|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Cowlairs Works | 03/12/1948 | 11/01/1949 | 40 days | General | Boiler number 28618 (Diagram 100A) |
||
Cowlairs Works | 09/01/1951 | 01/02/1951 | 24 days | Heavy Intermediate | |||
Cowlairs Works | 10/06/1952 | 04/07/1952 | 25 days | General | Boiler number 28610 (Diagram 100A) |
||
Cowlairs Works | 04/05/1954 | 05/06/1954 | 33 days | Heavy Intermediate | |||
Cowlairs Works | 04/05/1955 | 04/06/1955 | 32 days | Heavy Intermediate | WPU Gear removed |
||
Cowlairs Works | 22/06/1955 | 25/06/1955 | 4 days | Unclassified | |||
Cowlairs Works | 12/04/1956 | 15/05/1956 | 34 days | Unclassified | |||
Cowlairs Works | 14/06/1956 | 11/08/1956 | 59 days | General | Boiler number 10847 (Diagram 100A) |
||
Cowlairs Works | 09/10/1957 | 02/11/1957 | 25 days | Light Intermediate | |||
Cowlairs Works | 14/05/1959 | 04/06/1959 | 22 days | Unclassified | BR Automatic Warning System (AWS) fitted |
||
Cowlairs Works | 08/08/1959 | 12/09/1959 | 36 days | Light Intermediate | |||
Cowlairs Works | 02/10/1959 | 06/10/1959 | 5 days | Unclassified | |||
Cowlairs Works | 23/03/1960 | 23/04/1960 | 32 days | Light Casual | |||
Cowlairs Works | 04/05/1961 | 18/05/1961 | 15 days | Light Casual | |||
Cowlairs Works | 08/01/1962 | 27/01/1962 | 20 days | General | Boiler number 28823 (Diagram 100A) |
Report Date | Title | Report | Source |
---|---|---|---|
31/10/1949 | Cowlairs Works | Locomotives entering Works during October: These included Nos. 61219, 61779/81, 61855, 1900, 62432/78, 2484, 3071, 3134/47/75/84, 4565, 64578, 4639, 4711/92, 4816, 64849, 4927, 65929/31, 7484/95, 8332/48, 68456, 69130, 9165, 69199, 9216, 69514, 9562, 77119, 79265. | SLS/194912 |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
09/08/1947 | To Service | To service as London and North Eastern Railway Number 1219 Built at North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow, Works Number 26120 Allocated to Carlisle Canal (CAR) Diagram 100A boiler fitted |
||
19/09/1948 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 61219 | ||
03/12/1948 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (General) - Arr: 03/12/1948. Dep: 11/01/1949. Work undertaken: Boiler number 28618 (Diagram 100A) |
||
09/01/1951 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Heavy Intermediate) - Arr: 09/01/1951. Dep: 01/02/1951. | ||
10/06/1952 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (General) - Arr: 10/06/1952. Dep: 04/07/1952. Work undertaken: Boiler number 28610 (Diagram 100A) |
||
20/05/1953 | Allocation | Reallocated to To Southern Region (SR) | ||
21/06/1953 | Allocation | Reallocated to Carlisle Canal (68E) | ||
04/05/1954 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Heavy Intermediate) - Arr: 04/05/1954. Dep: 05/06/1954. | ||
04/05/1955 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Heavy Intermediate) - Arr: 04/05/1955. Dep: 04/06/1955. Work undertaken: WPU Gear removed |
||
22/06/1955 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 22/06/1955. Dep: 25/06/1955. | ||
12/04/1956 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 12/04/1956. Dep: 15/05/1956. | ||
14/06/1956 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (General) - Arr: 14/06/1956. Dep: 11/08/1956. Work undertaken: Boiler number 10847 (Diagram 100A) |
||
09/10/1957 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Light Intermediate) - Arr: 09/10/1957. Dep: 02/11/1957. | ||
09/12/1957 | Allocation | Reallocated to Haymarket (64B) | ||
14/05/1959 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 14/05/1959. Dep: 04/06/1959. Work undertaken: BR Automatic Warning System (AWS) fitted |
||
08/08/1959 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Light Intermediate) - Arr: 08/08/1959. Dep: 12/09/1959. | ||
02/10/1959 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 02/10/1959. Dep: 06/10/1959. | ||
23/03/1960 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 23/03/1960. Dep: 23/04/1960. | ||
04/05/1961 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 04/05/1961. Dep: 18/05/1961. | ||
08/01/1962 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (General) - Arr: 08/01/1962. Dep: 27/01/1962. Work undertaken: Boiler number 28823 (Diagram 100A) |
||
23/09/1962 | Allocation | Reallocated to St Margarets (64A) | ||
08/06/1964 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 61219 from St Margarets (64A) | ||
08/1964 | Scrapped | Broken up by P.W. McLellan: Langloan |