|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Doncaster Works | 13/07/1949 | 19/08/1949 | 38 days | General | Boiler number 9844 (Diagram 100A) Renumbered to BR 61196 |
||
Doncaster Works | 21/05/1951 | 13/06/1951 | 24 days | General | Boiler number 28144 (Diagram 100A) |
||
Doncaster Works | 03/07/1951 | 05/07/1951 | 3 days | Unclassified | |||
Doncaster Works | 16/02/1953 | 13/03/1953 | 26 days | General | Boiler number 28241 (Diagram 100A) |
||
Doncaster Works | 26/02/1954 | 19/03/1954 | 22 days | Light Casual | |||
Doncaster Works | 27/01/1955 | 25/02/1955 | 30 days | General | Boiler number 28282 (Diagram 100A) |
||
Darlington Works | 23/01/1957 | 22/02/1957 | 31 days | General | Boiler number 28443 (Diagram 100A) |
||
Doncaster Works | 07/05/1959 | 06/06/1959 | 31 days | General | Boiler number 28818 (Diagram 100A) |
||
Doncaster Works | 18/08/1961 | 30/09/1961 | 44 days | General | Boiler number 28135 (Diagram 100A) |
Report Date | Title | Report | Source |
---|---|---|---|
31/05/1947 | Queens Park Works | During May eight new Class 'B.1' 4-6-0's appeared ex Q.P. Works, Nos. 1190-1197 inclusive. Up to 27/6 another eleven 'B.1's' had appeared, viz., Nos. 1198-1208. They were ex Works as follows: 1196 (27/5), 1197 (29/5), 1198 (3/6), 1199 (4/6), 1200 (6/6), 1201 (10/6), 1202 (12/6), 1203 (17/6), 1204 (19/6), 1205 and 1206 (24/6), and 1207 and 1208 . (27/6). Works' Nos. checked are as follows: Nos. 1190-1205 (26091-26106/47) and No. 1207 (26108/47). | SLS/194708 |
31/05/1947 | Queens Park Works | During May eight new Class 'B.1' 4-6-0's appeared ex Q.P. Works, Nos. 1190-1197 inclusive. Up to 27/6 another eleven 'B.1's' had appeared, viz., Nos. 1198-1208. They were ex Works as follows: 1196 (27/5), 1197 (29/5), 1198 (3/6), 1199 (4/6), 1200 (6/6), 1201 (10/6), 1202 (12/6), 1203 (17/6), 1204 (19/6), 1205 and 1206 (24/6), and 1207 and 1208 . (27/6). Works' Nos. checked are as follows: Nos. 1190-1205 (26091-26106/47) and No. 1207 (26108/47). | SLS/194708 |
17/05/1947 | Eastfield MPD | New 'B1' were much in evidence here, Nos. 1191/2 on 17/5, Nos. 1194/5 on 24/5, and Nos. 1193-1197 on 31/5. 'Austerity' 2-8-0 No. 77367 was noted on 17/5, not re-numbered L.N.E. No. 3019 as stated in the Journal. (Officially given by the Co. as re-numbered to 3019 on 2/2/47.-Editor). Further 'Austerity' 2-8-0 noted here during the month ended 31/5 were: Nos. 77078, 77225, 71306, 77456, 77470 and 78568; also '07' Nos. 3020, 3089, and 3120. All appeared to be awaiting shop repair. (K.M.). | SLS/194708 |
01/10/1961 | Doncaster MPD (36A) | Ex-Works on Doncaster (36A) Shed : D2398, D3446, 60059, 60132, 61098, 61196, 63922. | SLS/196111 |
10/10/1965 | Doncaster Shed (Stored) | Stationary boiler: 92190. Stored: 61107/96, 61208, 61367, 63593, 63688, 63738, 90085/96/195/235/52/93/349/64/5/454/76/557/687. | SLS/196511 |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
27/05/1947 | To Service | To service as London and North Eastern Railway Number 1196 Built at North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow, Works Number 26097 Allocated to Doncaster (DON) Diagram 100A boiler fitted |
||
13/07/1949 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 13/07/1949. Dep: 19/08/1949. Work undertaken: Boiler number 9844 (Diagram 100A) Renumbered to BR 61196 |
||
21/05/1951 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 21/05/1951. Dep: 13/06/1951. Work undertaken: Boiler number 28144 (Diagram 100A) |
||
03/07/1951 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 03/07/1951. Dep: 05/07/1951. | ||
16/02/1953 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 16/02/1953. Dep: 13/03/1953. Work undertaken: Boiler number 28241 (Diagram 100A) |
||
26/02/1954 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 26/02/1954. Dep: 19/03/1954. | ||
27/01/1955 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 27/01/1955. Dep: 25/02/1955. Work undertaken: Boiler number 28282 (Diagram 100A) |
||
23/01/1957 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 23/01/1957. Dep: 22/02/1957. Work undertaken: Boiler number 28443 (Diagram 100A) |
||
07/05/1959 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 07/05/1959. Dep: 06/06/1959. Work undertaken: Boiler number 28818 (Diagram 100A) |
||
18/08/1961 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 18/08/1961. Dep: 30/09/1961. Work undertaken: Boiler number 28135 (Diagram 100A) |
||
21/07/1964 | Reinstated | Reinstated to Doncaster (36A) | ||
26/09/1965 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 61196 from Doncaster (36A) | ||
11/1965 | Scrapped | Broken up by T W Ward: Beighton |