|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Gateshead Works | 12/02/1949 | 24/02/1949 | 13 days | Light Intermediate | |||
Darlington Works | 03/11/1949 | 01/12/1949 | 29 days | General | Boiler number 28700 (Diagram 100A) |
||
Darlington Works | 16/09/1950 | 07/10/1950 | 22 days | Light Casual | |||
Darlington Works | 24/10/1951 | 17/11/1951 | 25 days | General | Boiler number 28817 (Diagram 100A) |
||
Darlington Works | 30/10/1953 | 21/11/1953 | 23 days | General | Boiler number 28814 (Diagram 100A) |
||
Darlington Works | 23/11/1953 | 25/11/1953 | 3 days | Unclassified | |||
Darlington Works | 24/05/1954 | 16/06/1954 | 24 days | Heavy Casual | Boiler number 28537 (Diagram 100A) |
||
Darlington Works | 02/01/1956 | 12/01/1956 | 11 days | Light Casual | |||
Darlington Works | 09/04/1956 | 07/05/1956 | 29 days | General | Boiler number 28243 (Diagram 100A) |
||
Darlington Works | 17/06/1957 | 02/07/1957 | 16 days | Light Casual | |||
Darlington Works | 10/11/1958 | 10/12/1958 | 31 days | General | Boiler number 28535 (Diagram 100A) Mechanical elements of ATC fitted |
||
Darlington Works | 10/06/1959 | 22/06/1959 | 13 days | Unclassified | Electrical elements of ATC fitted |
||
Darlington Works | 31/07/1961 | 26/08/1961 | 27 days | General | Boiler number 28411 (Diagram 100A) |
||
Darlington Works | 12/08/1963 | 25/09/1963 | 45 days | Light Casual |
Report Date | Title | Report | Source |
---|---|---|---|
31/05/1947 | Queens Park Works | During May eight new Class 'B.1' 4-6-0's appeared ex Q.P. Works, Nos. 1190-1197 inclusive. Up to 27/6 another eleven 'B.1's' had appeared, viz., Nos. 1198-1208. They were ex Works as follows: 1196 (27/5), 1197 (29/5), 1198 (3/6), 1199 (4/6), 1200 (6/6), 1201 (10/6), 1202 (12/6), 1203 (17/6), 1204 (19/6), 1205 and 1206 (24/6), and 1207 and 1208 . (27/6). Works' Nos. checked are as follows: Nos. 1190-1205 (26091-26106/47) and No. 1207 (26108/47). | SLS/194708 |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
02/06/1947 | To Service | To service as London and North Eastern Railway Number 1198 Built at North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow, Works Number 26099 Allocated to Tweedmouth (TWD) Diagram 100A boiler fitted |
||
06/10/1948 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 61198 | ||
26/12/1948 | Allocation | Reallocated to Borough Gardens (BOR) | ||
01/01/1949 | Allocation | Reallocated to Borough Gardens (BOR) | ||
06/02/1949 | Allocation | Reallocated to Darlington (DAR) | ||
12/02/1949 | Allocation | Reallocated to Darlington (DAR) | ||
12/02/1949 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gateshead Works (Light Intermediate) - Arr: 12/02/1949. Dep: 24/02/1949. | ||
03/11/1949 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 03/11/1949. Dep: 01/12/1949. Work undertaken: Boiler number 28700 (Diagram 100A) |
||
16/09/1950 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 16/09/1950. Dep: 07/10/1950. | ||
24/10/1951 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 24/10/1951. Dep: 17/11/1951. Work undertaken: Boiler number 28817 (Diagram 100A) |
||
30/10/1953 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 30/10/1953. Dep: 21/11/1953. Work undertaken: Boiler number 28814 (Diagram 100A) |
||
23/11/1953 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 23/11/1953. Dep: 25/11/1953. | ||
24/05/1954 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Heavy Casual) - Arr: 24/05/1954. Dep: 16/06/1954. Work undertaken: Boiler number 28537 (Diagram 100A) |
||
02/01/1956 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 02/01/1956. Dep: 12/01/1956. | ||
09/04/1956 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 09/04/1956. Dep: 07/05/1956. Work undertaken: Boiler number 28243 (Diagram 100A) |
||
17/06/1957 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 17/06/1957. Dep: 02/07/1957. | ||
10/11/1958 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 10/11/1958. Dep: 10/12/1958. Work undertaken: Boiler number 28535 (Diagram 100A) Mechanical elements of ATC fitted |
||
10/06/1959 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 10/06/1959. Dep: 22/06/1959. Work undertaken: Electrical elements of ATC fitted |
||
14/06/1959 | Allocation | Reallocated to Low Moor (56F) | ||
30/08/1959 | Allocation | Reallocated to York (North) (50A) | ||
31/07/1961 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 31/07/1961. Dep: 26/08/1961. Work undertaken: Boiler number 28411 (Diagram 100A) |
||
12/08/1963 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 12/08/1963. Dep: 25/09/1963. | ||
05/04/1965 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 61198 from York (North) (50A) | ||
05/1965 | Scrapped | Broken up by Drapers: Hull |