|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Gorton Works | 16/11/1948 | 24/12/1948 | 39 days | General | Boiler number 5122 (Diagram 100A) Renumbered to BR 61239 |
||
Darlington Works | 13/03/1951 | 11/04/1951 | 30 days | General | Boiler number 28204 (Diagram 100A) |
||
Darlington Works | 20/03/1953 | 18/04/1953 | 30 days | General | Boiler number 28223 (Diagram 100A) |
||
Cowlairs Works | 29/09/1954 | 16/10/1954 | 18 days | Heavy Intermediate | |||
Cowlairs Works | 27/03/1956 | 03/05/1956 | 38 days | Heavy Intermediate | |||
Cowlairs Works | 04/04/1958 | 02/05/1958 | 29 days | General | Boiler number 28621 (Diagram 100A) |
||
Cowlairs Works | 19/10/1960 | 11/11/1960 | 24 days | Heavy Intermediate |
Report Date | Title | Report | Source |
---|---|---|---|
07/10/1947 | Queens Park Works | Further new Class 'Bl' 4-6-0's appeared ex Q.P. Works as follows: Nos 1234 (16/9), 1235 (18/9), 1236 (22/9), 1237 (24/9), 1238 (26/9), 1239 (2/10), and 1240 (6/10). On 7/10 Nos. 1241 an 1242 were in the Paint Shop, while complete in the Erecting Shop were Nos. 1243-1246. Further Works' Nos. checked are: Nos. 1234-1241 (26135-42/47) and 1243-1244 (26144-45/47). | SLS/194711 |
30/11/1947 | Darlington | Further new Class 'Bl' 4-6-0's have appeared ex Q.P. Works as follows: Nos. 1241 (8/10), 1242 (10/10), 1243 (14/10), 1244 (16/10), 1245 (20/10), 1246 (22/10), 1247 (24/10), 1248 (27/10), 1249 (29/10), 1250 (31/10)), 1251 (4/11) and 1252 (6/11), which with 1239 (2/10) and 1240 (6/10) give a total of twelve ex Works during October. Additional Works' Nos. checked are: Nos. 1242 (26143/47) and 1245-1250 (26146/47-26151/47). No. 1250 is the first loco. ex N.B. Loco. Co. Ltd. noted with electric headlamps fitted to engine and tender. | SLS/194712 |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
02/10/1947 | To Service | To service as London and North Eastern Railway Number 1239 Built at North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow, Works Number 26140 Allocated to York (North) (YK) Diagram 100A boiler fitted |
||
16/05/1948 | Allocation | Reallocated to Neville Hill (NEV) | ||
22/05/1948 | Allocation | Reallocated to Neville Hill (NEV) | ||
23/05/1948 | Allocation | Reallocated to York (North) (YK) | ||
29/05/1948 | Allocation | Reallocated to York (North) (YK) | ||
16/11/1948 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 16/11/1948. Dep: 24/12/1948. Work undertaken: Boiler number 5122 (Diagram 100A) Renumbered to BR 61239 |
||
13/03/1951 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 13/03/1951. Dep: 11/04/1951. Work undertaken: Boiler number 28204 (Diagram 100A) |
||
20/03/1953 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 20/03/1953. Dep: 18/04/1953. Work undertaken: Boiler number 28223 (Diagram 100A) |
||
20/09/1953 | Allocation | Reallocated to Carlisle Canal (68E) | ||
29/09/1954 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Heavy Intermediate) - Arr: 29/09/1954. Dep: 16/10/1954. | ||
27/03/1956 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Heavy Intermediate) - Arr: 27/03/1956. Dep: 03/05/1956. | ||
04/04/1958 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (General) - Arr: 04/04/1958. Dep: 02/05/1958. Work undertaken: Boiler number 28621 (Diagram 100A) |
||
19/10/1960 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Heavy Intermediate) - Arr: 19/10/1960. Dep: 11/11/1960. | ||
17/06/1962 | Allocation | Reallocated to Gorton (9G) | ||
08/1962 | Scrapped | Scrapped | ||
27/08/1962 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 61239 from Gorton (9G) |