|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Doncaster Works | 28/03/1949 | 28/04/1949 | 32 days | General | Boiler number 3741 (Diagram 100A) Renumbered to BR 61205 |
||
Stratford Works | 26/11/1950 | 06/01/1951 | 42 days | General | Boiler number 28520 (Diagram 100A) |
||
Stratford Works | 24/06/1952 | 16/08/1952 | 54 days | General | Boiler number 28561 (Diagram 100A) |
||
Doncaster Works | 25/01/1954 | 10/02/1954 | 17 days | Light Casual | |||
Doncaster Works | 12/10/1954 | 12/11/1954 | 32 days | General | Boiler number 28156 (Diagram 100A) |
||
Doncaster Works | 27/11/1956 | 03/01/1957 | 38 days | General | Boiler number 28526 (Diagram 100A) |
||
Stratford Works | 09/02/1959 | 20/03/1959 | 40 days | General | Boiler number 28292 (Diagram 100A) BR Automatic Warning System (AWS) fitted |
||
Doncaster Works | 05/08/1960 | 10/08/1960 | 6 days | Unclassified | |||
Doncaster Works | 08/04/1961 | 13/05/1961 | 36 days | General | Boiler number 28129 (Diagram 100A) |
||
Doncaster Works | 18/07/1961 | 03/08/1961 | 17 days | Light Casual |
Report Date | Title | Report | Source |
---|---|---|---|
31/05/1947 | Queens Park Works | During May eight new Class 'B.1' 4-6-0's appeared ex Q.P. Works, Nos. 1190-1197 inclusive. Up to 27/6 another eleven 'B.1's' had appeared, viz., Nos. 1198-1208. They were ex Works as follows: 1196 (27/5), 1197 (29/5), 1198 (3/6), 1199 (4/6), 1200 (6/6), 1201 (10/6), 1202 (12/6), 1203 (17/6), 1204 (19/6), 1205 and 1206 (24/6), and 1207 and 1208 . (27/6). Works' Nos. checked are as follows: Nos. 1190-1205 (26091-26106/47) and No. 1207 (26108/47). | SLS/194708 |
06/08/1947 | Queens Park Works | On 6/8 Nos. 1201-1203 were in the Paint Shop, Nos. 1204-1210 were complete in the Erecting Shop, the latter being in steam prior to under-going steaming trials that afternoon. No. 1211 was in an advanced state of completion, being only minus bogie and chimney, while No. 1212 was awaiting wheels, cab and chimney. No. 1210 onwards have a rocking grate fitted, while all of this batch have hopper ash-pans, self-cleaning smoke-boxes, and electric lighting provided by a Stone's turbo-generator mounted on the footplating at the right-hand side of the smoke-box. The cab lighting comprises a lamp with wire guard on the underside of the cab roof, and a hooded lamp at each water gauge and at the steam pressure and vacuum gauges-five in all. Sockets for an inspection lamp are provided under the footplating on each side of the engine (above the driving wheels), but neither the sockets for the headlamps or the lamps themselves are fitted, the cables being run forward and the ends bound with insulating tape. As in the previous batch, the speed indicator drive off the left-hand rear coupled wheel crank pin is fitted, but not the speed indicator itself. | SLS/194708 |
27/10/1951 | Effects of withdrawal of Standard 7MT\'s on GE Section | During w/e 27th October, the effects of the withdrawal of the Standard 7MT Pacifics for mechanical alterations was very apparent on the GE Section. The difficulties of providing suitable power were alleviated to some extent by the presence of the Southern Region light Pacifics but even so, on 24th October, the Down 'Norfolkman' suffered a late start of 15 minutes waiting engine, but despite speed restrictions at Ilford and Gidea Park this train, hauled by 61177, only lost four minutes to Ipswich. On 25th October, 61205 put up a fine performance despite these speed orders, coming to a stand at Ipswich two minutes early at 10.44. In general, however, the running of the fast trains was not up to the standard of the Pacific workings, although the position steadily improved when the initial shock of the withdrawal of the Pacifics had passed. During the next week some additions were made to GE Section motive power, and on Saturday, 3rd November, the Norfolkman left behind 73000. Subsequently, on Monday, 5th November, 73002 was observed on the 8.30 Norwich down, and a new addition to the Eastern Region engines, 34089 from the Southern Region, took charge of the 9.30 'Norfolkman.' | SLS/195201 |
15/06/1957 | Rugby MPD | Compound 41086 (6J) is still in store although all Rugby's compounds emerged from store w.e.f. summer t.t. Whilst 10800 is away at Derby for attention to fuel pipes and steam heating boiler, its regular job (the Birmingham-Yarmouth) has been worked by Compounds 41093 an 41105 (daily mileage 320). The 1-47 p.m. Rugby - Peterboro goods now has 61204 regularly (a Spital Bridge job) since 61005/6 went to Stratford in July in exchange for 61204/5. | SLS/195708 |
01/02/1960 | Peterborough Midland Closure | Peterborough Midland (31F) closed as from 1st February and the engines were transferred as follows-to March D2239, 11156/7, 41949, 44152/273, 44509/21, 47300, 61095/6, 61156/204/5/323/48, 62613, 64789, 64901, 90063/447/501/28. To New England (34E) 43127; Grimesthorpe (41B) 44097/518; remainder returned to LMR viz. 43957, 44110/239/47/476/519/22. | SLS/196003 |
23/04/1961 | Doncaster Works (Erecting Shop) | New Erecting Shop: D2390/1, D3452, E3056/61-5. Stripping Road: D2402, D3152, D3487, 60033/8/9/64/83/8/95/8, 61814/49, 62049, 68945/90, 70010/35. Scrap Road: 64208/23/36, 64804/74/82, 68903/16/27/70/81, Crimpsall: 43149, 61384, 70001. Outside Crimpsall: DEPT7, 60143, 70053, 73012. Erecting Shop: D3445/89, D5573, D8217, 13252, 13326, 43126/44, 60020/40/63/8/75/90, 60126, 60520/8, 61162, 61205/11, 61363, 61897, 62025/42/60, 63985. Outside Erecting Shop: 60015, 61927, 62011. Paint Shop: D341, D2389, D5695, E3059/60, 60047/67, 60141, 60536, 61094, 73065. Works Shunters: DEPT10, DEPT11. | SLS/196106 |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
24/06/1947 | To Service | To service as London and North Eastern Railway Number 1205 Built at North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow, Works Number 26106 Allocated to Grantham (GRA) Diagram 100A boiler fitted |
||
28/03/1949 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 28/03/1949. Dep: 28/04/1949. Work undertaken: Boiler number 3741 (Diagram 100A) Renumbered to BR 61205 |
||
18/12/1949 | Allocation | Reallocated to Stratford (STR) | ||
26/11/1950 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Stratford Works (General) - Arr: 26/11/1950. Dep: 06/01/1951. Work undertaken: Boiler number 28520 (Diagram 100A) |
||
24/06/1952 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Stratford Works (General) - Arr: 24/06/1952. Dep: 16/08/1952. Work undertaken: Boiler number 28561 (Diagram 100A) |
||
20/09/1953 | Allocation | Reallocated to New England (35A) | ||
25/01/1954 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 25/01/1954. Dep: 10/02/1954. | ||
12/10/1954 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 12/10/1954. Dep: 12/11/1954. Work undertaken: Boiler number 28156 (Diagram 100A) |
||
27/11/1956 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 27/11/1956. Dep: 03/01/1957. Work undertaken: Boiler number 28526 (Diagram 100A) |
||
16/06/1957 | Allocation | Reallocated to Spital Bridge (35C) | ||
09/02/1959 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Stratford Works (General) - Arr: 09/02/1959. Dep: 20/03/1959. Work undertaken: Boiler number 28292 (Diagram 100A) BR Automatic Warning System (AWS) fitted |
||
31/01/1960 | Allocation | Reallocated to March (31B) | ||
05/08/1960 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 05/08/1960. Dep: 10/08/1960. | ||
08/04/1961 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 08/04/1961. Dep: 13/05/1961. Work undertaken: Boiler number 28129 (Diagram 100A) |
||
18/07/1961 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 18/07/1961. Dep: 03/08/1961. | ||
03/12/1961 | Allocation | Reallocated to Norwich Thorpe (32A) | ||
04/02/1962 | Allocation | Reallocated to March (31B) | ||
25/11/1963 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 61205 from March (31B) | ||
12/1963 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 20 | ||
02/1965 | Scrapped | Broken up by R A Kings: Norwich |