|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Doncaster Works | 02/10/1949 | 31/10/1949 | 30 days | General | Boiler number 9756 (Diagram 100A) Renumbered to BR 61208 |
||
Doncaster Works | 02/12/1951 | 28/12/1951 | 27 days | General | Boiler number 28164 (Diagram 100A) |
||
Stratford Works | 02/03/1954 | 10/04/1954 | 40 days | General | Boiler number 28822 (Diagram 100A) |
||
Doncaster Works | 13/04/1956 | 16/05/1956 | 34 days | General | Boiler number 28370 (Diagram 100A) |
||
Doncaster Works | 29/08/1958 | 10/10/1958 | 43 days | General | Boiler number 28953 (Diagram 100A) |
||
Doncaster Works | 11/07/1960 | 20/07/1960 | 10 days | Unclassified | |||
Doncaster Works | 06/07/1961 | 02/08/1961 | 28 days | General | Boiler number 28506 (Diagram 100A) |
Report Date | Title | Report | Source |
---|---|---|---|
06/08/1947 | Queens Park Works | On 6/8 Nos. 1201-1203 were in the Paint Shop, Nos. 1204-1210 were complete in the Erecting Shop, the latter being in steam prior to under-going steaming trials that afternoon. No. 1211 was in an advanced state of completion, being only minus bogie and chimney, while No. 1212 was awaiting wheels, cab and chimney. No. 1210 onwards have a rocking grate fitted, while all of this batch have hopper ash-pans, self-cleaning smoke-boxes, and electric lighting provided by a Stone's turbo-generator mounted on the footplating at the right-hand side of the smoke-box. The cab lighting comprises a lamp with wire guard on the underside of the cab roof, and a hooded lamp at each water gauge and at the steam pressure and vacuum gauges-five in all. Sockets for an inspection lamp are provided under the footplating on each side of the engine (above the driving wheels), but neither the sockets for the headlamps or the lamps themselves are fitted, the cables being run forward and the ends bound with insulating tape. As in the previous batch, the speed indicator drive off the left-hand rear coupled wheel crank pin is fitted, but not the speed indicator itself. | SLS/194708 |
31/10/1949 | Doncaster Works | Locomotives noted in the Paint Shop at the beginning of November included: Nos. 60030/91, 60109/11, 60891, 60900/38/40, 61208, 61819/91, 61906/53/87, 67379, 69527/47. No. 67387 has been fitted for 'Pull and Push' working. | SLS/194912 |
16/07/1961 | Doncaster Works (Erecting Shop) | New Erecting Shop: D2395/6, E3064-9, 13253. Boiler Shop: E3071/2. Stripping Road: D2235, 60044/56/63/94, 60502, 61088, 61803, 61902, 73043. Scrap Road: 61824, 61927/64, 64736, 69531 intact, 68951 just cut up. Crimpsal: 60150, 61204. Outside Crimpsal: 60147, 62015, 70034. Erecting Shop: D3446/9, D3660, D5560/72, D8212, 12124, 60022/30, 60155, 60519, 61055, 61157/95, 61208, 61312/26, 61846, 70009/18/38/9, 76050. Outside Erecting Shop: DEPT7, 60034. Weigh House: Nil. Outside Weigh House: 60029, 61906. Paint Shop: D2234, D2394, D5571, D6722, E3063, 60009/73, 61056, 61378, 61893. Outside Paint Shop: D353, D5806, D9008. Works Shunters: DEPT10/1. | SLS/196109 |
10/10/1965 | Doncaster Shed (Stored) | Stationary boiler: 92190. Stored: 61107/96, 61208, 61367, 63593, 63688, 63738, 90085/96/195/235/52/93/349/64/5/454/76/557/687. | SLS/196511 |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
08/07/1947 | To Service | To service as London and North Eastern Railway Number 1208 Built at North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow, Works Number 26109 Allocated to Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) (RET) Diagram 100A boiler fitted |
||
02/10/1949 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 02/10/1949. Dep: 31/10/1949. Work undertaken: Boiler number 9756 (Diagram 100A) Renumbered to BR 61208 |
||
02/12/1951 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 02/12/1951. Dep: 28/12/1951. Work undertaken: Boiler number 28164 (Diagram 100A) |
||
02/03/1954 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Stratford Works (General) - Arr: 02/03/1954. Dep: 10/04/1954. Work undertaken: Boiler number 28822 (Diagram 100A) |
||
13/04/1956 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 13/04/1956. Dep: 16/05/1956. Work undertaken: Boiler number 28370 (Diagram 100A) |
||
29/08/1958 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 29/08/1958. Dep: 10/10/1958. Work undertaken: Boiler number 28953 (Diagram 100A) |
||
11/07/1960 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 11/07/1960. Dep: 20/07/1960. | ||
06/07/1961 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 06/07/1961. Dep: 02/08/1961. Work undertaken: Boiler number 28506 (Diagram 100A) |
||
13/06/1965 | Allocation | Reallocated to Doncaster (36A) | ||
26/09/1965 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 61208 from Doncaster (36A) | ||
11/1965 | Scrapped | Broken up by T W Ward: Beighton |