|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Cowlairs Works | 07/07/1949 | 19/08/1949 | 44 days | Light Intermediate | |||
Cowlairs Works | 06/12/1951 | 31/12/1951 | 26 days | General | Boiler number 28608 (Diagram 100A) |
||
Cowlairs Works | 07/07/1953 | 12/08/1953 | 37 days | Light Intermediate | |||
Cowlairs Works | 14/05/1954 | 03/06/1954 | 21 days | Unclassified | |||
Cowlairs Works | 05/07/1954 | 13/07/1954 | 9 days | Unclassified | |||
Cowlairs Works | 04/05/1955 | 14/05/1955 | 11 days | Unclassified | |||
Cowlairs Works | 03/02/1956 | 10/03/1956 | 37 days | General | Boiler number 28633 (Diagram 100A) |
||
R & W Hawthorn | 28/04/1957 | 09/05/1957 | 12 days | Light Casual | |||
Cowlairs Works | 04/06/1958 | 27/06/1958 | 24 days | Heavy Intermediate | |||
Cowlairs Works | 19/03/1959 | 26/03/1959 | 8 days | Unclassified | BR Automatic Warning System (AWS) fitted |
||
Cowlairs Works | 24/12/1960 | 04/02/1961 | 43 days | General | Boiler number 10848 (Diagram 100A) |
||
Cowlairs Works | 24/07/1963 | 20/09/1963 | 59 days | Light Intermediate | |||
Cowlairs Works | 01/10/1963 | 10/10/1963 | 10 days | Unclassified |
Report Date | Title | Report | Source |
---|---|---|---|
30/11/1947 | Darlington | Further new Class 'Bl' 4-6-0's have appeared ex Q.P. Works as follows: Nos. 1241 (8/10), 1242 (10/10), 1243 (14/10), 1244 (16/10), 1245 (20/10), 1246 (22/10), 1247 (24/10), 1248 (27/10), 1249 (29/10), 1250 (31/10)), 1251 (4/11) and 1252 (6/11), which with 1239 (2/10) and 1240 (6/10) give a total of twelve ex Works during October. Additional Works' Nos. checked are: Nos. 1242 (26143/47) and 1245-1250 (26146/47-26151/47). No. 1250 is the first loco. ex N.B. Loco. Co. Ltd. noted with electric headlamps fitted to engine and tender. | SLS/194712 |
09/07/1949 | Cowlairs Works | Locomotives entering Works 6/6 to 9/7: These included Nos. 1221, 61245, 61308, 1726/32, 61772/89, 61936, 2461/81/90, 2689, 62692, 63177, 4541, 64567, 4591, 64625, 4706, 64790, 4864, 64915, 5925/31, 67475/78, 8120, 8338/40, 68499, 8551, 9129/32, 69144, 9157/66/92, 70802, 77442, ex L.M.S. Nos. 45086, 7162, 54651. During June, locomotives were still being turned out lettered 'British Railways' from this Works. | SLS/194908 |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
20/10/1947 | To Service | To service as London and North Eastern Railway Number 1245 Built at North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow, Works Number 26146 Allocated to Haymarket (HAY) Diagram 100A boiler fitted |
||
12/1947 | Naming | Named 'MURRAY OF ELIBANK' | ||
22/05/1948 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 61245 | ||
07/07/1949 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Light Intermediate) - Arr: 07/07/1949. Dep: 19/08/1949. | ||
06/12/1951 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (General) - Arr: 06/12/1951. Dep: 31/12/1951. Work undertaken: Boiler number 28608 (Diagram 100A) |
||
07/07/1953 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Light Intermediate) - Arr: 07/07/1953. Dep: 12/08/1953. | ||
14/05/1954 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 14/05/1954. Dep: 03/06/1954. | ||
05/07/1954 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 05/07/1954. Dep: 13/07/1954. | ||
04/05/1955 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 04/05/1955. Dep: 14/05/1955. | ||
03/02/1956 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (General) - Arr: 03/02/1956. Dep: 10/03/1956. Work undertaken: Boiler number 28633 (Diagram 100A) |
||
28/04/1957 | Works Visit | Works Visit - R & W Hawthorn (Light Casual) - Arr: 28/04/1957. Dep: 09/05/1957. | ||
04/06/1958 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Heavy Intermediate) - Arr: 04/06/1958. Dep: 27/06/1958. | ||
19/03/1959 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 19/03/1959. Dep: 26/03/1959. Work undertaken: BR Automatic Warning System (AWS) fitted |
||
24/12/1960 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (General) - Arr: 24/12/1960. Dep: 04/02/1961. Work undertaken: Boiler number 10848 (Diagram 100A) |
||
24/07/1963 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Light Intermediate) - Arr: 24/07/1963. Dep: 20/09/1963. | ||
09/09/1963 | Allocation | Reallocated to Dalry Road (64C) | ||
01/10/1963 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 01/10/1963. Dep: 10/10/1963. | ||
02/12/1963 | Allocation | Reallocated to St Margarets (64A) | ||
12/10/1964 | Allocation | Reallocated to Dalry Road (64C) | ||
05/07/1965 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 61245 from Dalry Road (64C) | ||
08/1965 | Scrapped | Broken up by Motherwell Machinery and Scrap: Wishaw |