|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Gorton Works | 17/10/1948 | 15/12/1948 | 60 days | General | Boiler number 9711 (Diagram 100A) Renumbered to BR 61195 |
||
Gorton Works | 15/10/1950 | 02/12/1950 | 49 days | General | Boiler number 28800 (Diagram 100A) |
||
Gorton Works | 06/12/1950 | 16/01/1951 | 42 days | Unclassified | |||
Doncaster Works | 22/05/1951 | 29/05/1951 | 8 days | Unclassified | |||
Darlington Works | 11/07/1952 | 23/08/1952 | 44 days | General | Boiler number 28261 (Diagram 100A) |
||
Stratford Works | 12/02/1954 | 26/03/1954 | 43 days | General | Boiler number 28597 (Diagram 100A) |
||
Doncaster Works | 13/04/1955 | 14/05/1955 | 32 days | Light Casual | |||
Doncaster Works | 09/03/1956 | 14/04/1956 | 37 days | General | Boiler number 28204 (Diagram 100A) |
||
Darlington Works | 16/01/1958 | 14/02/1958 | 30 days | General | Boiler number 28146 (Diagram 100A) |
||
Doncaster Works | 20/08/1959 | 23/09/1959 | 35 days | General | Boiler number 28438 (Diagram 100A) |
||
Doncaster Works | 19/09/1960 | 01/10/1960 | 13 days | Unclassified | |||
Doncaster Works | 01/07/1961 | 29/07/1961 | 29 days | General | Boiler number 28575 (Diagram 100A) |
Report Date | Title | Report | Source |
---|---|---|---|
17/05/1947 | Eastfield MPD | New 'B1' were much in evidence here, Nos. 1191/2 on 17/5, Nos. 1194/5 on 24/5, and Nos. 1193-1197 on 31/5. 'Austerity' 2-8-0 No. 77367 was noted on 17/5, not re-numbered L.N.E. No. 3019 as stated in the Journal. (Officially given by the Co. as re-numbered to 3019 on 2/2/47.-Editor). Further 'Austerity' 2-8-0 noted here during the month ended 31/5 were: Nos. 77078, 77225, 71306, 77456, 77470 and 78568; also '07' Nos. 3020, 3089, and 3120. All appeared to be awaiting shop repair. (K.M.). | SLS/194708 |
31/05/1947 | Queens Park Works | During May eight new Class 'B.1' 4-6-0's appeared ex Q.P. Works, Nos. 1190-1197 inclusive. Up to 27/6 another eleven 'B.1's' had appeared, viz., Nos. 1198-1208. They were ex Works as follows: 1196 (27/5), 1197 (29/5), 1198 (3/6), 1199 (4/6), 1200 (6/6), 1201 (10/6), 1202 (12/6), 1203 (17/6), 1204 (19/6), 1205 and 1206 (24/6), and 1207 and 1208 . (27/6). Works' Nos. checked are as follows: Nos. 1190-1205 (26091-26106/47) and No. 1207 (26108/47). | SLS/194708 |
17/05/1947 | Eastfield MPD | New 'B1' were much in evidence here, Nos. 1191/2 on 17/5, Nos. 1194/5 on 24/5, and Nos. 1193-1197 on 31/5. 'Austerity' 2-8-0 No. 77367 was noted on 17/5, not re-numbered L.N.E. No. 3019 as stated in the Journal. (Officially given by the Co. as re-numbered to 3019 on 2/2/47.-Editor). Further 'Austerity' 2-8-0 noted here during the month ended 31/5 were: Nos. 77078, 77225, 71306, 77456, 77470 and 78568; also '07' Nos. 3020, 3089, and 3120. All appeared to be awaiting shop repair. (K.M.). | SLS/194708 |
02/07/1961 | Doncaster Works (Stripping Road) | New Erecting Shop: D2394/5, E3064-9. Boiler Shop: E3070. Stripping Road: D2235, D3446, D3694, 60022, 60502/19, 61195, 61311. 61902/19, 64170, 70018/39. Scrap Yard: 61997 being cut up. Crimpsall: 61157, 61846. Outside Crimpsall: D3660, 61056/87, 76050. Erecting Shops: D2026, D2234, D2402, D3449, D5571/2, D8211, 12124, 13253, 43154, 60009/30/62/73/7, 60142/55/6, 61074, 61167, 61378, 61893, 61906/43, 63928, 70009/23/7/35. Outside Erecting Shop: DEPT7, 60029, 61231, 61850/65, 68591. Weigh House: Nil. Outside Weigh House: D5534, 60099, 62059, 63967. Paint Shop: D2393, D6720, D9006, E3062/3, 13252, 60161, 61120. Outside Paint Shop: D351, D5347, D5804, D6719. Works Shunters: DEPT10/1. | SLS/196108 |
16/07/1961 | Doncaster Works (Erecting Shop) | New Erecting Shop: D2395/6, E3064-9, 13253. Boiler Shop: E3071/2. Stripping Road: D2235, 60044/56/63/94, 60502, 61088, 61803, 61902, 73043. Scrap Road: 61824, 61927/64, 64736, 69531 intact, 68951 just cut up. Crimpsal: 60150, 61204. Outside Crimpsal: 60147, 62015, 70034. Erecting Shop: D3446/9, D3660, D5560/72, D8212, 12124, 60022/30, 60155, 60519, 61055, 61157/95, 61208, 61312/26, 61846, 70009/18/38/9, 76050. Outside Erecting Shop: DEPT7, 60034. Weigh House: Nil. Outside Weigh House: 60029, 61906. Paint Shop: D2234, D2394, D5571, D6722, E3063, 60009/73, 61056, 61378, 61893. Outside Paint Shop: D353, D5806, D9008. Works Shunters: DEPT10/1. | SLS/196109 |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
24/05/1947 | To Service | To service as London and North Eastern Railway Number 1195 Built at North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow, Works Number 26096 Allocated to Immingham (IMM) Diagram 100A boiler fitted |
||
17/10/1948 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 17/10/1948. Dep: 15/12/1948. Work undertaken: Boiler number 9711 (Diagram 100A) Renumbered to BR 61195 |
||
15/10/1950 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 15/10/1950. Dep: 02/12/1950. Work undertaken: Boiler number 28800 (Diagram 100A) |
||
06/12/1950 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 06/12/1950. Dep: 16/01/1951. | ||
22/05/1951 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 22/05/1951. Dep: 29/05/1951. | ||
11/07/1952 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 11/07/1952. Dep: 23/08/1952. Work undertaken: Boiler number 28261 (Diagram 100A) |
||
12/02/1954 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Stratford Works (General) - Arr: 12/02/1954. Dep: 26/03/1954. Work undertaken: Boiler number 28597 (Diagram 100A) |
||
13/04/1955 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 13/04/1955. Dep: 14/05/1955. | ||
09/03/1956 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 09/03/1956. Dep: 14/04/1956. Work undertaken: Boiler number 28204 (Diagram 100A) |
||
16/01/1958 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 16/01/1958. Dep: 14/02/1958. Work undertaken: Boiler number 28146 (Diagram 100A) |
||
20/08/1959 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 20/08/1959. Dep: 23/09/1959. Work undertaken: Boiler number 28438 (Diagram 100A) |
||
19/09/1960 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 19/09/1960. Dep: 01/10/1960. | ||
01/07/1961 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 01/07/1961. Dep: 29/07/1961. Work undertaken: Boiler number 28575 (Diagram 100A) |
||
09/05/1965 | Allocation | Reallocated to Frodingham (36C) | ||
14/11/1965 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 61195 from Frodingham (36C) | ||
12/1965 | Scrapped | Broken up by Drapers: Hull |