|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Stratford Works | 04/04/1949 | 10/06/1949 | 68 days | General | Boiler number 9891 (Diagram 100A) Renumbered to BR 61252 |
||
Stratford Works | 10/12/1950 | 03/02/1951 | 56 days | General | Boiler number 28527 (Diagram 100A) |
||
Stratford Works | 16/10/1952 | 29/11/1952 | 45 days | General | Boiler number 28581 (Diagram 100A) |
||
Stratford Works | 14/06/1954 | 30/07/1954 | 47 days | General | Boiler number 28867 (Diagram 100A) |
||
Stratford Works | 31/01/1956 | 10/03/1956 | 40 days | General | Boiler number 28573 (Diagram 100A) |
||
Stratford Works | 11/10/1957 | 15/11/1957 | 36 days | General | Boiler number 10825 (Diagram 100A) Modified bogie springs fitted |
||
Stratford Works | 20/04/1959 | 05/06/1959 | 47 days | General | Boiler number 28572 (Diagram 100A) BR Automatic Warning System (AWS) fitted |
||
Doncaster Works | 02/01/1962 | 07/02/1962 | 37 days | General |
Report Date | Title | Report | Source |
---|---|---|---|
30/11/1947 | Darlington | Further new Class 'Bl' 4-6-0's have appeared ex Q.P. Works as follows: Nos. 1241 (8/10), 1242 (10/10), 1243 (14/10), 1244 (16/10), 1245 (20/10), 1246 (22/10), 1247 (24/10), 1248 (27/10), 1249 (29/10), 1250 (31/10)), 1251 (4/11) and 1252 (6/11), which with 1239 (2/10) and 1240 (6/10) give a total of twelve ex Works during October. Additional Works' Nos. checked are: Nos. 1242 (26143/47) and 1245-1250 (26146/47-26151/47). No. 1250 is the first loco. ex N.B. Loco. Co. Ltd. noted with electric headlamps fitted to engine and tender. | SLS/194712 |
21/11/1960 | G.E. Dieselisation | Extensive dieselisation has taken place on the GE and a considerable re-shuffle of diesels between March, Ipswich and Stratford took place on 21st November. Cambridge has lost all its passenger turns (steam) and its entire allocation of Bls (61046/8/66/71/82, 61236/52/3/4/80/3) has been transferred to March and Norwich, leaving 16 steam engines allocated. South Lynn is now a sub-shed of March, its allocation being 43089/90, 65548/77 an 68499. Lowestoft has lost its 3 steam engines (65462, 65588 and 68642) to store at Trowse and is completely diesel, i.e. D2039, D2553/5/68/70/3. | SLS/196101 |
13/01/1962 | Doncaster Works (Erecting Shop) | New Erecting Shop: D3453, E3088-94. Outside Erecting Shop: 60817, 61375, 61861/99, 63858, 68900, 70003/7. Erecting Shop: D2406, D3289, 13336, D3487, D5522/47/95, D5822. D8021, 08213, D9012, 12133, 43032, 60025/47/61/87, 60134, 60854, 61051, 61223/52, 61374, 62013, 63924/38, 70006, 76046. Stripping Road-dept. 10/1: 60938, 62034, 63571. Outside Crimpsal: D3482. 70018. Crimpsal: 60014/43/63/83/97. Outside Weighshop: 60138/57. Paint Shop: D374 (BE 3120 VF D670 of 1961), D5369 (BRCW DEL 212 of 1961), D5644, D5828 (Brush 364 of 1961), D5830 (Brush 366 of 1961), E3086/7, 60027/84 an 60125. | SLS/196202 |
28/01/1962 | Doncaster Works (Erecting Shop) | New Erecting Shop: D5643, D8213, E3072-6. Stripping Road: D4055/63, 60129, 60853, 61285, 61315, 63630, 73036. Crimpsall: 60119, 63962. Outside Crimpsall: 60870, 60938, 61168, 62021/34. Scrap Road: 68900 intact, 61862, 61908 being cut up. Erecting Shop: D3482, D5525/95, D5642/57, 12126/33, 13288, 60043/61/78/83/97, 60107, 60817, 61252, 61374/5, 61899, 63571, 70003/7, 76021. Erecting Shop Yard: 60062, 60112. Boiler Park: 60014/47. Weigh House: D5547. Outside Weigh House: D3289, 61223, 63924, 68928, 70006. Paint Shop: D3336, D3487, D5371/2, D5822, E3070/1, 60087, 76046. Paint Shop Yard: Nil. Works Shunters: DEPT. 10/1. | SLS/196203 |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
06/11/1947 | To Service | To service as London and North Eastern Railway Number 1252 Built at North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow, Works Number 26153 Allocated to Ipswich (IPS) Diagram 100A boiler fitted |
||
04/04/1949 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Stratford Works (General) - Arr: 04/04/1949. Dep: 10/06/1949. Work undertaken: Boiler number 9891 (Diagram 100A) Renumbered to BR 61252 |
||
10/12/1950 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Stratford Works (General) - Arr: 10/12/1950. Dep: 03/02/1951. Work undertaken: Boiler number 28527 (Diagram 100A) |
||
16/10/1952 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Stratford Works (General) - Arr: 16/10/1952. Dep: 29/11/1952. Work undertaken: Boiler number 28581 (Diagram 100A) |
||
14/06/1954 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Stratford Works (General) - Arr: 14/06/1954. Dep: 30/07/1954. Work undertaken: Boiler number 28867 (Diagram 100A) |
||
31/01/1956 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Stratford Works (General) - Arr: 31/01/1956. Dep: 10/03/1956. Work undertaken: Boiler number 28573 (Diagram 100A) |
||
11/10/1957 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Stratford Works (General) - Arr: 11/10/1957. Dep: 15/11/1957. Work undertaken: Boiler number 10825 (Diagram 100A) Modified bogie springs fitted |
||
20/04/1959 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Stratford Works (General) - Arr: 20/04/1959. Dep: 05/06/1959. Work undertaken: Boiler number 28572 (Diagram 100A) BR Automatic Warning System (AWS) fitted |
||
01/11/1959 | Allocation | Reallocated to March (31B) | ||
10/01/1960 | Allocation | Reallocated to Cambridge (31A) | ||
20/11/1960 | Allocation | Reallocated to Norwich Thorpe (32A) | ||
10/09/1961 | Allocation | Reallocated to Stratford (30A) | ||
24/09/1961 | Allocation | Reallocated to March (31B) | ||
02/01/1962 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 02/01/1962. Dep: 07/02/1962. | ||
25/11/1963 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 61252 from March (31B) | ||
12/1963 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 22 | ||
06/1964 | Scrapped | Broken up by R A Kings: Norwich |