|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Gorton Works | 06/02/1949 | 12/03/1949 | 35 days | General | Boiler number 3733 (Diagram 100A) Renumbered to BR 61202 |
||
Gorton Works | 07/10/1950 | 23/12/1950 | 78 days | General | Boiler number 28279 (Diagram 100A) |
||
Gorton Works | 13/09/1951 | 29/09/1951 | 17 days | Light Casual | |||
Gorton Works | 02/10/1951 | 06/10/1951 | 5 days | Unclassified | |||
Gorton Works | 28/12/1951 | 04/01/1951 | -357 days | Unclassified | |||
Doncaster Works | 12/09/1952 | 10/10/1952 | 29 days | General | Boiler number 28117 (Diagram 100A) |
||
Darlington Works | 08/08/1954 | 25/09/1954 | 49 days | General | Boiler number 28450 (Diagram 100A) |
||
Doncaster Works | 26/10/1956 | 30/11/1956 | 36 days | General | Boiler number 28285 (Diagram 100A) |
||
Doncaster Works | 21/08/1957 | 29/08/1957 | 9 days | Unclassified | |||
Doncaster Works | 22/04/1958 | 30/04/1958 | 9 days | Light Casual | |||
Stratford Works | 09/03/1959 | 01/05/1959 | 54 days | General | Boiler number 28101 (Diagram 100A) |
||
Doncaster Works | 06/10/1959 | 16/10/1959 | 11 days | Unclassified | |||
Doncaster Works | 23/08/1960 | 02/09/1960 | 11 days | Unclassified | |||
Doncaster Works | 25/03/1961 | 12/04/1961 | 19 days | Unclassified |
Report Date | Title | Report | Source |
---|---|---|---|
31/05/1947 | Queens Park Works | During May eight new Class 'B.1' 4-6-0's appeared ex Q.P. Works, Nos. 1190-1197 inclusive. Up to 27/6 another eleven 'B.1's' had appeared, viz., Nos. 1198-1208. They were ex Works as follows: 1196 (27/5), 1197 (29/5), 1198 (3/6), 1199 (4/6), 1200 (6/6), 1201 (10/6), 1202 (12/6), 1203 (17/6), 1204 (19/6), 1205 and 1206 (24/6), and 1207 and 1208 . (27/6). Works' Nos. checked are as follows: Nos. 1190-1205 (26091-26106/47) and No. 1207 (26108/47). | SLS/194708 |
06/08/1947 | Queens Park Works | On 6/8 Nos. 1201-1203 were in the Paint Shop, Nos. 1204-1210 were complete in the Erecting Shop, the latter being in steam prior to under-going steaming trials that afternoon. No. 1211 was in an advanced state of completion, being only minus bogie and chimney, while No. 1212 was awaiting wheels, cab and chimney. No. 1210 onwards have a rocking grate fitted, while all of this batch have hopper ash-pans, self-cleaning smoke-boxes, and electric lighting provided by a Stone's turbo-generator mounted on the footplating at the right-hand side of the smoke-box. The cab lighting comprises a lamp with wire guard on the underside of the cab roof, and a hooded lamp at each water gauge and at the steam pressure and vacuum gauges-five in all. Sockets for an inspection lamp are provided under the footplating on each side of the engine (above the driving wheels), but neither the sockets for the headlamps or the lamps themselves are fitted, the cables being run forward and the ends bound with insulating tape. As in the previous batch, the speed indicator drive off the left-hand rear coupled wheel crank pin is fitted, but not the speed indicator itself. | SLS/194708 |
02/04/1959 | Stratford Works (Old Works) | Old Works, 43143 (40F), 61009 (40A), 61116 (14D), 61202 (40A), 61232 (30F), 61329 (30A), 61348 (31F), 61371 (31A), 61405 (40A), 64823 (40F), 69696 (30A). Diesel Sp., D206 (34B), 11138 (30F), 12078 (1A), 15203 (75C), D2550 (32B), D3094 (75A), D3301 (30A), D5304 (34B), D8404 (30A). Waiting Wks., 61575 (31A), 64650 (30E), 64677 (30A), 64715 (40E), 65556 (31A), 69637 (34C), 69669 (30A). Paint shop, 15215 (75C), 61375 (30A), Stripping Sp., 43105 (30A), 61573 Wdn, 69728 (30A). Foundry, 68541. Waiting cut up, 61566/76/80, 62536/82/8, 64651, 65467, 65574, 68574/638, 69600/10/6/9/23/7/34/5/59/66/76/716/31. | SLS/195905 |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
12/06/1947 | To Service | To service as London and North Eastern Railway Number 1202 Built at North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow, Works Number 26103 Allocated to Immingham (IMM) Diagram 100A boiler fitted |
||
06/02/1949 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 06/02/1949. Dep: 12/03/1949. Work undertaken: Boiler number 3733 (Diagram 100A) Renumbered to BR 61202 |
||
07/10/1950 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 07/10/1950. Dep: 23/12/1950. Work undertaken: Boiler number 28279 (Diagram 100A) |
||
13/09/1951 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 13/09/1951. Dep: 29/09/1951. | ||
02/10/1951 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 02/10/1951. Dep: 06/10/1951. | ||
28/12/1951 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 28/12/1951. Dep: 04/01/1951. | ||
12/09/1952 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 12/09/1952. Dep: 10/10/1952. Work undertaken: Boiler number 28117 (Diagram 100A) |
||
29/03/1953 | Allocation | Reallocated to Lincoln (40A) | ||
08/08/1954 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 08/08/1954. Dep: 25/09/1954. Work undertaken: Boiler number 28450 (Diagram 100A) |
||
26/10/1956 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 26/10/1956. Dep: 30/11/1956. Work undertaken: Boiler number 28285 (Diagram 100A) |
||
21/08/1957 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 21/08/1957. Dep: 29/08/1957. | ||
22/04/1958 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 22/04/1958. Dep: 30/04/1958. | ||
09/03/1959 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Stratford Works (General) - Arr: 09/03/1959. Dep: 01/05/1959. Work undertaken: Boiler number 28101 (Diagram 100A) |
||
06/10/1959 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 06/10/1959. Dep: 16/10/1959. | ||
23/08/1960 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 23/08/1960. Dep: 02/09/1960. | ||
25/03/1961 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 25/03/1961. Dep: 12/04/1961. | ||
16/09/1962 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 61202 from Lincoln (40A) | ||
01/1963 | Scrapped | Broken up by Cox and Danks: Wadsley Bridge |