for N.E. Area Class '0.7's' or W.D.'s to appear at Eastfield. | SLS/194802 |
15/11/1947 | Eastfield MPD | On 15/11 No. 1255 was observed here with the wrong Maker's Plate (26157/47), while on 23/11 No. 1256 was seen with the same plates: Nos. 1255 and 1258 were both without plates on 23/11. On 7/12 No. 1067 KIT, which had been repainted green, was seen at Cowlairs West Junction being hauled from Cowlairs Works to Eastfield by 'J.83' No. 8475. On 17/12 No. 1244 Strang Steel HAY was here, being ex Cowlairs Works that day, after having had the nameplates fitted. This is believed to be the first Scottish Area 'B.1' to receive nameplates. On 1/1 No. 1243 EFD was noted here fitted with nameplates-Sir Harold Mitchell. The size of the letters appears to be smaller than that previously used, being between 21' and 3' high. Perhaps the most interesting 'foreigners' on the shed here on the same day were: Nos. 3041 ABD, 3137 HTN and 3190 TWD, the latter carrying both TWD and HTN on the buffer-beam. Nos. 77312 STM and 77313 THJ have been noted here recently, both carrying L.M.S. 15A shed plates, as well as their L.N.E. sheds stencilled or painted on the buffer-beam. Both these engines were regular visitors to Glasgow during the war-but on the L.M.S.-when working from 12A. It is very rare for N.E. Area Class '0.7's' or W.D.'s to appear at Eastfield. | SLS/194802 |
28/11/1953 | Darlington Works | North Road have cut up 65022 an 65497 from E.R. also 'Sentinel' 8137 (still L.N.E.R. lettering and numbers). Waiting Works are: 68035/923/68/71, 61017/60/71, 61214/55, 61422, 62773, 63357/72, 63468, 67635/69, 67761/6/7, 69783, 90016/55/162/8/430/4/633/96. 67669 is dual fitted. 69783 has a chimney like the old A6 class carried. | SLS/195402 |
18/01/1964 | Darlington MPD (Stored) | Stored: 46415/73, 61004/255, 63441, 65852/64/91, 68024, 69020, 90100/249/301/655. Ex Works 73138, 75052/58, 90149. Repair Shops Under Light Repairs: 42477, 62059, 63347, 90011. Visitor on Enthusiast Special: 70000. | SLS/196402 |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
14/11/1947 | To Service | To service as London and North Eastern Railway Number 1255 Built at North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow, Works Number 26156 Allocated to Heaton (HTN) Diagram 100A boiler fitted |
||
07/11/1948 | Allocation | Reallocated to Darlington (DAR) | ||
13/11/1948 | Allocation | Reallocated to Darlington (DAR) | ||
27/11/1948 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gateshead Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 27/11/1948. Dep: 27/11/1948. Work undertaken: Renumbered to BR 61255 |
||
28/09/1949 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 28/09/1949. Dep: 22/10/1949. Work undertaken: Boiler number 9878 (Diagram 100A) |
||
25/10/1949 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 25/10/1949. Dep: 27/10/1949. | ||
15/10/1951 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 15/10/1951. Dep: 09/11/1951. Work undertaken: Boiler number 28233 (Diagram 100A) |
||
08/01/1954 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 08/01/1954. Dep: 30/01/1954. Work undertaken: Boiler number 28403 (Diagram 100A) |
||
01/02/1954 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 01/02/1954. Dep: 02/02/1954. | ||
07/09/1955 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 07/09/1955. Dep: 13/09/1955. | ||
06/03/1956 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 06/03/1956. Dep: 04/04/1956. Work undertaken: Boiler number 28440 (Diagram 100A) |
||
02/05/1958 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 02/05/1958. Dep: 05/06/1958. Work undertaken: Boiler number 28513 (Diagram 100A) |
||
10/06/1958 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 10/06/1958. Dep: 18/06/1958. | ||
24/06/1958 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 24/06/1958. Dep: 27/06/1958. | ||
23/12/1958 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Weighing) - Arr: 23/12/1958. Dep: 23/12/1958. | ||
15/02/1959 | Allocation | Reallocated to Haverton Hill (51G) | ||
13/04/1959 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 13/04/1959. Dep: 22/04/1959. Work undertaken: Mechanical elements of ATC fitted |
||
14/06/1959 | Allocation | Reallocated to Thornaby (51L) | ||
20/12/1960 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 20/12/1960. Dep: 23/12/1960. Work undertaken: Electrical elements of ATC fitted |
||
14/04/1961 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 14/04/1961. Dep: 10/05/1961. Work undertaken: Boiler number 28142 (Diagram 100A) |
||
04/03/1962 | Allocation | Reallocated to Hull Dairycoates (50B) | ||
20/01/1964 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 20/01/1964. Dep: 06/03/1964. Work undertaken: Boiler number 28576 (Diagram 100A) |
||
24/06/1967 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 61255 from Hull Dairycoates (50B) | ||
08/1967 | Scrapped | Broken up by Garnham, Harris and Elton: Chesterfield |