|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Stratford Works | 04/03/1949 | 27/04/1949 | 55 days | General | Boiler number 9922 (Diagram 100A) Renumbered to BR 61226 |
||
Stratford Works | 16/11/1949 | 26/11/1949 | 11 days | Unclassified | |||
Stratford Works | 04/03/1951 | 19/04/1951 | 47 days | General | Boiler number 28545 (Diagram 100A) |
||
Stratford Works | 03/06/1953 | 25/07/1953 | 53 days | General | Modified bogie springs fitted |
||
Stratford Works | 14/09/1955 | 01/10/1955 | 18 days | Unclassified | After collision |
||
Doncaster Works | 12/01/1956 | 17/02/1956 | 37 days | General | Boiler number 28821 (Diagram 100A) |
||
Stratford Works | 11/06/1957 | 14/06/1957 | 4 days | Unclassified | |||
Stratford Works | 31/03/1958 | 30/05/1958 | 61 days | General | Boiler number 28213 (Diagram 100A) |
||
Stratford Works | 19/06/1958 | 25/06/1958 | 7 days | Unclassified | |||
Stratford Works | 03/03/1960 | 06/05/1960 | 65 days | General | Boiler number 28269 (Diagram 100A) BR Automatic Warning System (AWS) fitted |
||
Doncaster Works | 21/09/1960 | 23/09/1960 | 3 days | Unclassified |
Report Date | Title | Report | Source |
---|---|---|---|
11/09/1947 | Queens Park Works | Further new Class 'Bl' 4-6-0's were ex Q.P. Works as follows: Nos. 1223 (13/8), 1224 (15/8), 1225 (19/8), 1226 (21/8), 1227 (26/8), 1228 (28/8), 1229 (2/9), 1230 (4/9), 1231 (9/9) and 1232 (10/9). On 11/9 Nos. 1233 an 1234 were in the Paint Shop while in the Erecting Shop Nos. 1235 an 1236 were undergoing steaming trials; No. 1237 was minus the bogie but otherwise virtually complete. Additional Works Nos. checked are: Nos. 1216 (26117/47), 1217 (26118/47), 1222 (26123/47), 1226-33 (26127-34/47), 1235 (26136/47). | SLS/194710 |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
21/08/1947 | To Service | To service as London and North Eastern Railway Number 1226 Built at North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow, Works Number 26127 Allocated to Stratford (STR) Diagram 100A boiler fitted |
||
18/01/1948 | Allocation | Reallocated to Parkeston Quay (PKS) | ||
24/01/1948 | Allocation | Reallocated to Parkeston Quay (PKS) | ||
04/03/1949 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Stratford Works (General) - Arr: 04/03/1949. Dep: 27/04/1949. Work undertaken: Boiler number 9922 (Diagram 100A) Renumbered to BR 61226 |
||
16/11/1949 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Stratford Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 16/11/1949. Dep: 26/11/1949. | ||
08/10/1950 | Allocation | Reallocated to March (31B) | ||
10/12/1950 | Allocation | Reallocated to Parkeston Quay (30F) | ||
31/12/1950 | Allocation | Reallocated to Parkeston Quay (30F) | ||
04/03/1951 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Stratford Works (General) - Arr: 04/03/1951. Dep: 19/04/1951. Work undertaken: Boiler number 28545 (Diagram 100A) |
||
03/06/1953 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Stratford Works (General) - Arr: 03/06/1953. Dep: 25/07/1953. Work undertaken: Modified bogie springs fitted |
||
14/09/1955 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Stratford Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 14/09/1955. Dep: 01/10/1955. Work undertaken: After collision |
||
12/01/1956 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 12/01/1956. Dep: 17/02/1956. Work undertaken: Boiler number 28821 (Diagram 100A) |
||
11/06/1957 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Stratford Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 11/06/1957. Dep: 14/06/1957. | ||
31/03/1958 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Stratford Works (General) - Arr: 31/03/1958. Dep: 30/05/1958. Work undertaken: Boiler number 28213 (Diagram 100A) |
||
19/06/1958 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Stratford Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 19/06/1958. Dep: 25/06/1958. | ||
03/03/1960 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Stratford Works (General) - Arr: 03/03/1960. Dep: 06/05/1960. Work undertaken: Boiler number 28269 (Diagram 100A) BR Automatic Warning System (AWS) fitted |
||
21/09/1960 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 21/09/1960. Dep: 23/09/1960. | ||
01/01/1961 | Allocation | Reallocated to Stratford (30A) | ||
16/09/1962 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 61226 from Stratford (30A) | ||
22/11/1962 | Scrapped | Broken up by Locomotive Works: Doncaster |