|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Darlington Works | 30/03/1949 | 29/04/1949 | 31 days | General | Boiler number 9853 (Diagram 100A) Renumbered to BR 61240 |
||
Doncaster Works | 13/11/1950 | 12/12/1950 | 30 days | General | Boiler number 28118 (Diagram 100A) |
||
Darlington Works | 09/05/1952 | 31/05/1952 | 23 days | General | Boiler number 28430 (Diagram 100A) |
||
Darlington Works | 19/11/1953 | 12/12/1953 | 24 days | General | Boiler number 28226 (Diagram 100A) |
||
Darlington Works | 09/12/1954 | 17/12/1954 | 9 days | Light Casual | |||
Darlington Works | 19/05/1955 | 18/06/1955 | 31 days | General | Boiler number 28308 (Diagram 100A) |
||
Darlington Works | 12/12/1955 | 18/01/1956 | 38 days | Light Casual | |||
Darlington Works | 31/07/1956 | 30/08/1956 | 31 days | Light Casual | |||
Darlington Works | 27/08/1957 | 20/09/1957 | 25 days | General | Boiler number 28281 (Diagram 100A) |
||
Darlington Works | 30/09/1957 | 03/10/1957 | 4 days | Unclassified | |||
Darlington Works | 08/10/1957 | 21/10/1957 | 14 days | Unclassified | |||
Darlington Works | 31/03/1959 | 30/04/1959 | 31 days | General | Boiler number 28222 (Diagram 100A) Mechanical elements of ATC fitted |
||
Darlington Works | 06/05/1959 | 26/05/1959 | 21 days | Unclassified | |||
Darlington Works | 08/06/1959 | 18/06/1959 | 11 days | Unclassified | |||
Darlington Works | 25/06/1959 | 02/07/1959 | 8 days | Unclassified | |||
Darlington Works | 19/02/1962 | 28/03/1962 | 38 days | General | Boiler number 28815 (Diagram 100A) |
||
Darlington Works | 28/05/1962 | 05/06/1962 | 9 days | Unclassified |
Report Date | Title | Report | Source |
---|---|---|---|
07/10/1947 | Queens Park Works | Further new Class 'Bl' 4-6-0's appeared ex Q.P. Works as follows: Nos 1234 (16/9), 1235 (18/9), 1236 (22/9), 1237 (24/9), 1238 (26/9), 1239 (2/10), and 1240 (6/10). On 7/10 Nos. 1241 an 1242 were in the Paint Shop, while complete in the Erecting Shop were Nos. 1243-1246. Further Works' Nos. checked are: Nos. 1234-1241 (26135-42/47) and 1243-1244 (26144-45/47). | SLS/194711 |
30/11/1947 | Darlington | Further new Class 'Bl' 4-6-0's have appeared ex Q.P. Works as follows: Nos. 1241 (8/10), 1242 (10/10), 1243 (14/10), 1244 (16/10), 1245 (20/10), 1246 (22/10), 1247 (24/10), 1248 (27/10), 1249 (29/10), 1250 (31/10)), 1251 (4/11) and 1252 (6/11), which with 1239 (2/10) and 1240 (6/10) give a total of twelve ex Works during October. Additional Works' Nos. checked are: Nos. 1242 (26143/47) and 1245-1250 (26146/47-26151/47). No. 1250 is the first loco. ex N.B. Loco. Co. Ltd. noted with electric headlamps fitted to engine and tender. | SLS/194712 |
31/03/1949 | Darlington Works | Locomotives awaiting Works during March included: Nos. 1173, 1240, 2343, 2703, 3005/44, 3139, 3273, 5028/36, 5091, 5668, 5715, 5821, 8180, 8705, 9107, 9374/75, 9880, 61023, 61434, 61619/43, 62730/52, 63099, 63315/80, 65119, 67709/22 (both light repairs), 69807/65, Class '8' 77499, 78578/85, 79206. To scrap yard: Nos, 3332, 5649/68, 5715, 9374. Locomotives ex Works during March included: Nos. 5629/33 (both fitted small snow ploughs at Gateshead Works), 60816, 61020 (name removed), 61216, 61422, 61618, 61644 (rebuilt 2 cyls.), 61645/47/48, 62700/21/64, 63392, 63411/17/30/65, 65094, 65656, 65800/76, 67244/68, 67344, 67615, 68265, 68409/25/32, 68708/13, 69401, 69773, W.D. 90008 (light repair), 90103, 90235, 90391, 90606. No. 5626 has been sold out of service to the Bolton Colliery, it is understood. Easingwold Rly. 0-6-OT No. 2 has been broken up in the scrap yard here by a private firm. | SLS/194905 |
30/04/1949 | Darlington Works | New work April: Nos. 60146 an 60147. Locomotives awaiting Works during April included: Nos. 888, 1035, 61199, 1224, 1405, 61625, 1668, 2726, 62753. 2760, 3044, 3260, 3275, 63286, 5044/68, 5109, 65633/50, 5653, 65684, 5858, 65868, 7278, 7675, 67729 (light re-pair), 67739 (damaged), 8156, 69842, Class '8' W.D. 77037, 77178 an 79206. Broken up: Nos. 63286, 3316, 65633/84. Locomotives ex Works during April included: Nos. 60816, 61023, 61215/40/57, 61422, 61434 (rebuilt), 61648, 62700/03/64/67, 63348/80/92, 63411, 65110, 65739, 65821/44, 67722 (light repair), 68015/27, 68409/14/32, 68705, 69107, 69391, 69835/36/88, Class '8' W.D. 90382, 90449 (light repair) and 90460. |
SLS/194906 |
25/03/1962 | Darlington Works (Erecting Shop) | Erecting Shop: D4094 (Complete), D4158-60 (Engines in), D4161-5 (Frames), D15/30, D248/56, D2265, D3071, D3138, D3943, 46450, 60882/5, 60901/57, 61240/88, 63399, 63420/48/63/71, 65099, 90351, 92144/98, 92201. Stripping Shop: 46476, 60804, 65763. Stripping Shop Yard: 43117, 61013, 61256, 63360, 63443, 67752, 90068/81. Works Yard: D2113, D4091/2, D5174, 43129, 46460/7, 60816/55. 60954, 67609/61, 68024/35/64, 90333, 92097, 92194, Crossing: D2164, D2230, D2589, D3229/43. Test House: D4093, D5175. Scrap Yard: 61411/2/3/5/9/22/43/50/1/60, 64979, 65741/51/69, 67707/39/50/3/75, 68063, 68680/8/9, 68703/29/34 all complete with 60960/77, 61368, 67665/81 partially cut up. | SLS/196205 |
08/07/1962 | York South MPD | Stored in the old south shed are 60887/95/939/82 all ex works, 61039, 61240 and 90467/571/8/663, also four BRCW d.m.us. damaged in a collision in March, viz. uE50543/76/9201/22, all noted 8th July. | SLS/196208 |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
06/10/1947 | To Service | To service as London and North Eastern Railway Number 1240 Built at North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow, Works Number 26141 Allocated to York (North) (YK) Diagram 100A boiler fitted |
||
12/1947 | Naming | Named 'HARRY HINCHLIFFE' | ||
16/05/1948 | Allocation | Reallocated to Neville Hill (NEV) | ||
22/05/1948 | Allocation | Reallocated to Neville Hill (NEV) | ||
30/03/1949 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 30/03/1949. Dep: 29/04/1949. Work undertaken: Boiler number 9853 (Diagram 100A) Renumbered to BR 61240 |
||
13/11/1950 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 13/11/1950. Dep: 12/12/1950. Work undertaken: Boiler number 28118 (Diagram 100A) |
||
09/05/1952 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 09/05/1952. Dep: 31/05/1952. Work undertaken: Boiler number 28430 (Diagram 100A) |
||
19/11/1953 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 19/11/1953. Dep: 12/12/1953. Work undertaken: Boiler number 28226 (Diagram 100A) |
||
09/12/1954 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 09/12/1954. Dep: 17/12/1954. | ||
19/05/1955 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 19/05/1955. Dep: 18/06/1955. Work undertaken: Boiler number 28308 (Diagram 100A) |
||
12/12/1955 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 12/12/1955. Dep: 18/01/1956. | ||
31/07/1956 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 31/07/1956. Dep: 30/08/1956. | ||
27/08/1957 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 27/08/1957. Dep: 20/09/1957. Work undertaken: Boiler number 28281 (Diagram 100A) |
||
30/09/1957 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 30/09/1957. Dep: 03/10/1957. | ||
08/10/1957 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 08/10/1957. Dep: 21/10/1957. | ||
31/03/1959 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 31/03/1959. Dep: 30/04/1959. Work undertaken: Boiler number 28222 (Diagram 100A) Mechanical elements of ATC fitted |
||
06/05/1959 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 06/05/1959. Dep: 26/05/1959. | ||
08/06/1959 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 08/06/1959. Dep: 18/06/1959. | ||
25/06/1959 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 25/06/1959. Dep: 02/07/1959. | ||
01/11/1959 | Allocation | Reallocated to Thornaby (51L) | ||
11/09/1960 | Allocation | Reallocated to York (North) (50A) | ||
19/02/1962 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 19/02/1962. Dep: 28/03/1962. Work undertaken: Boiler number 28815 (Diagram 100A) |
||
28/05/1962 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 28/05/1962. Dep: 05/06/1962. | ||
25/11/1962 | Allocation | Reallocated to Ardsley (56B) | ||
31/10/1965 | Allocation | Reallocated to Wakefield (56A) | ||
06/12/1966 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 61240 from Wakefield (56A) | ||
16/02/1967 | Scrapped | Broken up by Arnott Young: Parkgate |