|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Doncaster Works | 05/07/1949 | 10/08/1949 | 37 days | General | Boiler number 9837 (Diagram 100A) Renumbered to BR 61207 |
||
Doncaster Works | 09/05/1951 | 07/06/1951 | 30 days | General | Boiler number 28143 (Diagram 100A) |
||
Doncaster Works | 19/05/1953 | 17/06/1953 | 30 days | General | Boiler number 28532 (Diagram 100A) |
||
Doncaster Works | 23/02/1955 | 18/03/1955 | 24 days | General | Boiler number 28758 (Diagram 100A) |
||
Doncaster Works | 19/09/1955 | 05/10/1955 | 17 days | Light Casual | |||
Doncaster Works | 02/05/1957 | 06/06/1957 | 36 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 07/06/1957 | 09/06/1957 | 3 days | Unclassified | |||
Doncaster Works | 11/06/1959 | 17/07/1959 | 37 days | General | Boiler number 28866 (Diagram 100A) |
||
Doncaster Works | 27/09/1961 | 01/11/1961 | 36 days | General | Boiler number 28138 (Diagram 100A) |
Report Date | Title | Report | Source |
---|---|---|---|
31/05/1947 | Queens Park Works | During May eight new Class 'B.1' 4-6-0's appeared ex Q.P. Works, Nos. 1190-1197 inclusive. Up to 27/6 another eleven 'B.1's' had appeared, viz., Nos. 1198-1208. They were ex Works as follows: 1196 (27/5), 1197 (29/5), 1198 (3/6), 1199 (4/6), 1200 (6/6), 1201 (10/6), 1202 (12/6), 1203 (17/6), 1204 (19/6), 1205 and 1206 (24/6), and 1207 and 1208 . (27/6). Works' Nos. checked are as follows: Nos. 1190-1205 (26091-26106/47) and No. 1207 (26108/47). | SLS/194708 |
06/08/1947 | Queens Park Works | On 6/8 Nos. 1201-1203 were in the Paint Shop, Nos. 1204-1210 were complete in the Erecting Shop, the latter being in steam prior to under-going steaming trials that afternoon. No. 1211 was in an advanced state of completion, being only minus bogie and chimney, while No. 1212 was awaiting wheels, cab and chimney. No. 1210 onwards have a rocking grate fitted, while all of this batch have hopper ash-pans, self-cleaning smoke-boxes, and electric lighting provided by a Stone's turbo-generator mounted on the footplating at the right-hand side of the smoke-box. The cab lighting comprises a lamp with wire guard on the underside of the cab roof, and a hooded lamp at each water gauge and at the steam pressure and vacuum gauges-five in all. Sockets for an inspection lamp are provided under the footplating on each side of the engine (above the driving wheels), but neither the sockets for the headlamps or the lamps themselves are fitted, the cables being run forward and the ends bound with insulating tape. As in the previous batch, the speed indicator drive off the left-hand rear coupled wheel crank pin is fitted, but not the speed indicator itself. | SLS/194708 |
01/10/1961 | Doncaster Works (Stripping Road) | New Erecting Shop: D2399, E3067-73. Outside New Erecting Shop: 13251. Stripping Road: 43159, 60055/64/71/89, 60162, 60525, 61207/27, 61808/88, 61920, 63973, 68894, 73000, 73170. Scrap Yard-intact: 68950, 69533/85/92. Scrap Yard-being cut up: 60035/79, 61833, 64779. Crimpsal: D3447, 43062, 60080, 61361. Outside Crimpsal: D3478, 60017, 60106, 63969, 70000. Erecting Shop: D3254, D4061, D5578, D5602, D5805, 13166, 13333, 43158, 60012/33, 60050/91/2, 60128/59, 60511/3/37, 61145, 61299, 61867, 62006, 63965/80, 70035/8. Outside Erecting Shop: 61897, 70030, 73169. Weigh House : Nil. Outside Weigh House: 61075. Paint Shop: D5050, D5583, D9014, E3066, 60001, 61248. Outside Paint Shop: D5355, D5604, D5816. Works Shunters: DEPT10/1. | SLS/196111 |
29/10/1961 | Doncaster Works (Paint Shop) | New Erecting Shop: D3254, E3069-74. Stripping Road: D5802, 43151, 60003, 60108, 63936/60/81, 73000. Crimpsal: 60046, 60127. Outside Crimpsal: 61107, 63969, 70008/44. Scrap Yard: 60055, 61866, 64646, 65450/78 intact, 61979 being cut up. Boiler Park: 60025, 63980. Erecting Shop: D2021, D3153, D3447/8/76-8, D3646, D5520/83, D5600/6/9/66, D5805, D9004, 13166, 60021/65/89, 60162, 60525/38, 61003/89, 61143/62, 61389, 63927/73, 70000/13. Weigh House: D9016. Outside Weigh House: 60071/80. Paint Shop: D364, D5050/4, D5358, D5820, E3067/8, 43159, 61207, 61367. Paint Shop Yard : Nil. Works Shunters: Dpt10/1. | SLS/196112 |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
27/06/1947 | To Service | To service as London and North Eastern Railway Number 1207 Built at North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow, Works Number 26108 Allocated to New England (NWE) Diagram 100A boiler fitted |
||
05/07/1949 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 05/07/1949. Dep: 10/08/1949. Work undertaken: Boiler number 9837 (Diagram 100A) Renumbered to BR 61207 |
||
09/05/1951 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 09/05/1951. Dep: 07/06/1951. Work undertaken: Boiler number 28143 (Diagram 100A) |
||
19/05/1953 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 19/05/1953. Dep: 17/06/1953. Work undertaken: Boiler number 28532 (Diagram 100A) |
||
23/02/1955 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 23/02/1955. Dep: 18/03/1955. Work undertaken: Boiler number 28758 (Diagram 100A) |
||
19/09/1955 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 19/09/1955. Dep: 05/10/1955. | ||
02/05/1957 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 02/05/1957. Dep: 06/06/1957. | ||
07/06/1957 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 07/06/1957. Dep: 09/06/1957. | ||
11/06/1959 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 11/06/1959. Dep: 17/07/1959. Work undertaken: Boiler number 28866 (Diagram 100A) |
||
27/09/1961 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 27/09/1961. Dep: 01/11/1961. Work undertaken: Boiler number 28138 (Diagram 100A) |
||
28/12/1963 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 61207 from New England (34E) | ||
02/1964 | Scrapped | Broken up by Locomotive Works: Doncaster |